DKB Inc v. International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Asbestos Workers Local 82
Plaintiff: DKB Inc
Defendant: International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No 82
Case Number: 4:2021cv05142
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY re #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by DKB Inc. (Guin, John)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DKB Inc by All Defendants.(Attorney Steven A Crumb added to party International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No 82(pty:dft))(Crumb, Steven)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by DKB Inc re International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No 82. (Guin, John)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DKB Inc. (Guin, John)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No 82. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Declaratory Judgment against International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Asbestos Workers Local 82 ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3898367) Filed by DKB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Guin, John)
October 19, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DKB Inc v. International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Asbestos Workers Local 82
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DKB Inc
Represented By: John H Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No 82
Represented By: Steven A Crumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?