White et al v. Walla Walla County et al
Plaintiff: Jeana Hill and Lonnie White
Defendant: Tom Beyer and Walla Walla County
Case Number: 4:2020cv05009
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Kirkpatrick, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Walla Walla County. (Myers, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Tom Beyer. (Myers, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Luke Wesley O'Bannan on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Luke Wesley O'Bannan added to party Tom Beyer(pty:dft), Attorney Luke Wesley O'Bannan added to party Walla Walla County(pty:dft))(O'Bannan, Luke)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Paul L Kirkpatrick added to party Tom Beyer(pty:dft), Attorney Paul L Kirkpatrick added to party Walla Walla County(pty:dft))(Kirkpatrick, Paul)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Walla Walla County and Tom Beyer. (Attachments: #1 Walla Walla County)(SG, Case Administrator)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Jeana Hill, Lonnie White. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Myers, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3373223) Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Myers, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Walla Walla County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walla Walla County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeana Hill
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie White
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?