Huntington v. Smoke City for Less, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Huntington
Defendant: Smoke City for Less LLC d/b/a Smoke City for Less, LG Chem LTD and Does 1-50
Case Number: 4:2022cv05014
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Raschko on behalf of Smoke City for Less LLC (Attorney John A Raschko added to party Smoke City for Less LLC(pty:dft))(Raschko, John)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Huntington re Smoke City for Less LLC. (Cross, William)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William H. Cross added for Plaintiff Jeffrey Huntington. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. (TAP)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: William H. Cross. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3970453. by Jeffrey Huntington. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Yackulic, Corrie)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LG Chem LTD, Smoke City for Less LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MRJ, Case Administrator)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-50, LG Chem, Ltd., Smoke City for Less, LLC dba Smoke City For Less Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3969358 Jury Demand. Filed by Jeffrey Huntington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)
February 2, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntington v. Smoke City for Less, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Huntington
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Represented By: William H Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke City for Less LLC d/b/a Smoke City for Less
Represented By: John A Raschko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?