Allah v. Holbrook
Petitioner: NFN Allah
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Case Number: 4:2019cv05208
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH HABEAS RULE 3(A)(2) (Petitioner must either pay the full filing fee or comply with the in forma pauperis statute.) Filing Fee due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (CV, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (NFN Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE Regarding #2 Letter of Case Number and Deficiency. Filed by NFN Allah. (CV, Case Administrator) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (NFN Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (AY, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (NFN Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Filed by NFN Allah.(AY, Case Administrator) **25 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(NFN Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allah v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NFN Allah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?