Cavalier v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Heather Cavalier
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv05048
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Heather Cavalier Re #3 Amended Complaint. Description: signature missing. (Roberts, Tyler)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Case, Bryan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2020, at 11:00 AM before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Jury Demand. Filed by Heather Cavalier.(Roberts, Tyler) Modified on 4/27/2020 Document not signed; see signed document filed under ECF No. #6 (CV, Case Administrator).
March 12, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (DePaolo Haddad, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3420465 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Current State Court Docket and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(DePaolo Haddad, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavalier v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Gavin W Skok
Represented By: Mary Ellen DePaolo Haddad
Represented By: Bryan J Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gavin W Skok
Represented By: Mary Ellen DePaolo Haddad
Represented By: Bryan J Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Cavalier
Represented By: Tyler A Roberts
Represented By: Dylan S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?