State of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: State of Colorado, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Washington, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Dana Nessel, State of Nevada, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Virginia and State of Hawai'i
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II and Kevin K McAleenan
Amicus Curiae: American College of Physicians, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Little Lobbyists, America's Essential Hospitals, Mental Health America, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence, National Council on Independent Living, Kids Forward, Northwest Health Law Advocates, End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin: The Wisconsin Coalition Against Domestic, American Hospital Association, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Health in Justice Action Lab, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Washington Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, API Chaya, American Society on Aging, Economic Progress Institute, Welcome Project, Legal Momentum, Mississippi Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, UMass Memorial Health Care Inc, Florida Health Justice Project, Gay Men's Health Crisis, PHI, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, Health Care For All, Battered Womens Justice Project, American Association of People with Disabilities, International Community Health Services, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Texas Council on Family Violence, National Council on Aging, Washington State Medical Association, National Federation of the Blind, California Immigrant Policy Center, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Jane Doe Inc, National Disability Rights Network, Bienestar Human Services, American Academy of Pediatrics, Disability Rights Washington, Boundless Immigration, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, SC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, The Arc of United States, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Tahirih Justice Center, MAZON, Casa de Esperanza, New York Immigration Coalition, Oasis Legal Services, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, National Network to End Domestic Violence, Housing Works, National Council of Jewish Women, National Hispanic Council on Aging, Womens Legal Defense and Education Fund, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Voice, Health Law Advocates, Treatment Action Group, Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Families USA, Community Catalyst, Violence Free Colorado, United Spinal Association, Futures Without Violence, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Mazzoni Center, Latino Commission on AIDS, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Caring Across Generations, Community Healthcare Network, Federation of American Hospitals, Community Action Marin, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Ujima Inc, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, National Domestic Violence Hotline, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Sexual Violence Law Center, American Medical Association, Child Care Law Center, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Children's Hospital Association, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, Justice in Aging, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, American Civil Liberties Union, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Community Health Network of Washington, National Center on Violence Against Women in the Black Community, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Association of American Medical Colleges, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Disability Rights Advocates, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Center for Public Representation and Public Health Law Watch
Case Number: 4:2019cv05210
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 196 COPY OF 9CCA ORDER re responses to motions for reconsideration en banc as to #175 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. 9CCA: 19-35914. (LR, Case Administrator)
December 19, 2019 Filing 195 MOTION to Compel Production of Privilege Log and Discovery on Count IV of First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2019 Filing 194 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) STRIKING the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for December 18, 2019, in light of the parties' Joint Status Report at ECF No. #193 . The Court accepts the parties' proposed schedule for an anticipated Motion to Compel from the Plaintiff States. See id. at 3. Accordingly, the Plaintiff States' anticipated Motion to Compel shall be filed by December 19, 2019. The Federal Defendants' response is due by January 14, 2020. The Plaintiff States' reply is due by January 28, 2020. In accordance with the parties' stipulation, the page limit for all briefs on this motion shall be fifteen (15) pages. Within one week after the Court resolves the anticipated Motion to Compel, the parties shall submit a status report with a proposed schedule for the Federal Defendants' submission of an answer or other responsive pleading and the parties' submission of any dispositive motions. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter.(MS, Judicial Assistant) Modified on 12/16/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant).
December 16, 2019 Filing 193 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2019 Filing 192 COPY OF 9CCA ORDER as to #175 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Department of Homeland Security. 9CCA: 19-35914. (PL, Case Administrator)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER DENYING #169 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re #169 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bays, Nathan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE (text entry; no PDF document). Pursuant to information provided by the parties in a status report, the Court is resetting the date for the formal scheduling conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for November 20, 2019, is STRICKEN and RESET for December 18, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. See ECF No. #188 . The parties shall call the Court's toll-free conference line at 888.363.4749 and enter access code 6699898. Please listen and carefully follow the automated instructions so that you will be added to the conference in a timely manner. Speaker phones are not compatible with the Court's audio system and may not be used for this hearing. Consistent with the parties' agreement, Defendants shall provide the administrative record to Plaintiffs no later than November 25, 2019. See ECF No. #188 at 3. The parties shall file a brief status report by December 16, 2019, informing the Court of any agreements they have reached regarding a discovery timetable, a cross-dispositive motion briefing schedule, and/or a deadline for Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
November 13, 2019 Filing 188 STATUS REPORT Joint by All Plaintiffs. (Weissman, Joshua)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING #173 MOTION TO EXPEDITE HEARING OF MOTION FOR STAY OF INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 7, 2019 Filing 185 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #173 MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Proceedings held on 10/3/2019 in Spokane, Washington before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Page Numbers: 1 - 65 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison Anderson at 509-458-3465 or Allison_Anderson@waed.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2020. (Anderson, Allison)
November 6, 2019 Filing 183 RESPONSE to Motion re #173 MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bays, Nathan)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #180 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jessica Merry Samuels, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Virginia. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
November 4, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jessica Merry Samuels. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3299084. by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Bays, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 179 9CCA Appeal Case Number 19-35914 for #175 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed 10/30/2019. (LR, Case Administrator)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) setting response and reply deadlines for Federal Defendants' Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #173 . In light of Federal Defendants' representation in ECF No. #173 at 2 that Plaintiff States oppose an expedited hearing of Federal Defendants' Motion to Stay the Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #169 , Plaintiff States may file any response to the Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #173 , by November 6, 2019. Federal Defendants may file any reply by November 7, 2019. Hearing without oral argument for the Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #173 , remains set for November 8, 2019, at 6:30 p.m. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
October 30, 2019 Filing 177 Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to Attorney Joshua Kolsky dated 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet)(SG, Case Administrator)
October 30, 2019 Filing 176 9CCA Payment Notification form re #175 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Fee Waived. (SG, Case Administrator)
October 30, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #162 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. cc: Court Reporter: Allison Anderson. (SG, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/31/2019 9CCA Case No. 19-35914 (LR, Case Administrator).
October 30, 2019 Filing 174 LODGED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to #162 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Department of Homeland Security. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number WAIVED. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 30, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting, for a showing of good cause, ECF No. #168 , Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. There being no objection, Defendants' Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction at ECF No. 169, is accepted in its entirety. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
October 25, 2019 Filing 170 DECLARATION by Daniel Renaud in Support re #169 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 169 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION Exceed Page Limitation Applicable to Motion by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay the Deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, ECF No. #166 . Defendants represent that Plaintiffs do not oppose staying the deadline until the parties and the Court determine the schedule for the remainder of this litigation at the upcoming scheduling conference. ECF No. #166 at 2; see also ECF No. #163 (Scheduling Conference Notice). Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, ECF No. #31 , is stayed nunc pro tunc, until the Court issues a scheduling order setting a new deadline. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
October 24, 2019 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Remark: Notice Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference mailed on 10/16/2019 to: R. Hirschhorn, M. Siddiqui, J. Cosgriff, E. Roberson-Young, and D. Aguilar. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 163 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2019 re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Delaware, State of Rhode Island, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, Dana Nessel, State of Hawai'i, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Washington, State of Colorado. (Reported/Recorded by: Allison Anderson) (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE by Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Correction))(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 1, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Keri L Berman on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security (Attorney Keri L Berman added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Berman, Keri)
September 27, 2019 Filing 158 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING on an expedited basis, for good cause shown under LCivR 7(f)(5) and (i)(2) and based on Plaintiffs representation that Defendants do not object, Plaintiffs Motion to Exceed Page Limits, ECF No. 156. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their Motion for Stay or Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 34, of no more than 30 pages. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts ruling on this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of CHANGE OF LOCATION OF HEARING by Court (text entry; no PDF document) re ECF No. #34 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for October 3, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 19, 2019 Filing 153 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Filing 152 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, Washington Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, and Washington State Medical Association. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Filing 151 AMICUS BRIEF by Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, International Community Health Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Housing Works, Latino Commission on AIDS, Bienestar Human Services, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Mazzoni Center, and Massachusetts Public Health Association. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Filing 150 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, and PHI. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Filing 149 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF of the American Hospital Association, America's Essential Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Children's Hospital Association, and Federation of American Hospitals. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SECOND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFS OF AMICI CURIAE, granting #113 , #122 , #124 , #131 and #139 Motion for Leave to File Briefs of Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #135 , #136 , #137 , #138 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Tess L. Curet, Sadik Huseny, Brittany N. Lovejoy, and Alexandra B. Plutshack, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Boundless Immigration; California Immigrant Policy Center; Child Care Law Center; Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration; Kids Forward; National Center for Law and Economic Justice; Oasis Legal Services; and Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #125 , #126 , #127 , #128 , #129 , and #130 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Kathleen McDermott; John A. Cosgriff; Jonelle Saunders; Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal; Lauren Sampson; and Oren Sellstrom, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, and Mazzoni Center. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) Modified on 9/19/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #118 , #119 , #120 , #121 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Natalie Kean; Denny Chan; Owen Masters; and Regan Bailey, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, and PHI. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #116 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Russell Hirschhorn, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Justice in Aging; American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, and PHI. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #114 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sean Marotta, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for American Hospital Association; America's Essential Hospitals; Association of American Medical Colleges; Catholic Health Association of the United States; The Children's Hospital Association; and The Federation of American Hospitals. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #132 , #133 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Susan M. Krumplitsch and Elizabeth L. Stameshkin, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for American Academy of Pediatrics; American Medical Association; American College of Physicians; Washington Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, and Washington State Medical Association. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) Modified on 9/18/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant).
September 16, 2019 Filing 141 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy (Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Boundless Immigration(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party California Immigrant Policy Center(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Child Care Law Center(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Community Action Marin(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Economic Progress Institute(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Kids Forward(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party National Center for Law and Economic Justice(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Oasis Legal Services(pty:am), Attorney Darren Michael Digiacinto added to party Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy(pty:am))(Digiacinto, Darren)
September 14, 2019 Filing 140 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David P Gardner on behalf of Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy (Attorney David P Gardner added to party Boundless Immigration(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party California Immigrant Policy Center(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Child Care Law Center(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Community Action Marin(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Economic Progress Institute(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Kids Forward(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party National Center for Law and Economic Justice(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Oasis Legal Services(pty:am), Attorney David P Gardner added to party Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy(pty:am))(Gardner, David)
September 14, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 14, 2019 Filing 138 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Alexandra B. Plutshack. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262508. by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 14, 2019 Filing 137 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Brittany N. Lovejoy. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262507. by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 14, 2019 Filing 136 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sadik Huseny. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262506. by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 14, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Tess L. Curet. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262505. by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 14, 2019 Filing 134 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Nancy L Isserlis on behalf of Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward, California Immigrant Policy Center (Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Economic Progress Institute(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Oasis Legal Services(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Community Action Marin(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Child Care Law Center(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Boundless Immigration(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party National Center for Law and Economic Justice(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party Kids Forward(pty:am), Attorney Nancy L Isserlis added to party California Immigrant Policy Center(pty:am))(Isserlis, Nancy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262468. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, WASHINGTON CHAPTER OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, WASHINGTON STATE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durbin, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Susan M. Krumplitsch. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262467. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, WASHINGTON CHAPTER OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, WASHINGTON STATE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durbin, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by American Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, WASHINGTON CHAPTER OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, WASHINGTON STATE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Durbin, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Oren Sellstrom. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262407. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lauren Sampson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262399. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262395. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jonelle Saunders. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262383. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: John A. Cosgriff. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262374. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kathleen McDermott. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262362. by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 124 MOTION Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Bienestar Human Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Housing Works, International Community Health Services, Latino Commission on AIDS, Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association, Mazzoni Center. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Amici Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 123 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Barbara J Duffy on behalf of Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center, International Community Health Services, Community Health Network of Washington, Housing Works, Latino Commission on AIDS, Bienestar Human Services, Gay Men's Health Crisis, Mazzoni Center, Massachusetts Public Health Association (Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party International Community Health Services(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Community Health Network of Washington(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Housing Works(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Latino Commission on AIDS(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Bienestar Human Services(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Gay Men's Health Crisis(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Mazzoni Center(pty:am), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Massachusetts Public Health Association(pty:am))(Duffy, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 proposed Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Regan Bailey. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262096. by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Owen Masters. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262080. by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Denny Chan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262049. by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Natalie Kean. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3262024. by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 TEXT-ONLY ERRATA ORDER (no PDF will issue). The Court denied as moot the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice at ECF No. #96 , as a duplicate of ECF No. #95 , because the docket text indicated that both ECF Nos. #95 and #96 sought leave for the same attorney to appear pro hac vice. See ECF No. 105 . However, the PDF Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed at ECF No. #96 seeks admission of attorney Andrew Paul Cohen, whose admission the Court has not yet approved. Accordingly, the Court strikes the text order at ECF No. 105 and GRANTS ECF No. #96 . Attorney Andrew Paul Cohen, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice members, is hereby added as counsel for amici curiae Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., and Welcome Project. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson.(PL, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Russell Hirschhorn. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3261999. by Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, PHI. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 115 DECLARATION by Sean Marotta in Support re #114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sean Marotta. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3261820. filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Children's Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals. (Ross, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sean Marotta. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3261820. by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Children's Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Children's Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C Ross on behalf of America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Children's Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals (Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party America's Essential Hospitals(pty:am), Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party American Hospital Association(pty:am), Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party Association of American Medical Colleges(pty:am), Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party Catholic Health Association of the United States(pty:am), Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party Children's Hospital Association(pty:am), Attorney Douglas C Ross added to party Federation of American Hospitals(pty:am))(Ross, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 111 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE NONPROFIT ANTI-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT ORGANIZATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by API Chaya, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Battered Womens Justice Project, Casa de Esperanza, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin: The Wisconsin Coalition Against Domestic, Futures Without Violence, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Jane Doe Inc, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Momentum, Legal Voice, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, Mississippi Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Violence Against Women in the Black Community, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Council of Jewish Women, National Domestic Violence Hotline, National Network to End Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, SC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Sexual Violence Law Center, Tahirih Justice Center, Texas Council on Family Violence, Ujima Inc, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Violence Free Colorado, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Womens Legal Defense and Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(PL, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2019 Filing 110 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2019 Filing 109 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care Inc, Welcome Project. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting #89 , #90 , and #102 Motions for Leave to File Briefs of Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 12, 2019 Filing 107 Praecipe filed by API Chaya, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Battered Womens Justice Project, Casa de Esperanza, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin: The Wisconsin Coalition Against Domestic, Futures Without Violence, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Jane Doe Inc, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Momentum, Legal Voice, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, Mississippi Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Violence Against Women in the Black Community, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Council of Jewish Women, National Domestic Violence Hotline, National Network to End Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, SC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Sexual Violence Law Center, Tahirih Justice Center, Texas Council on Family Violence, Ujima Inc, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Violence Free Colorado, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Womens Legal Defense and Education Fund: Re #89 MOTION LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE NONPROFIT ANTI-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT ORGANIZATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 24 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, . Description: To correct a typographical error in the Table of Contents. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Brief Dkt. 89-1)(Peterson, Alanna)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #98 , #99 , #100 , and #101 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Sarah M. Ray, Kyle A. Virgien, Diana A. Aguilar, and Charles Ferer Sprague, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, and United Spinal Association. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) finding as MOOT, ECF No. #96 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (duplicate of ECF No. #95 ). Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant). Order was stricken. See ECF No. 117 . Modified on 9/13/2019 (PL, Case Administrator).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #91 , #92 , #93 . #94 , #95 , and #97 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp, Andrew London, Emily J. Nash, Christian Springer, Justin J. Lowe, Wendy E. Parmet, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., and Welcome Project. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 10, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Kolsky on behalf of Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attorney Joshua Michael Kolsky added to party Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Kolsky added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Kolsky added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Kolsky added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 9, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae The American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Charles Ferer Sprague. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257435. by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Diana A. Aguilar. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257434. by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kyle A. Virgien. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257432. by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights Washington, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sarah M. Ray. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257430. by American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association, Disability Rights Washington. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Wendy E. Parmet. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257414. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Justin J. Lowe. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257412. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew). Motion was granted. see ECF No. 117 . Modified on 9/13/2019 (PL, Case Administrator).
September 9, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Justin J. Lowe. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257410. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christian Springer. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257409. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Emily J. Nash. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257408. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Andrew London. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257405. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3257401. by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Health Law Advocates and Other Organizations Interested in Public Health in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Health Law Advocates, Health Care For All, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Health in Justice Action Lab, Public Health Law Watch, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, California Immigrant Policy Center, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Florida Health Justice Project, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, New York Immigration Coalition, Community Healthcare Network, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Treatment Action Group, Welcome Project, Families USA, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Community Catalyst. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE NONPROFIT ANTI-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT ORGANIZATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 24 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, by National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Network to End Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, National Domestic Violence Hotline, API Chaya, Battered Womens Justice Project, Sexual Violence Law Center, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Futures Without Violence, Legal Momentum, Womens Legal Defense and Education Fund, Tahirih Justice Center, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin: The Wisconsin Coalition Against Domestic, Violence Free Colorado, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, SC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Texas Council on Family Violence, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence,, Jane Doe Inc., Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Council of Jewish Women, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Mississippi Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Voice, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Casa de Esperanza, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Ujima, Inc., National Center on Violence Against Women in the Black Community, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Appendix Appendix A to Brief of Amici, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Paul) Modified on 9/13/2019 See Praecipe ECF No. #89 . (VR, Courtroom Deputy).
September 9, 2019 Filing 88 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Matthew H Adams on behalf of Health Law Advocates (Adams, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 87 Errata filed by All Plaintiffs Re #86 DECLARATION by Richard Stolz in Support Re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Sprung, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/9/2019: Add additional document link. (TR, Case Administrator).
September 9, 2019 Filing 86 DECLARATION by Richard Stolz in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 85 DECLARATION by Amy Hundley in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 84 DECLARATION by Daron Korte in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 83 DECLARATION by Mary Bourque in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 82 DECLARATION by Bill Moss in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 81 DECLARATION by Emily Grossman in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 80 DECLARATION by Erik Johnston in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 79 DECLARATION by Patrick Carey in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 78 DECLARATION by Ryan Baumtrog in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 77 DECLARATION by Roberta Rubin in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION by Maureen G. Ohle in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION by Raymond Fitzgerald in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 74 DECLARATION by Amy Hundley in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 73 DECLARATION by Priya Tahiliani in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 72 DECLARATION by Courtney Hawkins in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 71 DECLARATION by M. Norman Oliver in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 70 DECLARATION by Angela Medrano in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 69 DECLARATION by Eve Sternberg in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 68 DECLARATION by Jovon Perry in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 67 DECLARATION by S. Duke Storen in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 66 DECLARATION by Sarah K. Peterson in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 65 DECLARATION by Lacy Fehrenbach in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 64 DECLARATION by Grace B. Hou in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 63 DECLARATION by Katrina Hotrum-Lopez in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 62 DECLARATION by Stacy Twite in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 61 DECLARATION by Paula Basta in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 60 DECLARATION by Teresita Batayola in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 59 DECLARATION by Nate Clark in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 58 DECLARATION by Stephen Groff in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 57 DECLARATION by Leanne Berge in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 56 DECLARATION by Rachel Pryor in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 55 DECLARATION by Marie Zimmerman in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION by Kelli Bohanon in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 53 DECLARATION by Kristen Hanulcik in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 52 DECLARATION by Sarah Polk, M.D., Sc.M. in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION by Elizabeth Winders in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION by Maria Lucia Chavez in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION by Joseph Curtatone and Mary Skipper in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION by Richard Whitley in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION by Theresa Eagleson in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION by Margaret Kelly in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION by Sharon Boyle in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION by Judith Persichilli in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION by Pam MacEwan in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION by Dr. Ngozi Ezike in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION by Catherine Betts in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION by Elisa Neira in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION by Erin Emerson in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION by Joshua Sharfstein in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION by Taylor Linke in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION by Tom Wong in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION by Nathan Bays in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Z, #2 Exhibit AA-ZZ, #3 Exhibit AAA-DDD)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #32 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lili A. Young, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for State of Hawai'i. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lili A. Young. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3253387. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
September 5, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tomisser, Rene)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #25 , #26 , #27 , and #28 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Angela R. Brooks, Abigail B. Taylor, David Urena, and Elizabeth Roberson-Young, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts and the State of Illinois, respectively. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #22 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mamoona Hafeez Siddiqui, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for the Commonwealth of Virginia. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Elizabeth Roberson-Young. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3251179. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: David Urena. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3250696. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
September 3, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Abigail B. Taylor. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3250654. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
September 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Angela R. Brooks. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3250645. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. #23 , Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, upon a finding of good cause under LCivR 7(f)(5) and (i)(2), on an expedited basis. Plaintiffs may file a memorandum in support of their anticipated Motion for Stay or Preliminary Injunction of no more than 60 pages. Amicus briefs filed in connection with Plaintiffs' motion shall be no longer than 30 pages. Correspondingly, Defendants may file an overlength response of up to 60 pages. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts ruling on this matter. TEXT ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Peterson, Rosanna)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Mamoona Hafeez Siddiqui. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3249930. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. 17, 18, 19, and 20, Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Lauren E. Hill, Eric R. Olson, Heidi Parry Stern, and Jeffrey Paul Dunlap, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs State of Rhode Island, State of Colorado, State of Nevada, and State of Maryland, respectively. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jeffrey Paul Dunlap. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3249075. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Heidi Parry Stern. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3248990. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric R. Olson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3248762. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lauren E. Hill. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3248614. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #15 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tania Maestas, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff State of New Mexico. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Tania Maestas. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3248347. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #10 , #11 , #12 , and #13 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Ralph J. Detrick, Ryan Spreague Hardy, Fadwa Alawieh Hammoud, and Toni Lynn Harris, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendants State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Virginia, and Attorney General Dana Nessel, on behalf of the People of Michigan, respectively. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Toni Lynn Harris. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3247015. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Fadwa Alawieh Hammoud. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3247011. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ryan Spreague Hardy. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3246908. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: R.J. Detrick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3246371. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #6 , #7 , and #8 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michelle S. Kallen, Alice Anne Lloyd, and Monica A. Horton, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Virginia and Plaintiff State of Delaware, respectively. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on these matters. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Monica A. Horton. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3245281. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Alice Anne Lloyd. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3245273. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michelle S. Kallen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3245255. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #4 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff State of New Jersey. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Glenn J. Moramarco. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3242349. by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tomisser, Rene)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Kevin K McAleenan, #2 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, #3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II)(LR, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3237736) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomisser, Rene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Keri L Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Eric R Olson
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Ralph J Detrick
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Dunlap
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberson-Young
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Bryan MS Ovens
Represented By: Paul Michael Crisalli
Represented By: Zachary P Jones
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Represented By: Joshua Weissman
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Angela R Brooks
Represented By: David Urena
Represented By: Abigail B Taylor
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Fadwa Alawieh Hammoud
Represented By: Toni Lynn Harris
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Lauren E Hill
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Monica A Horton
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Glenn J Moramarco
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Michelle S Kallen
Represented By: Mamoona Hafeez Siddiqui
Represented By: Ryan Spreague Hardy
Represented By: Rene David Tomisser
Represented By: Alice Anne Lloyd
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Represented By: Jessica Merry Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawai'i
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Lili A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Christopher B Durbin
Represented By: Elizabeth L Stameshkin
Represented By: Susan M Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Little Lobbyists
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: America's Essential Hospitals
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mental Health America
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Independent Living
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kids Forward
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin: The Wisconsin Coalition Against Domestic
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Health in Justice Action Lab
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Christopher B Durbin
Represented By: Elizabeth L Stameshkin
Represented By: Susan M Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: API Chaya
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Welcome Project
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Momentum
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mississippi Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UMass Memorial Health Care Inc
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Florida Health Justice Project
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gay Men's Health Crisis
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Health Care For All
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Battered Womens Justice Project
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of People with Disabilities
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Community Health Services
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Council on Family Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Medical Association
Represented By: Christopher B Durbin
Represented By: Elizabeth L Stameshkin
Represented By: Susan M Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Immigrant Policy Center
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jane Doe Inc
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Disability Rights Network
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bienestar Human Services
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Christopher B Durbin
Represented By: Elizabeth L Stameshkin
Represented By: Susan M Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Washington
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts General Hospital Chelsea Healthcare Center
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan Immigrant Rights Center
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Public Health Association
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Arc of United States
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Korean Community Center of the East Bay
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tahirih Justice Center
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Casa de Esperanza
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Pan-Ethnic Health Network
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Network to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Housing Works
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council of Jewish Women
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Womens Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Voice
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Treatment Action Group
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Families USA
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Catalyst
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Violence Free Colorado
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United Spinal Association
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Futures Without Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mazzoni Center
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Latino Commission on AIDS
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Resource Center on Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ohio Domestic Violence Network
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Healthcare Network
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Federation of American Hospitals
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of University Centers on Disabilities
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Latino Coalition for a Healthy California
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ujima Inc
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Accountability Initiative
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Domestic Violence Hotline
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sexual Violence Law Center
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Christopher B Durbin
Represented By: Elizabeth L Stameshkin
Represented By: Susan M Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Alliance to End Sexual Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Children's Hospital Association
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Russell Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fiscal Policy Institute and the Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Health Association of the United States
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky Equal Justice Center
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Health Network of Washington
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Oren Sellstrom
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Lauren Sampson
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Jonelle Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center on Violence Against Women in the Black Community
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Alanna E Peterson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta
Represented By: Douglas C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Darren Michael Digiacinto
Represented By: David P Gardner
Represented By: Tess L Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B Plutshack
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Sadik Huseny
Represented By: Brittany N Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Public Representation
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Diana A Aguilar
Represented By: Charles Ferer Sprague
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Andrew London
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin J Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy E Parmet
Represented By: Matthew H Adams
Represented By: Emily J Nash
Represented By: Kristyn Bunce DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?