Johnson et al v. Menu Foods Featured Case

Plaintiff: Suzanne E Johnson and Craig R Klemann
Defendant: Menu Foods
Case Number: 2:2007cv00455
Filed: March 27, 2007
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2007 26
NOTICE from MDL Panel with copy of order re in re Pet Food Products MDL 1850(RS, )
June 25, 2007 25
NOTICE from MDL Panel with copy of Transfer Order(RS, )
May 21, 2007 24
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OR WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re MDL 1850(TS, )
May 16, 2007 22
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT/MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407 FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION, filed by Plaintiffs'(TS, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2007 (TS, ).
May 14, 2007 21
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OR WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re MDL 1850(RS, )
May 8, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS AND FOR PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE, by Judge John C Coughenour.(CL, )
May 7, 2007 20
LETTER RE MOTION FOR TRANSFER/ NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND FOR CONSOLIDATED OR COORDINATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U. S. C. 1407 filed by Plaintiffs(TS, )
April 30, 2007 16
NOTICE to MDL Panel by Attorney Bruce Newman Re: Service List (TS,)
April 27, 2007 15
NOTICE/RESPONSE TO MDL PANEL REGARDING MDL 1850 OF PLAINTIFFS TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION AND REQUEST FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS (RS, )
April 24, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge John C Coughenour. (JM, )
April 23, 2007 13
NOTICE/RESPONSE TO MDL PANEL REGARDING MDL 1850 OF PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY SEXTON TO PLAINTIFF TROIANO AND WASHINGTON PLAINTIFFS" MOTIONS FOR TRANSFER AND COORDINATION OR CONSOLIDATION (RS, )
April 19, 2007 10
NOTICE/MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS WHALEY ET AL IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS SEXTON AND TROIANO (RS, )
April 18, 2007 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Menu Foods re 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings. (Trabolsi, Gary)
April 13, 2007 6
NOTICE/RESPONSE TO MDL PANEL of plaintiffs Jared Workman, Mark and Mona Cohen, and Peggy Schneider in response to all 3 motions for transfer and centralization of all Pet Food Products Liability Litigation (RS, )
April 10, 2007 4
Letter from Christine Fox addressed to Mr. Luthi requesting that their motion papers be filed as an interested party response re MDL 1850. (RS, )
April 6, 2007 3
NOTICE/JOINT MOTION of plaintiffs Jayme Pittsonberger, David Carter and Jim Bullock for transfer and coordination re MDL 1850 in re Pet Foods Product. Motion filed before MDL Panel. (RS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Menu Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne E Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R Klemann
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods
Represented By: Gary A. Trabolsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?