Khan v. Bechtel National Inc
Plaintiff: Dr Abdul Khan
Defendant: Bechtel National Inc and National Engineering Services Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv05020
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LR, Case Administrator)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Bechtel National Inc, National Engineering Services Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Turner, Sarah)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Praecipe filed by National Engineering Services Corporation: Re #7 Answer to Complaint. Description: Correction re Certificate of Service. (Turner, Sarah)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Praecipe filed by Bechtel National Inc: Re #6 Answer to Complaint. Description: Correction re Certificate of Service. (Turner, Sarah)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant NESC Staffing LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by National Engineering Services Corporation.(Turner, Sarah). See Praecipe filed at ECF No. #9 to correct Certificate of Service. Modified on 2/13/2020 (PL, Case Administrator).
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Bechtel National Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Bechtel National Inc.(Turner, Sarah). See Praecipe filed at ECF No. #8 to correct Certificate of Service. Modified on 2/13/2020 (PL, Case Administrator).
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 New case number 4:20-CV-5020-RMP has been opened and assigned to Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Case number 1:20-CV-3017-RMP has been CLOSED. Future filings should be made in this case. (JW, ECF Admin)
February 5, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah N Turner on behalf of All Defendants (Turner, Sarah)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NESC Staffing Corp. (Turner, Sarah)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bechtel National Inc. (Turner, Sarah)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3388362 Filed by NESC Staffing Corp, Bechtel National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Turner, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Bechtel National Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel National Inc
Represented By: Samantha Everett
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Engineering Services Corporation
Represented By: Samantha Everett
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Abdul Khan
Represented By: James K McCanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?