Stipek v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sarah Stipek
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv05116
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3538534).. (Hatfield, Chad)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Stipek re Andrew M Saul. (Hatfield, Chad)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 7/27/2020. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Sarah Stipek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stipek v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stipek
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?