Jensen Sr et al v. Biden Jr et al
Plaintiff: Joseph B Jensen Sr, JBJ and Joseph B Jensen, Sr
Defendant: Joseph R Biden Jr, Jay R Inslee, Anthony S Fauci, Center For Disease Control and Prevention, National Institute of Health and United States Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv05119
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPEDITE #20 . Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference Notice at ECF No. #16 is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT.(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO THE COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint ECF No. #17 is GRANTED pursuant to the liberal filing requirements of F.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(2). The Clerk shall file ECF No. 17-1 on the record as First Supplement to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [ECF No. 22] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Memorandum at ECF No. 21 is accepted as filed. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order filed by Joseph R Biden Jr, Center For Disease Control and Prevention, Anthony S Fauci, National Institute of Health, United States Food and Drug Administration. (Drake, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Drake on behalf of Joseph R Biden Jr, Center For Disease Control and Prevention, Anthony S Fauci, National Institute of Health, United States Food and Drug Administration (Attorney John T Drake added to party Joseph R Biden Jr(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party Center For Disease Control and Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party Anthony S Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party National Institute of Health(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party United States Food and Drug Administration(pty:dft))(Drake, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Smith on behalf of Joseph R Biden Jr, Center For Disease Control and Prevention, Anthony S Fauci, National Institute of Health, United States Food and Drug Administration (Attorney Molly Smith added to party Joseph R Biden Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Center For Disease Control and Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Anthony S Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party National Institute of Health(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party United States Food and Drug Administration(pty:dft))(Smith, Molly)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas O. Rice for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED.(RG, Chief Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. For reasons that are unnecessary to recite here, the Court deems it appropriate to recuse itself, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, from any further proceedings in the above-captioned matter. Accordingly, this case is returned to the Clerks office for reassignment of a new judge. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED.(RG, Chief Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION by Camille M. McDorman in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order filed by Jay R Inslee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McDorman, Camille)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order filed by Jay R Inslee. (McDorman, Camille)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: PLAINTIFFS MEMO AND POA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR INJUNCTION by Joseph B Jensen, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Jensen, Joseph)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS WITH TABLE OF CONTENTS)(Jensen, Joseph)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order by Joseph B Jensen, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails detailing vaccine timeline)(Jensen, Joseph)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph B Jensen, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Jensen, Joseph)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Joseph B Jensen, Sr of Service upon US Attorney (Jensen, Joseph)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by Joseph B Jensen, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT)(Jensen, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : - Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re United States Food and Drug Administration. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re National Institute of Health. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re Center For Disease Control and Prevention. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re Anthony S Fauci. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re Jay R Inslee. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph B Jensen, Sr re Joseph R Biden Jr. (Jensen, Joseph) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/22/2021 to rotate document) (SG, Case Administrator).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Jay R Inslee.(McDorman, Camille)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille M McDorman on behalf of Jay R Inslee (Attorney Camille M McDorman added to party Jay R Inslee(pty:dft))(McDorman, Camille)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro se litigant Joseph B Jensen, Sr has registered for electronic filing and to receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings to his email the.disgruntled.moderate@gmail.com via ECF. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. (JW, ECF Admin)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Even on behalf of Jay R Inslee (Attorney Jeffrey Todd Even added to party Jay R Inslee(pty:dft))(Even, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE MOTION TO OBTAIN ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pro Se Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization by Joseph B Jensen Sr. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE RIGHTS by Joseph B Jensen Sr. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # RIC001562) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen Sr et al v. Biden Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B Jensen Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B Jensen, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden Jr
Represented By: Molly Smith
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R Inslee
Represented By: Camille M McDorman
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony S Fauci
Represented By: Molly Smith
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center For Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Molly Smith
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Health
Represented By: Molly Smith
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Molly Smith
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?