Farias v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Robert Farias
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 4:2023cv05101
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoxie, Christopher)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/27/2023 at 8:15 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The parties' Joint Status Report is due no later than 9/13/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
July 19, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Army Corps of Engineers.(Smith, Molly)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas O. Rice for all further proceedings. Judge Mary K. Dimke no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL by United States District Judge Mary K. Dimke. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (LAS, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Fee Waived. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit and Ex Parte Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Subs of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Publication of Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Order of Default, #6 Exhibit 6 - Findings of Fact, #7 Exhibit 7 - Mot to Amend Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Decl of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farias v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Farias
Represented By: Christopher Hoxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Molly Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?