Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Ferguson Enterprises Inc et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises Inc and Ferguson Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv05078
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Evezich, Craig)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Stewart, Paul)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION by Laura Maxson in Support re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal filed by All Defendants. (Stewart, Paul)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Paul)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Evezich, Craig)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ferguson Enterprises Inc. (Stewart, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Evezich, Craig)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Stewart, Paul)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Sykes Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Paul)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3791442 Filed by Ferguson Enterprises Inc, Ferguson Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Paul)
May 17, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Ferguson Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Craig A Evezich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Paul Sykes Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Paul Sykes Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?