Haviland v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LaDonna Haviland
Defendant: Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv05066
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 42 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00008. Docket sheet received.
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [ECF NO. #40 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the judge TRANSFERS the above-styled civil action to the docket of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Richland Division. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/14/20. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Washington, Richland Division. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Transfer Venue by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL [ECF NO. #38 . Attorney Kari L. Sutherland, William M. Gage, and Christy D. Jones are terminated. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/17/20. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christy D. Jones, Kari Sutherland and William M. Gage by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by M. David Griffith, Jr on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Griffith, M.) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 36 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re: L. Balefsky, M. Tiger, P. Jimenez, C. Jones, K. Sutherland, W. Gage. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-29779. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exlcude Teri Longacre.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6820) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6969) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7099) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3614) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3616) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3750) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3849) - Pls' Reply in Supp of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6831) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7016) - Notice of Adption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7106) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6882) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6885) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7029) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 28 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 27 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 26 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 25 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) - Defs' Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6868) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6953) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 24 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) - Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LaDonna Haviland (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION by LaDonna Haviland to #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family: Thom Ayers; Shawn Ayers; Nicole Pacheco on a Date to Be Determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ETHICON LLC With Prejudice by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, LaDonna Haviland (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 6/19/2018 to add party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of LaDonna Haviland on 6/22/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Alexander M. Ortolano on 3/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by LaDonna Haviland. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
May 2, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
December 17, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
December 9, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 84 (Order Amending PTO # 4 - Counsel Structure) entered on 12/06/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]
November 21, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2798426. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sak) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/6/2020.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haviland v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna Haviland
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?