Brooks v. Gallagher et al
Plaintiff: Carl Alonzo Brooks
Defendant: K Gallagher, Lisa Robtoy, Lori Ramsdellgilkey, Elyse Balmert, Tateasha Davis, Melissa Andrewjeski, Nancy Tenney, Corey Endo, Timothy Johnson, Carey Huffman, Nina Elmore, Tammie Barajas, Jane Doe Latina and Cee Cee Kairos
Case Number: 4:2024cv05028
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Notice and Motion to AMEND or Withdraw In Forma Pauperis as Misstep of Pro Se Plaintiff by Carl Alonzo Brooks. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits #2 Proposed Order)(TNC, Case Administrator) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/23/2024: remove received stamp) (TNC, Case Administrator).
April 10, 2024 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #27DG9ADH in the amount of $405.00 from Carl Brooks. (LTR, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2024.Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Minute Memorandum by Carl Alonzo Brooks. (TNC, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ORDER: The Clerk's Office is directed to NOT issue summons in this matter pending further directive from the Court. Text-only entry; no PDF will issue; this entry constitutes the Court's ruling/notice on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)
March 5, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form) (BM, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Jury Demand. Filed by Carl Alonzo Brooks.(BM, Case Administrator) **Complaint is 15 PAGE(S) and Proposed Summonses totaling 42 PAGE(S) for 57 PAGE(S) TOTAL, PRINT NEF ONLY** Modified on 3/7/2024 to add page count (BM, Case Administrator). Modified on 4/19/2024 to clarify page counts (BM, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Gallagher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Alonzo Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Robtoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Ramsdellgilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyse Balmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tateasha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Andrewjeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Endo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Latina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cee Cee Kairos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?