Adams v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Scott Adams and Rooster
Defendant: Robert Jackson, Ronald Haynes, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, CO Unknown 2, CO Unknown 3, Unknown 1, Unknown CS II, Unknown CO, Michelle Gallon, Jason Martin, Alfredo Lomeli, Jason Richer, Roberto Mendiola, CO John Doe, Christopher Alaniz and Hiedi Griffith
Case Number: 4:2024cv05041
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 (Second) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Ryan Scott Adams. (Note: Amended to add 21 exhibit pages and correct scanning error at page 18 of ECF #12 .)(LTR, Case Administrator) **96 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
June 7, 2024 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Party John Doe 3 (Correctional Officer (Yard Guard)), Jane Doe 1 (Corrections Specialist II) and John Doe 2 (Correctional Officer (Yard Guard)) terminated. Jury Demand. Party Michelle Gallon, Jason Martin, Alfredo Lomeli, Jason Richer, Roberto Mendiola, CO John Doe, Christopher Alaniz and Hiedi Griffith added. Filed by Ryan Scott Adams.(LTR, Case Administrator) **74 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO AMEND OR VOLUNTARILY DISMISS COMPLAINT; Plaintiff may file within 60 days of the date of this order an amended complaint or attached motion to voluntarily dismiss complaint or risk dismissal and a 'strike' under 28 USC 1915(g). Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal Deadline set for 7/29/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint Form)(LTR, Case Administrator) **23 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENT; application by plaintiff to proceed IFP is granted; an initial partial filing fee will be calculated and collected by Department of Corrections, Attn: LFO/COS UNIT (agency having custody of plaintiff). cc of Order and Acknowledgment/Authorization sent to agency. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LTR, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Ryan Scott Adams. (LTR, Case Administrator) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205) Modified on 5/28/2024: two copies of this submission received this date via PEF (LTR, Case Administrator).
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 Proof of Exhaustion & Complete Refusal by WSP Officials to Save Video of Staff Misconduct re #1 Complaint by Ryan Scott Adams. (LTR, Case Administrator) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (SG, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment and Authorization) (SG, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $405, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Ryan Scott Adams. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(SG, Case Administrator) **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Scott Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Unknown 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Unknown 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown CS II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Mendiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiedi Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?