Kelty v. Walla Walla County et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Kelty
Defendant: Walla Walla County, Rebecca Groom, John Liger, Norris Gregoire, Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart, Nadean Pulfer, R & B Fleck Enterprises, Ronald Fleck, Matthew Stroe, Keri Weber, Esmeralda Reynoso, Shay Hoffman and Columbia County
Case Number: 4:2023cv05145
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: Alexander C Ekstrom
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Ryan Kelty. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ades, Anika)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
December 1, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nidal Ahmed Dirini (Dirini, Nidal)
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Roche Byrd on behalf of Rebecca Groom (Attorney Eric Roche Byrd added to party Rebecca Groom(pty:dft))(Byrd, Eric)
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Rebecca Groom.(Janes, Carol)
November 30, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance for Rebecca Groom by Carol Sue Janes on behalf of Rebecca Groom (Attorney Carol Sue Janes added to party Rebecca Groom(pty:dft))(Janes, Carol)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Corey on behalf of Shay Hoffman, Nadean Pulfer, Esmeralda Reynoso (Attorney David J Corey added to party Shay Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney David J Corey added to party Nadean Pulfer(pty:dft), Attorney David J Corey added to party Esmeralda Reynoso(pty:dft))(Corey, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart.(Butler, Shawn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Q Butler on behalf of Shay Hoffman, Nadean Pulfer, Esmeralda Reynoso (Attorney Shawn Q Butler added to party Shay Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney Shawn Q Butler added to party Nadean Pulfer(pty:dft), Attorney Shawn Q Butler added to party Esmeralda Reynoso(pty:dft))(Butler, Shawn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nidal Ahmed Dirini on behalf of Shay Hoffman, Nadean Pulfer, Esmeralda Reynoso (Attorney Nidal Ahmed Dirini added to party Shay Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney Nidal Ahmed Dirini added to party Nadean Pulfer(pty:dft), Attorney Nidal Ahmed Dirini added to party Esmeralda Reynoso(pty:dft))(Dirini, Nidal)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of Columbia County (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Columbia County(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by Ryan Kelty re Walla Walla County. (Ades, Anika)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by Ryan Kelty re Rebecca Groom. (Ades, Anika)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by Ryan Kelty re R & B Fleck Enterprises. (Ades, Anika)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by Ryan Kelty re Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart. (Ades, Anika)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Ryan Kelty.(Ades, Anika)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Ryan Kelty re Norris Gregoire, John Liger, Matthew Stroe, Walla Walla County, Keri Weber. (Ades, Anika)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nidal Ahmed Dirini on behalf of Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart (Attorney Nidal Ahmed Dirini added to party Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart(pty:dft))(Dirini, Nidal)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Q Butler on behalf of Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart (Attorney Shawn Q Butler added to party Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart(pty:dft))(Butler, Shawn)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Corey on behalf of Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart (Attorney David J Corey added to party Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart(pty:dft))(Corey, David)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of Norris Gregoire, John Liger, Matthew Stroe, Walla Walla County, Keri Weber (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Norris Gregoire(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party John Liger(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Matthew Stroe(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Walla Walla County(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Keri Weber(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk)
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/24/2023 to add (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (AY, Case Administrator).
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons R & B Fleck Enterprises, #2 Summons Rebecca Groom, #3 Summons Shay Hoffman, #4 Summons John Liger, #5 Summons Norris Gregoire, #6 Summons Nadean Pulfer, #7 Summons Esmeralda Reynoso, #8 Summons Ronald Fleck, #9 Summons Matthew Stroe, #10 Summons Walla Walla County, #11 Keri Weber) (WMK, Case Administrator)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/30/2023. (WMK, Case Administrator)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4402417) Jury Demand. Filed by Ryan Kelty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Ades, Anika)
October 20, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (WMK, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelty v. Walla Walla County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kelty
Represented By: Timothy K Ford
Represented By: Lauren I Freidenberg
Represented By: Anika R Ades
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walla Walla County
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Groom
Represented By: Carol Sue Janes
Represented By: Eric Roche Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liger
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Gregoire
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mountain Heart-to-Heart
Represented By: Nidal Ahmed Dirini
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Represented By: David J Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadean Pulfer
Represented By: David J Corey
Represented By: Nidal Ahmed Dirini
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & B Fleck Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Fleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Stroe
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Weber
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmeralda Reynoso
Represented By: Nidal Ahmed Dirini
Represented By: David J Corey
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shay Hoffman
Represented By: David J Corey
Represented By: Nidal Ahmed Dirini
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?