Microsoft Corporation v. Immersion Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation alleged that Defendant Immersion Corporation breached its sublicense agreement with Plaintiff that required Defendant to pay specified amounts to Plaintiff if Defendant settled its lawsuit with Sony.

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Immersion Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00936
Filed: June 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT AN AWARD OF COSTS OR FEES TO EITHER PARTY re 182 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Microsoft Corporation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (MD)
October 2, 2008 Filing 182 STIPULATED MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 10/2/2008 (Marks-Dias, Blake) Modified on 10/3/2008 (CL).
August 27, 2008 Oral Argument previously scheduled on 8/28/08 @ 1:30 PM is STRICKEN. (LC)
August 26, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE from Mediator James A. Smith, Jr., that on 12/17/07, the parties participated in a mediation. (Smith, James)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re 179 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Joseph M Lipner for Immersion Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(TS, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 179 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph M. Lipner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Immersion Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001525507. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
August 15, 2008 Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Declaration of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
August 15, 2008 Filing 177 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 176 SEALED MOTION re 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal ; SEALED MOTION re 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal ;, 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal (Marks-Dias, Blake)
August 15, 2008 Filing 176 SEALED MOTION re 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal ;Microsoft's Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 8/15/2008 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
August 15, 2008 Filing 175 MOTION to Seal Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Dec. of BMD Under Seal by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Microsoft's Motion For Reconsideration & Exhibit A to Declaration of Blake Marks-Dias Under Seal) Noting Date 8/15/2008 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
August 15, 2008 Filing 174 MINUTE ORDER re: 166 MOTION to Seal Opposition and Exhibits filed by Microsoft Corporation, 170 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant And Certain Supporting Documents filed by Immersion Corporation. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S Martinez, United States District Judge: Both parties have moved to seal documents related to pending summary judgment motions before the Court. The documents have already been filed by the parties under seal, and each motion is unopposed. The Court finds that both parties have adequately justified sealing the documents, overcoming the strong presumption in favor of public access. Local Rule CR 5(g)(2). Accordingly, both motions to seal referenced above shall be GRANTED. The documents shall remain SEALED. (DKo)
August 8, 2008 Filing 173 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1, 2, 3, and 5 to Declaration of David R. Kaplan In Support of Immersion Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach Of The Implied Covenant by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 170 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant And Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
August 8, 2008 Filing 172 DECLARATION of David R. Kaplan filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 170 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant And Certain Supporting Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Kaplan, David)
August 8, 2008 Filing 171 SEALED DOCUMENT Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 170 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant And Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
August 8, 2008 Filing 170 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim Of Breach Of The Implied Covenant And Certain Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/8/2008 (Kaplan, David)
August 7, 2008 Set Oral Argument on 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract, 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses, 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant : Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2008 at 1:30 PM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
August 4, 2008 Filing 169 Duplicate of document # 168 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant (Kundtz, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2008 (KN).
August 4, 2008 Filing 168 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 166 MOTION to Seal Opposition and Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (pp. 5-22), # 2 Exhibit 2 (pp. 23-37), # 3 Exhibit 3 (pp. 38-48), # 4 Exhibit 4 (pp. 49-64), # 5 Exhibit 5 (pp. 65-68), # 6 Exhibit 6 (69-79), # 7 Exhibit 7 (pp. 80-82), # 8 Exhibit 8 (pp. 83-91), # 9 Exhibit 9 (pp. 92-101), # 10 Exhibit 10 (pp. 102-112), # 11 Exhibit 11 (pp. 113-115), # 12 Exhibit 12 (pp. 116-118), # 13 Exhibit 13 (pp. 119-143), # 14 Exhibit 14 (pp. 144-146), # 15 Exhibit 15 (pp. 147-149))(Kundtz, Paul)
August 4, 2008 Filing 167 SEALED DOCUMENT Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 166 MOTION to Seal Opposition and Exhibits. (Kundtz, Paul)
August 4, 2008 Filing 166 MOTION to Seal Opposition and Exhibits by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Opposition and Exhibits Under Seal) Noting Date 8/4/2008 (Kundtz, Paul)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying plaintiff's 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; striking as moot plaintiff's 81 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SEALED ORDER DENYING MICROSOFT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STRIKING AS MOOT MICROSOFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 31, 2008 Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER re: 154 MOTION to Seal Reply and Exhibits filed by Microsoft Corporation, 150 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses filed by Immersion Corporation, 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses filed by Immersion Corporation, 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal filed by Microsoft Corporation, 130 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents filed by Immersion Corporation, 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents filed by Immersion Corporation.The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S Martinez, United States District Judge: Both parties have moved to seal documents related to pending summary judgment motions before the Court. The documents have already been filed by the parties under seal, and each motion is unopposed. The Court finds that both parties have adequately justified sealing the documents, overcoming the strong presumption in favor of public access. Local Rule CR 5(g)(2). Accordingly, all above-referenced motions to seal shall be GRANTED. The documents shall remain SEALED.(DKo)
July 25, 2008 Filing 162 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. B to the Dec of Blake Marks-Dias by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
July 25, 2008 Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Dec of Blake Marks-Dias by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
July 25, 2008 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment re Immersion's Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. C to the Declaration of Blake Marks-Dias)(Marks-Dias, Blake)
July 25, 2008 Filing 159 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff Microsoft's Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Re Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
July 25, 2008 Filing 158 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion to File Reply Brief and Exhibits A & B Under Seal) Noting Date 7/25/2008 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
July 25, 2008 Filing 157 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits to Supplemental Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Exhibit A, pp. 5-9) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 154 MOTION to Seal Reply and Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (pp. 10-18, # 2 Exhibit C (pp. 19-35), # 3 Exhibit D (pp. 36-38), # 4 Exhibit E (pp. 39-47), # 5 Exhibit F (pp. 48-62))(Kundtz, Paul)
July 25, 2008 Filing 156 SEALED DOCUMENT Microsoft's Reply to Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 154 MOTION to Seal Reply and Exhibits. (Kundtz, Paul)
July 25, 2008 Filing 155 Supplemental DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Kundtz, Paul)
July 25, 2008 Filing 154 MOTION to Seal Reply and Exhibits by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Reply and Exhibits Under Seal) Noting Date 7/25/2008 (Kundtz, Paul)
July 22, 2008 Filing 153 SEALED DOCUMENT Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses [Replacement For Docket #151] by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 150 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 152 DECLARATION of David R. Kaplan re 151 Sealed Document, In Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 151 SEALED DOCUMENT Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 150 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/25/2008 (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 149 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit E to Kaplan Declaration in Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 148 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D to Kaplan Declaration in Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 147 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C to Kaplan Declaration in Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 146 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B to Kaplan Declaration in Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 145 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Kaplan Declaration in Support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses. (Kaplan, David)
July 21, 2008 Filing 144 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents re: Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/25/2008 (Kaplan, David)
July 18, 2008 Filing 143 SEALED DOCUMENT Immersion's Opposition To Microsoft's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On Breach of Contract [Replacement For Docket #139] by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 18, 2008 Filing 142 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 11-15 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 18, 2008 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Alan J. Heinrich re 139 Sealed Document, in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18-25, # 2 Exhibit 26-28, # 3 Exhibit 29, 31-33, 35-38)(Kaplan, David)
July 18, 2008 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Robert Van Naarden re 139 Sealed Document, In Support of Immersion's Sealed Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 139 SEALED DOCUMENT Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 138 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 42-46 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 137 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 34, 39-41 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 136 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 22, 23, 30 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 135 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 16-17 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 134 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1-10 to Declaration of Alan J. Heinrich in support of Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 17, 2008 Filing 133 MOTION to Seal Immersion's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certain Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/25/2008; (Kaplan, David)
July 16, 2008 Filing 132 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 14, 15 to Kaplan Declaration by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 130 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents. (Kaplan, David)
July 16, 2008 Filing 131 DECLARATION of David R. Kaplan filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Ex. 2), # 2 Exhibit (Ex. 6), # 3 Exhibit (Ex. 7), # 4 Exhibit (Ex. 8), # 5 Exhibit (Ex. 9), # 6 Exhibit (Ex. 10), # 7 Exhibit (Ex.11), # 8 Exhibit (Ex. 12), # 9 Exhibit (Ex. 13), # 10 Exhibit (Ex. 16), # 11 Exhibit (Ex. 17))(Kaplan, David)
July 16, 2008 Filing 130 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David)
July 16, 2008 Filing 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Microsoft's Claim of Breach of the Implied Covenant by Defendant Immersion Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/8/2008; (Kaplan, David)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO SEAL AND DFT'S MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 10, 2008 Filing 127 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract. Filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 7/25/2008; (Kundtz, Paul)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER RE-NOTING 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses ; Noting Date 7/25/2008; Pursuant to Local Rule CR 7(g)(3), all dispositive motions shall be noted for consideration no earlier than the fourth Friday after filing and service of the motion. Here, Microsoft filed the underlying motion on CM/ECF on Thursday, June 26, 2008, and appropriately noted the motion four (4) Fridays later for Friday, July 18, 2008. However, the Court informed Microsoft that it did not file the appropriate document that day, and Microsoft did not file and serve the underlying motion until Friday, June 27, 2008. As a result, Immersion technically did not receive service of the motion until that day. Accordingly, the Court shall sua sponte RENOTE Microsoft's motion for Friday, July 25, 2008.(DKo)
June 30, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion And Exhibit 5 to Lyon Declaration by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion To Seal Summary Judgment Motion & Exhibit 5 to Lyon Declaration) Noting Date 6/30/2008; (Marks-Dias, Blake)
June 27, 2008 Filing 124 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Laura A. Peter In Support Of Immersion's Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Microsoft's "Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim" by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 121 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, David)
June 27, 2008 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of David R. Kaplan In Support Of Immersion's Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Microsoft's "Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim" by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 121 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Kaplan, David)
June 27, 2008 Filing 122 SEALED DOCUMENT Supplemental Submission In Opposition to Microsoft's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim" by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 121 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Submission. (Kaplan, David)
June 27, 2008 Filing 121 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Submission by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/27/2008; (Kaplan, David)
June 27, 2008 Filing 120 Duplicate Filing. MOTION to Seal Supplemental Submission and Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. Noting Date 6/27/2008; (Kaplan, David) Modified on 6/30/2008 (JJT).
June 27, 2008 Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER re: 107 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Microsoft Corporation. The following Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, United States District Court Judge: Originally, Microsoft requested sixteen (16) additional pages to its partial summary judgment motion. Microsoft has since filed its partial summary judgment motion and the Court notes that the motion is ten (10) additional pages in length. The Court finds good cause to allow additional pages and therefore GRANTS IN PART Microsoft's motion for leave to file ten (10) additional pages rather than the sixteen (16) originally requested by Microsoft. Pursuant to Local Rule CR 7(f)(4), Immersion is automatically allowed ten (10) additional pages for its response, and the reply brief shall not exceed one-half the total length of the brief filed in opposition. (DKo)
June 27, 2008 Filing 118 ERRATA Sheet for Sealed Exhibits 37 and 65 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Lyon, Wendy)
June 27, 2008 Filing 117 PRAECIPE to attach document (Motion (inadvertenly not attached)) re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Kundtz, Paul)
June 27, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses : added text re Motion not attached. (ELS)
June 26, 2008 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Use These Exhibits for Affirmative Defense Motion also) filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1SEALED Exhibit 3-5, # 2 Exhibit 9-17, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 24-27, # 6 Exhibit 38, # 7 Exhibit 40, # 8 Exhibit 51-55, # 9 Exhibit 57)(Kundtz, Paul) Modified on 7/16/2008 to seal attachment no 1 per 7/15/08 Order(RS).
June 26, 2008 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Stephen P. McGrath filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses (Kundtz, Paul)
June 26, 2008 Filing 114 E-FILING ERROR: Motion not attached, filed as docket # 117 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Immersion's Affirmative Defenses) Noting Date 7/18/2008; (Kundtz, Paul) Modified on 6/27/2008 (ELS).
June 26, 2008 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Stephen P. McGrath filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Kundtz, Paul)
June 26, 2008 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibit 3-5 (pgs. 54-73), # 2 Exhibit 9-17 (pgs. 146-245), # 3 Exhibit 20 (pgs. 259-260), # 4 Exhibit 22 (pgs. 277-278), # 5 Exhibit 24-27 (pgs. 291-308), # 6 Exhibit 38 (pg. 440), # 7 Exhibit 40 (pgs. 443-452), # 8 Exhibit 51-55 (pgs. 488-507), # 9 Exhibit 57 (pgs. 510-518))(Kundtz, Paul) Modified on 7/16/2008 to seal attachment 1 per 7/15/08 Order (RS).
June 26, 2008 Filing 111 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract) Noting Date 7/18/2008; (Kundtz, Paul) Modified on 7/16/2008 to seal document per 7/15/08 Order (RS).
June 26, 2008 Filing 110 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibit 37 (pgs 338-439) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 108 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39 (pgs. 441-442), # 2 Exhibit 41-46 (pgs. 453-476), # 3 Exhibit 47-50 (pgs. 477-487), # 4 Exhibit 56 (pgs. 508-509), # 5 Exhibit 58 (pgs. 519-520), # 6 Exhibit 59-61 (pgs. 521-559), # 7 Exhibit 62 (pgs. 560-604 - Viegas dep.), # 8 Exhibit 63 (pgs. 605-633 Reutens dep.), # 9 Exhibit 64 and 65 (pgs. 634-686, Peter, Endo deps.), # 10 Exhibit 66 (pgs 687-729 Ambler dep.), # 11 Exhibit 67-69 (pgs. 730-784 Liu, Gordon, Birnholz deps.))(Kundtz, Paul)
June 26, 2008 Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT COVER SHEET FOR SEALED EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 108 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2 (pgs 11-53), # 2 Exhibit 6-8 (pages 74-145), # 3 Exhibit 18 and 19 (pgs. 246-258), # 4 Exhibit 21 (pgs. 261-276), # 5 Exhibit 23 (pgs. 279-290), # 6 Exhibit 28-36 (pgs. 309-337))(Kundtz, Paul)
June 26, 2008 Filing 108 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits) Noting Date 6/26/2008; (Kundtz, Paul)
June 20, 2008 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Overlength Brief) Noting Date 6/20/2008; (Lyon, Wendy)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DEFERRING Microsoft's 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim ; Clerk directed to renote motion for 6/27/2008; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re the treatment by the parties of confidential documents by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting plaintiff's 102 Motion to re-file exhibits E,G and I under seal by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 22, 2008 Filing 103 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Treatment By The Parties Of Confidential Documents by parties. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
May 21, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, G, and I by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Re-File Exhibits E, G, and I Under Seal) Noting Date 5/21/2008; (Lyon, Wendy)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying Microsoft's 72 Motion to limit speaking objections by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
May 9, 2008 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Kenneth Lustif in Support of Reply to Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim (Lyon, Wendy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 98 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim (Lyon, Wendy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 97 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 81 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim (Lyon, Wendy)
May 7, 2008 Filing 96 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re 78 SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; ; by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Kundtz, Paul)
May 6, 2008 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Jofrey M. McWilliam filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
May 6, 2008 Filing 94 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
May 6, 2008 Filing 93 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 78 SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ;. (Keller, Bradley)
May 6, 2008 Filing 92 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 81 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim. (Keller, Bradley)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying Immersion's 56 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
May 2, 2008 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Limit Speaking Objections by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 87 MOTION to Seal Ex. A to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Limit Speaking Objections. (Lyon, Wendy)
May 2, 2008 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Limit Speaking Objections filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 72 MOTION for Discovery to Limit Speaking Objections (Lyon, Wendy)
May 2, 2008 Filing 88 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 72 MOTION for Discovery to Limit Speaking Objections (Lyon, Wendy)
May 2, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION to Seal Ex. A to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Limit Speaking Objections by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibit A to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon (Re Microsoft's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Limit Speaking Objections) Under Seal) Noting Date 5/2/2008; (Lyon, Wendy)
April 28, 2008 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Jofrey M. McWilliam in Support of Immersion's Response to Microsoft's "Motion to Limit Speaking Objections" by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 84 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A-D to McWilliam Decl.)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
April 28, 2008 Filing 85 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 72 MOTION for Discovery to Limit Speaking Objections. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
April 28, 2008 Filing 84 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Immersion Corp.'s Mot. to File Under Seal Certain Supporting Docs.) Noting Date 5/2/2008.(McWilliam, Jofrey)
April 24, 2008 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 81 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 24, 2008 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 81 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim (Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 24, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Related to Immersion's Counterclaim by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 5/9/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 24, 2008 Filing 80 SEALED DOCUMENT Amended Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 (adding Ex. L) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3)(Lyon, Wendy)
April 23, 2008 Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 (w/Ex. A-F, pages 5-47) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 78 SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ; SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ;. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits G-K (pages 48-92) to Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to 2nd Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3)(Kundtz, Paul)
April 23, 2008 Filing 78 SEALED MOTION re 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents ;Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Microsoft's Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 5/9/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 (Filed Under Seal))(Kundtz, Paul)
April 23, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Responses to Its Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 and Supporting Documents by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Motion to Compel Responses to Second Requests for Production Nos. 2 and 3 under seal)Noting Date 5/9/2008.(Kundtz, Paul)
April 17, 2008 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment to Dismiss Immersion's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim (Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 17, 2008 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Paul J. Kundtz in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment to Dismiss Immersion's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim (Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 17, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Immersion's Counterclaim)Noting Date 5/9/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
April 17, 2008 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Motion to Limit Speaking Objections (Ex. B filed under Seal) filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 72 MOTION for Discovery to Limit Speaking Objections (Lyon, Wendy)
April 17, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION for Discovery to Limit Speaking Objections by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery and Depositions)Noting Date 5/2/2008.(Lyon, Wendy)
April 17, 2008 Filing 71 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 70 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon. (Lyon, Wendy)
April 17, 2008 Filing 70 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibit B to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon Under Seal)Noting Date 5/2/2008.(Lyon, Wendy)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting plaintiff's 60 Motion to file exhibits A-E under seal re Decl of Wendy E Lyon by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
April 8, 2008 Filing 68 NOTICE re: Potential Conflict With Trial Date ; filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Kaplan, David)
April 3, 2008 Filing 67 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Lyon, Wendy)
March 28, 2008 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Alan J. Heinrich filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Kaplan, David)
March 28, 2008 Filing 65 REPLY, filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Kaplan, David)
March 24, 2008 Filing 64 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits A, B, C, D and E to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 60 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, D and E to Decl. of Wendy Lyon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-1 (pages 26-65)# 2 Exhibit C-2 (pages 66-126)# 3 Exhibit D and E (pages 127-156))(Lyon, Wendy)
March 24, 2008 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Steve Aeschbacher in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Lyon, Wendy)
March 24, 2008 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Immersion's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Lyon, Wendy)
March 24, 2008 Filing 61 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, to 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Immersion Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71)(Lyon, Wendy)
March 24, 2008 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, D and E to Decl. of Wendy Lyon by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits A, B, C, D and E to the Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon Under Seal)Noting Date 3/24/2008.(Lyon, Wendy)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 38 Microsoft's Motion to Compel, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(CL, )
March 20, 2008 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER 43 Proposed Order (Unsigned). The following Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, United States District Judge: The parties have submitted a proposed stipulated order regarding the treatment of confidential documents. However, the parties are clearly in disagreement over the language of the order. Specifically, the parties dispute the language of paragraphs 5(d), 6(c), 7, and 19. Under such circumstances, the Court declines to sign the proposed order. The Court shall only sign a proposed stipulated order that contains undisputed language. (DKo)
March 13, 2008 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Alan J. Heinrich in Support of Immersion Corporation's Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 13, 2008 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7 by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Immersion's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Request Nos. 53, 54 and 71 and Referenced in Response to Interrogatory No. 7)Noting Date 3/28/2008.(McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 10, 2008 Filing 55 Letter from Microsoft in Further Support of Issuance of Letters Rogatory (#46) re 46 Letter from Microsoft Corporation Regarding Letters Rogatory. (Kundtz, Paul)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Microsoft's 26 Motion to Disqualify by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
March 5, 2008 Filing 53 Letter from Immersion In Response To Microsoft's re 46 Letter Requesting Letters Rogatory. (Birnholz, Richard)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The Court GRANTS Pltf's Motions Seal, docket nos. 37 and 45 . (CL, )
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO SEAL AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL; granting 33 Motion to Seal; granting 25 Motion to Seal; granting 29 Motion to Seal by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
February 19, 2008 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation re 46 Letter, 47 Sealed Document, 49 Sealed Document, 48 Declaration of Wendy Lyon. (Lyon, Wendy)
February 19, 2008 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits B, C and D to Wendy Lyons Declaration Re Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation re 45 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits B, C, D, 4, 13, 14 and 17 Under Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, C and D to Wendy Lyons Declaration Re Letters Rogatory# 2)(Lyon, Wendy)
February 19, 2008 Filing 48 SEALED DECLARATION of Wendy E. Lyon re 46 Letter Rogatory with exhibits A and E-I by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Lyon, Wendy) Modified on 5/21/2008 to seal per counsel - motion forthcoming (RS, ).
February 19, 2008 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 4, 13, 14 and 17 to Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation re 45 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits B, C, D, 4, 13, 14 and 17 Under Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, 13, 14 & 17)(Lyon, Wendy)
February 19, 2008 Filing 46 Letter from Microsoft Corporation Regarding Letters Rogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Letters Rogatory# 2 Questions for Shinji Ina with Exhibits 1-3, 5-12, 15-16)(Lyon, Wendy)
February 19, 2008 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits B, C, D, 4, 13, 14 and 17 Under Seal by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 3/7/2008.(Lyon, Wendy)
February 15, 2008 Filing 44 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 38 MOTION to Compel Microsoft's Motion To Compel Responses to Requests For Production Nos. 3 & 19 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Mt. to Compel Responses to RFP Nos. 3 & 19)(Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 13, 2008 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING TREATMENT BY THE PARTIES OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 11, 2008 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Alan J. Heinrich filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 38 MOTION to Compel Microsoft's Motion To Compel Responses to Requests For Production Nos. 3 & 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
February 11, 2008 Filing 41 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 38 MOTION to Compel Microsoft's Motion To Compel Responses to Requests For Production Nos. 3 & 19. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production Nos. 3 and 19)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
January 31, 2008 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 7 of the Decl. of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses to RFP Nos. 3 & 19 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 37 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 7 Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 31, 2008 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses to RFP Nos. 3 & 19 filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 38 MOTION to Compel Microsoft's Motion To Compel Responses to Requests For Production Nos. 3 & 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1 and 8 of the Decl. of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's Motion to Compel Responses to RFP Nos. 3 & 19)(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 31, 2008 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Microsoft's Motion To Compel Responses to Requests For Production Nos. 3 & 19 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 2/15/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 31, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 7 Under Seal by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 7 Under Seal)Noting Date 2/15/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 25, 2008 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. No. 1 to Declaration of BMD In Support of Microsoft's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation of WA's Rule of Prof. Conduct 3.7 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 33 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion To File Exhibit 1 Under Seal. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 25, 2008 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit No. 2 to Declaration of BMD In Support of Microsoft's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP for Violation of WA's Rule of Prof. Conduct 3.7)(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 25, 2008 Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 25, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion To File Exhibit 1 Under Seal by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibit 1 Under Seal)Noting Date 1/25/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 22, 2008 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits 1, 4, 7 and 8 to McWilliam Declaration) by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 29 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
January 22, 2008 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Jofrey M. McWilliam filed by Defendant Immersion Corporation re 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2# 2 Exhibit 3# 3 Exhibit 5# 4 Exhibit 6# 5 Exhibit 9)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
January 22, 2008 Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Microsoft's Motion to Disqualify Irell & Manella)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
January 22, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Certain Supporting Documents by Defendant Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Immersion's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Supporting Documents)Noting Date 1/25/2008.(McWilliam, Jofrey)
January 10, 2008 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B, I, J, K, L, M, P & Q to Dec of Blake Marks-Dias by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 25 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K - 1# 2 Exhibit K- 2# 3 Exhibit L & M # 4 Exhibit P & Q )(Marks-Dias, Blake) Modified on 1/11/2008 (ECS, ).
January 10, 2008 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias In Support of Microsoft's 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, C, D & E# 2 Exhibit F, G, H, N, O, R, S, & T)(Marks-Dias, Blake) Modified on 1/11/2008 (ECS, ).
January 10, 2008 Filing 26 MOTION to Disqualify Irell & Manella LLP For Violation fo Washington's Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 1/25/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 10, 2008 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Exhibits by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Exhibits B, I, J, K, L, M, P & Q Under Seal)Noting Date 1/25/2008.(Marks-Dias, Blake) Modified on 1/11/2008 (ECS, ).
December 27, 2007 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Marsh & McLennan served on 12/18/07. (RS, )
December 12, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE from Mediator James A. Smith, Jr., that on 12/11/07, the parties participated in a mediation. (Smith, James)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *7-10 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/14/2008 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo S Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2007, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/17/2008, Motions due by 5/19/2008, Discovery completed by 6/16/2008, Dispositive motions due by 7/16/2008, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/2/2008, Motions in Limine due by 9/16/2008, Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2008, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/9/2008, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/9/2008 by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
October 31, 2007 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 7-10.. (Kundtz, Paul)
October 11, 2007 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Sony Computer Entertainment America served on 9/13/07. (RS, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Sony Computer Entertainment served on 9/24/07. (RS, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS David R Kaplan as pro hac vice atty for Defendant Immersion Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(RS, )
September 28, 2007 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David R. Kaplan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Immersion Corporation. (RS, )
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2007, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/18/2007, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/25/2007 by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Morgan Chu as pro hac vice atty for Counter Claimant Immersion Corporation, Defendant Immersion Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(RS, )
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Richard M Birnholz as pro hac vice atty for Counter Claimant Immersion Corporation, Defendant Immersion Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(RS, )
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Alan J Heinrich as pro hac vice atty for Counter Claimant Immersion Corporation, Defendant Immersion Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(RS, )
September 18, 2007 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Immersion by Microsoft Corporation.(Kundtz, Paul)
September 17, 2007 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Morgan Chu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Immersion Corporation. (RS, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard M. Birnholz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Immersion Corporation. (RS, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alan J. Heinrich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Immersion Corporation. (RS, )
September 4, 2007 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Microsoft Corporation by Immersion Corporation.(McWilliam, Jofrey)
July 25, 2007 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Cover Sheet for Declaration of Service of Process on Defendant Immersion). (Kundtz, Paul)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Original Complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
June 28, 2007 Filing 5 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 3 MOTION to Seal Original Complaint (Kundtz, Paul)
June 28, 2007 Filing 4 RESPONSE, by Defendant Immersion Corporation, to 3 MOTION to Seal Original Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keller, Bradley)
June 25, 2007 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Original Complaint by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Microsoft's Motion to Seal Original Complaint)Noting Date 6/25/2007.(Kundtz, Paul)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against defendant(s) Immersion Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Kundtz, Paul)
June 18, 2007 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT - JURY DEMANDED - against defendant Immersion Corporation (Summons(es) issued)(Receipt # SEA 10104), filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Email request to file new case)(MKB) Modified on 6/28/2007 to seal per 6/28/07 Order (RS, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Immersion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immersion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?