Walker v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kathy Walker
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2009cv01750
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Damages, and dismissing the case; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER striking 20 Motion to Dismiss (with leave to re-file); 14 Motion for payment of damages is re-noted to 12/20/2010, with Respondent's (12-pg) response due by 12/14/10 and Petitioner's (6-pg) reply due by 12/20/10. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 14 MOTION for payment of damages for vehicle filed by Kathy Walker. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2010; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re 14 MOTION for payment of damages for vehicle : motion is re-noted to 11/29/2010; signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Continue: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2010, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Walker
Represented By: Leanne M. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?