Rabo AgriFinance LLC v. 3E Properties et al
Plaintiff: Rabo AgriFinance LLC and Rabo Agrifinance Inc
Defendant: Karen Easterday, 3E Properties, Cody Easterday, Debby Easterday and Jody Easterday
Case Number: 4:2021cv05066
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Medeiros, Bruce)
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: The Court RESETS the Scheduling Conference on 6/22/2021 to 7/8/2021 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. The Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 7/1/2021. The parties will be provided with separate video conference call-in details by email from the Court's staff one week prior to the hearing.(MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleading, ECF No. #17 , is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to June 28, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (CLP, Case Administrator)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cody Easterday, Debby Easterday. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Misley, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2021 Filing 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 11:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE by Rabo AgriFinance LLC re Karen Easterday. (Medeiros, Bruce)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by Rabo AgriFinance LLC re Cody Easterday. (Medeiros, Bruce)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rabo AgriFinance LLC re Jody Easterday. (Medeiros, Bruce)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Karen Easterday by Timothy James Conway on behalf of Karen Easterday (Attorney Timothy James Conway added to party Karen Easterday(pty:dft))(Conway, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A Green on behalf of 3E Properties, Jody Easterday (Attorney Michelle A Green added to party 3E Properties(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle A Green added to party Jody Easterday(pty:dft))(Green, Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rabo AgriFinance LLC re 3E Properties. (Medeiros, Bruce)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cody Easterday, #2 Summons Debby Easterday, #3 Summons Jody Easterday, #4 Summons Karen Easterday)(CLP, Case Administrator)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue): Plaintiff's Application for Non-Resident Attorney to Participate in a Particular Case Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. Michael R. Johnson is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Bruce K. Medeiros, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CLP, Case Administrator)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael R. Johnson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3773391. by Rabo AgriFinance LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Medeiros, Bruce) Modified on 4/21/2021 to edit Judge (CLP, Case Administrator).
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # BWAEDC-3773344) Filed by Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2009 Mortgage Property, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2018 Mortgage Property, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Master Credit Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - VF Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 2009 Trustee's Sale Guarantee, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - 2018 Trustee's Sale Guarantee, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Medeiros, Bruce)
April 21, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabo AgriFinance LLC v. 3E Properties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabo AgriFinance LLC
Represented By: Bruce Kenneth Medeiros
Represented By: Michael R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabo Agrifinance Inc
Represented By: Bruce Kenneth Medeiros
Represented By: Michael R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Easterday
Represented By: Timothy James Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3E Properties
Represented By: Michelle A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Easterday
Represented By: Jeffrey C Misley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debby Easterday
Represented By: Jeffrey C Misley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Easterday
Represented By: Michelle A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?