Juhnke et al v. City of West Richland
Plaintiff: John Drummond and Dewayne Juhnke
Defendant: West Richland, City of
Case Number: 4:2020cv05241
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Allen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Case participants will be provided with separate call-in details by private email from the Court's staff to use for this teleconference. Non-parties may call the Court's public conference line of 1-888-363-4749, Access code 4939688 # (no security code required), five minutes before the scheduled conference time. Parties on the phone MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES and NO RECORDING OR REBROADCASTING IS PERMITTED. (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by West Richland, City of.(Harper, Kenneth)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISSOLVING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and Order Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Allen)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by City of West Richland. (Harper, Kenneth)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Amended Certificate of Service filed by City of West Richland: Re #1 Notice of Removal. (Harper, Kenneth)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #0980-3638437 Filed by City of West Richland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harper, Kenneth)
December 8, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juhnke et al v. City of West Richland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Drummond
Represented By: Allen T Miller, Jr
Represented By: Adam M Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Juhnke
Represented By: Allen T Miller, Jr
Represented By: Adam M Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Richland, City of
Represented By: Bronson J Brown
Represented By: Kenneth W Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?