Powers v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Linda Louise Powers
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv05045
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Southern West Virginia; Case Number 2:13-cv-21854. Docket sheet received.
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER The cases on Exhibit A have Boston Scientific Corporation as a remaining defendant; the court directs that the cases on Exhibit A be transferred to In re: Boston Scientific Corp., 2:12-md-2326; the Clerk is directed to disassociate the civil actions on Exhibit A as member cases in MDL 2327 and re-associate them with MDL 2326. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/6/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; each individual case listed in the Exhibit) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (Dismissing the "Ethicon Defendants" with Prejudice) granting the Motions to Dismiss with Prejudice filed in the member cases pursuant to Pretrial Order # 302 and/or # 329; the Clerk is directed to dismiss the Ethicon defendants from the individual civil action(s) with prejudice; and if no other defendants remain in an individual action, then (a) strike the action fromthe docket, and (b) close the case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Linda Louise Powers (Badaruzzaman, Asim) (Modified on 5/13/2019 to correct document number) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/13/2019 to correct document number) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Boston Scientific Corporation (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 4/24/2019 to correct document number)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Linda Louise Powers. (Seeger, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A Strongman on 1/10/14. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 7/12/2013, answer due 9/10/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
October 21, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
August 16, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 61 (Scheduling of Discovery Conferences) entered on 08/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2608515. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: James H. Keale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: William M. Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Louise Powers
Represented By: Asim Badaruzzaman
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Sindhu S. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?