Creekmore v. Ferguson et al
Petitioner: Nicky Lee Creekmore
Respondent: Robert Ferguson and Scott Souza
Case Number: 4:2020cv05082
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FILING FEE REQUIREMENTS (Petitioner must either pay the full filing fee or comply with the in forma pauperis statute.) Filing Fee due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees Form)(AY, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Motion Emergency by Nicky Lee Creekmore. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice re: Treason (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope) (AY, Case Administrator)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel by Nicky Lee Creekmore. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nicky Lee Creekmore. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Section of IFP Application) (CLP, Case Administrator)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by Nicky Lee Creekmore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creekmore v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicky Lee Creekmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?