Beatty v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela L Beatty
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv05007
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant Andrew M Saul. Attorney Christopher John Brackett is withdrawing. Benjamin J Groebner is substituted as counsel for Defendant. (Attorney Benjamin J Groebner added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Groebner, Benjamin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Brackett on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Christopher John Brackett added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Brackett, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela L Beatty re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons - General Counsel, #2 Summons - US AG)(VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 1/27/2020. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 15, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Angela L Beatty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L Beatty
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Christopher John Brackett
Represented By: Benjamin J Groebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?