Mendoza et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Ramiro Mendoza and Ana Mendoza
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv05016
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN (JOINT) by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Case, Bryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Case, Bryan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Case, Bryan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Case, Bryan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3699271 Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Office of Insurance Comm. Cert. of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Superior Court Docket, #5 Exhibit E -, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Case, Bryan)
February 4, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Mendoza
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sperline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Mendoza
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sperline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Gavin W Skok
Represented By: Bryan J Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?