Beatty v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Angela L Beatty
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2021cv05134
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Angela L Beatty re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LAS, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons- USA, #2 Summons- USAG)(MRJ, Case Administrator)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Angela L Beatty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
October 1, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L Beatty
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?