Buchanan et al v. Simplot Feeders LLC et al
Plaintiff: Randy Buchanan and Donna Buchanan
Defendant: IBP Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats Inc and Simplot Feeders LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv05209
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim without Oral Argument filed by Simplot Feeders LLC. (Pincock, Trevor)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lindsey M. Huang added for IBP Inc and Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. P. Derek Petersen added for IBP Inc and Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Simplot Feeders LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Pincock, Trevor)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simplot Feeders LLC. (Pincock, Trevor)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IBP Inc. (Weinberg, Meredith)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. (Weinberg, Meredith)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by IBP Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats Inc.(Weinberg, Meredith)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lindsey M. Huang. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3252333. by IBP Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinberg, Meredith)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: P. Derek Petersen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3252313. by IBP Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinberg, Meredith)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re IBP Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Simplot Feeders LLC. (Andersen, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Svend A Brandt-Erichsen on behalf of Simplot Feeders LLC (Attorney Svend A Brandt-Erichsen added to party Simplot Feeders LLC(pty:dft))(Brandt-Erichsen, Svend)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hausberg on behalf of Simplot Feeders LLC (Attorney Charles Hausberg added to party Simplot Feeders LLC(pty:dft))(Hausberg, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Maurer on behalf of Simplot Feeders LLC (Attorney Michael A Maurer added to party Simplot Feeders LLC(pty:dft))(Maurer, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor R Pincock on behalf of Simplot Feeders LLC (Attorney Trevor R Pincock added to party Simplot Feeders LLC(pty:dft))(Pincock, Trevor)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons: Simplot Feeders, #2 Summons: Tyson Fresh Meats) (SG, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3237401) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Andersen, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan et al v. Simplot Feeders LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBP Inc
Represented By: Lindsey M Huang
Represented By: P Derek Petersen
Represented By: Meredith Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats Inc
Represented By: Lindsey M Huang
Represented By: P Derek Petersen
Represented By: Meredith Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot Feeders LLC
Represented By: Svend A Brandt-Erichsen
Represented By: Michael A Maurer
Represented By: Trevor R Pincock
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Buchanan
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Phillip J Haberthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Buchanan
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Phillip J Haberthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?