Square Enix Company Ltd v. Xanga.com Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: John 1-10 Does and Xanga.com Inc
Plaintiff: Square Enix Company Ltd
Case Number: 2:2006cv00075
Filed: January 18, 2006
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay proceedings until September 30, 2006, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(LT, )
July 19, 2006 11
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd (Byers, David)
January 18, 2006 1
COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against defendants Xanga.com Inc. and John Does 1-10 (Summons(es) NOT issued) (Receipt # 320743), filed by Square Enix Company Ltd. (Attachments: (1) Civil Cover Sheet (2) Email Reqest to File New Case)(MKB)
January 23, 2006 2
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. (Original mailed to the Register of Copyrights.) (MKB)
February 2, 2006 3
DECLARATION of K. Michael Fandel and Request for Subpoena Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 512(h) by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. (Fandel, Kent)
February 2, 2006 4
PRAECIPE re 3 Declaration to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Fandel, Kent)
February 3, 2006 5
PRAECIPE to attach document (Exhibit-Letter) re 3 Declaration by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Letter)(Fandel, Kent)
February 22, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/10/2006.Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/24/2006. Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2006; by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (GG, )
March 2, 2006 7
DECLARATION of K. Michael Fandel and Request for Subpoena Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 512(H) by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fandel, Kent)
March 2, 2006 8
PRAECIPE to attach document (Subpoena Duces Tecum Under 17 U.S.C. section 512 (H)) re 7 Declaration by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fandel, Kent) Modified on 3/3/2006 (CL, ). (Subpoena issued and mailed to atty).
April 19, 2006 9
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Square Enix Company Ltd. Noting Date 4/28/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Byers, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Square Enix Company Ltd v. Xanga.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanga.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Square Enix Company Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.