Wade v. Kadlec Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: John McKnight Wade
Defendant: Kadlec Regional Medical Center and Andrew Bieber
Case Number: 4:2022cv05063
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 . Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Burgess added for Plaintiff John McKnight Wade Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. (KMG) (Entered 07/12/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: John David Burgess. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4073497. by John McKnight Wade. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John Burgess)(Wixson, Sarah)
July 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lynn Wixson on behalf of John McKnight Wade (Attorney Sarah Lynn Wixson added to party John McKnight Wade(pty:pla))(Wixson, Sarah)
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center.(Mertens, Christopher)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center. (Mertens, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-05096. Docket sheet received.
May 20, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants Andrew Bieber and Kadlec Regional Medical Center's #8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.Case will be transferred on 5/20/2022. (AMD) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY, filed by Defendants Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Mertens, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John McKnight Wade, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Burgess, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDMENT Summons by Plaintiff John McKnight Wade (Milesnick, Robert) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher J. Mertens on behalf of Defendants Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center. (Mertens, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/22/2022, (Mertens, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Burgess for Plaintiff John McKnight Wade by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Burgess FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff John McKnight Wade (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7492241 (Milesnick, Robert) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Andrew Bieber on 3/21/2022, filed by Plaintiff John McKnight Wade. (Milesnick, Robert) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kadlec Regional Medical Center on 3/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff John McKnight Wade. (Milesnick, Robert) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/5/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/12/2022. (DK) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Andrew Bieber, Kadlec Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Bieber)(AMD) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, Andrew Bieber with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7442145) Attorney Robert S Milesnick added to party John McKnight Wade(pty:pla), filed by John McKnight Wade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Milesnick, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/16/2022 to correct malformed document) (AMD). [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/20/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Kadlec Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McKnight Wade
Represented By: John Burgess
Represented By: Robert S Milesnick
Represented By: John D Burgess
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Wixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kadlec Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Christopher John Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bieber
Represented By: Christopher John Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?