Van Hoven v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Traci E Van Hoven
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers and Mark T Esper
Case Number: 4:2019cv05191
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Traci E Van Hoven re All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sykes, Diane)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Traci E Van Hoven re All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sykes, Diane)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. 5, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Diane S. Sykes, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff Traci Van Hoven. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Diane S. Sykes. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3222674. by Traci E Van Hoven. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sundblad, Deborah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Mark T Esper, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark T Esper, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 22, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Army, Corps of Engineers ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3219583) Jury Demand. Filed by Traci E Van Hoven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sundblad, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hoven v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci E Van Hoven
Represented By: Deborah C Sundblad
Represented By: Diane S. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?