Pina et al v. Lamb Weston Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maneto Vazquez Pina and Claudia Denisse Murillo
Defendant: Lamb Weston Inc., Conagra Foods Lamb Weston Inc., Lamb Weston Inc a for-profit company formed in the State of Idaho, doing business in Washington State doing business as ConAgra Foods Lamb Weston Inc, John Doe Corporation and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2022cv05073
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs for Service of Initial Disclosures (Rodgers, Scott)
August 3, 2022 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by all parties by Lamb Weston Inc. (Byers, Benjamin)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lamb Weston Inc. (Byers, Benjamin)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/17/2022 at 8:15 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The parties' Joint Status Report is due no later than 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 Lamb Weston ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages by Lamb Weston Inc.(Byers, Benjamin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Rodgers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Scott E Rodgers added to party Claudia Denisse Murillo(pty:pla), Attorney Scott E Rodgers added to party Maneto Vazquez Pina(pty:pla))(Rodgers, Scott)
June 21, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jeff Bone re #1 Notice of Removal by Conagra Foods Lamb Weston Inc., Lamb Weston Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bone, Thomas)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4058995 Filed by Lamb Weston Inc., Conagra Foods Lamb Weston Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit A)(Bone, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pina et al v. Lamb Weston Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maneto Vazquez Pina
Represented By: Mario Interiano
Represented By: Scott E Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Denisse Murillo
Represented By: Mario Interiano
Represented By: Scott E Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamb Weston Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Byers
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Thomas J Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods Lamb Weston Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Byers
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Thomas J Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamb Weston Inc a for-profit company formed in the State of Idaho, doing business in Washington State doing business as ConAgra Foods Lamb Weston Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Byers
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Thomas J Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?