Soaring Helmet Corporation v. Bill Me Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Soaring Helmet Corporation
Defendant: Bill Me Inc and Google Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00789
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2011 96 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice and with no award of costs, expenses or attorney's fees to any party filed by Soaring Helmet Corporation, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
January 21, 2011 95 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Foster, Stacie)
January 18, 2011 94 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Stacie Foster, Steven Edmiston; Def Counsel: Katherine Hendricks, Stacia Lay; CR: Debbie Zurn; Status Conference held on 1/18/2011. Counsel wish to continue the pretrial conference as they are working towards settling the case. The court continues the pretrial conference to Friday, January 21, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. Trial scheduled to begin Feb. 1, 2011 is continued to Monday, February 7, 2011 at 1:30 p.m.(CC)
January 13, 2011 93 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Nanal, Inc.. (Hendricks, Katherine)
January 11, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference scheduled Tuesday, January 18, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. is rescheduled for 3:00 p.m.(CC)
January 10, 2011 92 DECLARATION of Stacie Foster filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morado, Heather)
January 10, 2011 91 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, to 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (Morado, Heather)
January 10, 2011 90 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 87 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Lay, Stacia)
January 10, 2011 89 RESPONSE, by Defendant Nanal, Inc., to 87 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (Lay, Stacia)
January 5, 2011 Noting Date Set/Reset re 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE : Noting Date 1/14/2011, (CC)
January 4, 2011 88 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 87 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Morado, Heather)
January 4, 2011 87 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/14/2011, (Morado, Heather)
January 4, 2011 86 DECLARATION of Katherine Hendricks in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Motions in Limine filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Hendricks, Katherine)
January 4, 2011 85 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Motions in Limine filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Hendricks, Katherine)
January 4, 2011 84 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendant Nanal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/21/2011, (Hendricks, Katherine)
January 3, 2011 83 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Nanal's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Nanal's Motion to strike (Dkt. # 67 ); denying 74 Soaring Helmet's Motion for Leave to File third amended complaint by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
December 30, 2010 82 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint (Morado, Heather)
December 28, 2010 81 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Morado, Heather)
December 28, 2010 80 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Morado, Heather)
December 22, 2010 79 DECLARATION of Katherine Hendricks in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Hendricks, Katherine)
December 22, 2010 78 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Hendricks, Katherine)
December 22, 2010 77 RESPONSE, by Defendant Nanal, Inc., to 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint. (Hendricks, Katherine)
December 21, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER on motion to strike by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
December 10, 2010 75 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Morado, Heather)
December 10, 2010 74 MOTION for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/31/2010, (Morado, Heather)
December 1, 2010 73 SURREPLY filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's "Praecipe" and Supplemental Declaration of Heather M. Morado in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Hendricks, Katherine)
November 30, 2010 72 NOTICE of Intent to File a Surreply Brief re 71 Declaration, 70 Praecipe-Other ; filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc.. (Hendricks, Katherine)
November 30, 2010 71 Supplemental DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morado, Heather)
November 30, 2010 70 PRAECIPE Replacing Exhibit N by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
November 26, 2010 69 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Summary Judgment Reply filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hendricks, Katherine)
November 26, 2010 68 DECLARATION of Albert Bootesaz in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Summary Judgment Reply filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hendricks, Katherine)
November 26, 2010 67 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hendricks, Katherine)
November 22, 2010 66 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 65 DECLARATION of Stacie Foster filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 64 DECLARATION of Claudia Mallard filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 63 DECLARATION of Joy Loga filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 62 DECLARATION of Wayne Layman filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 61 DECLARATION of Jeanne DeMund filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morado, Heather)
November 22, 2010 60 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Morado, Heather)
November 3, 2010 59 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Hendricks, Katherine)
November 3, 2010 58 DECLARATION of Albert Bootesaz in Support of Defendant Nanal, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hendricks, Katherine)
November 3, 2010 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Nanal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/26/2010, (Hendricks, Katherine)
September 27, 2010 56 SELECTION OF Warren Rheaume as 39.1 mediator filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Foster, Stacie)
September 7, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER re 54 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shahrokh Mokhtarzadeh for Nanal, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2010 54 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shahrokh Mokhtarzadeh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nanal, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2177448. (Hendricks, Katherine)
August 9, 2010 53 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
August 3, 2010 52 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Confidential Information by parties. (Lay, Stacia)
July 28, 2010 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Soaring Helmet Corporation Filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Morado, Heather)
May 20, 2010 50 ANSWER to 48 Amended Complaint by Nanal, Inc..(Hendricks, Katherine)
May 18, 2010 49 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 48 Amended Complaint. (Morado, Heather)
May 13, 2010 48 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nanal, Inc., filed by Soaring Helmet Corporation.(Morado, Heather)
May 11, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Second Amended Complaint, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
April 19, 2010 46 RESPONSE, by Defendant Nanal, Inc., to 43 MOTION to Amend 8 Amended Complaint,. (Hendricks, Katherine)
April 2, 2010 44 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 43 MOTION to Amend 8 Amended Complaint, (Morado, Heather)
April 2, 2010 43 MOTION to Amend 8 Amended Complaint,by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/13/2010, (Morado, Heather)
February 2, 2010 42 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *2-3 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Bench Trial is set for 2/1/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2010, Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2010, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/21/2010, Motions due by 8/20/2010, Discovery completed by 9/20/2010, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2010, Settlement conference to be held by 12/3/2010, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/3/2011, Motions in Limine due by 1/4/2011, Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/24/2011, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/24/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
December 2, 2009 40 ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by Nanal, Inc..(Hendricks, Katherine)
December 2, 2009 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Nanal, Inc. Filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc..(Hendricks, Katherine)
November 4, 2009 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Nanal's Motion to Set Aside Default by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
October 23, 2009 37 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 23, 2009 36 PRAECIPE re 34 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
October 19, 2009 35 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Morado, Heather)
October 19, 2009 34 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, to 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morado, Heather)
October 15, 2009 33 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation, to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint. (Morado, Heather)
October 15, 2009 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Google Inc, filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
October 8, 2009 31 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE on Google Inc.'s Motion to dismiss Counts 2,3,and 4 of the Complaint and RE-NOTING 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint ; RE-Noting Date 10/27/2009, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
October 7, 2009 30 DECLARATION of Shahrokh Mokhtarzadeh in Support of Motion of Defendant Nanal, Inc. to Set Aside Default filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 7, 2009 29 DECLARATION of Albert Bootesaz in Support of Motion of Defendant Nanal, Inc. to Set Aside Default filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 7, 2009 28 DECLARATION of Katherine Hendricks in Support of Motion of Defendant Nanal, Inc. to Set Aside Default filed by Defendant Nanal, Inc. re 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 7, 2009 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Defendant Nanal, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Defendant Nanal, Inc. to Set Aside Default) Noting Date 10/23/2009, (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 7, 2009 26 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GOOGLE INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II, III AND IV OF THE COMPLAINT by parties. (Swope, Karin)
October 7, 2009 25 DECLARATION of Jule Brazitis re 19 Declaration, 22 Order on Motion for Default by Defendant Google Inc. (Swope, Karin)
October 6, 2009 24 RESPONSE by Defendant Google Inc re 19 Declaration Defendant Googles Response To Plaintiffs Proposed Order For Default Judgment Against Nanal, Inc.[Docket 18]. (Swope, Karin)
October 5, 2009 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Hendricks on behalf of Defendant Nanal, Inc.. (Hendricks, Katherine)
October 2, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Default- default entered against defendant Nanal, Inc. by Clerk Bruce Rifkin.(BR)
October 2, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED TO BRUCE RIFKIN, CLERK: re 18 MOTION for Default filed by Soaring Helmet Corporation (MD)
October 1, 2009 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 18 MOTION for Default. (Morado, Heather)
October 1, 2009 20 DECLARATION of Steven W. Edmiston filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 18 MOTION for Default (Morado, Heather)
October 1, 2009 19 DECLARATION of Heather M. Morado filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 18 MOTION for Default (Morado, Heather)
October 1, 2009 18 MOTION for Default by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2009, (Morado, Heather)
September 3, 2009 17 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER For Briefing Schedule on Google Inc's Motion to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint, docket # 12 by Judge James L. Robart. Noting Date 10/16/2009. (KL)
September 3, 2009 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation re 15 Stipulation. (Foster, Stacie)
September 3, 2009 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Briefing Schedule on Google Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint by parties re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint. (Foster, Stacie)
August 21, 2009 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *4 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Jury Trial is set for 1/31/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2009, Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2010, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/4/2010, Motions due by 9/3/2010, Discovery completed by 10/4/2010, Dispositive motions due by 11/2/2010, Settlement conference to be held by 12/2/2010, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/3/2011, Motions in Limine due by 1/3/2011, Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/24/2011, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/24/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
August 19, 2009 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nanal, Inc. on 8/6/2009 (Morado, Heather)
August 17, 2009 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint by Defendant Google Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Googles Motion to Dimiss) Noting Date 9/11/2009, (Swope, Karin)
August 17, 2009 11 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
July 28, 2009 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Morado, Heather) (sms issued and mailed to atty H. Morado).(CL).
July 27, 2009 9 ERRATA re 8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
July 27, 2009 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by Soaring Helmet Corporation.(Morado, Heather)
July 16, 2009 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Scott LaScala of The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent for Google, Inc. on 6/16/2009, filed by Plaintiff Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Morado, Heather)
July 15, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret M Caruso for Google Inc, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
July 14, 2009 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margaret M. Caruso FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Google Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001803268. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Registration Form for ECF Filing System)(Swope, Karin)
July 14, 2009 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karin Bornstein Swope on behalf of Defendant Google Inc. (Swope, Karin)
June 17, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2009, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/3/2009, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2009, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
June 10, 2009 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (PM)
June 9, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants (Summons(es) issued)(Receipt # SEA 26758)filed by Soaring Helmet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Transmittal email)(PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soaring Helmet Corporation v. Bill Me Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soaring Helmet Corporation
Represented By: Heather M Morado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Me Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?