Pepsi Bottling Group Inc v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Pepsi Bottling Group Inc
Defendant: Donald Thomas, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv00054
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S 48 Motion for Attorney Fees and Defendant's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT in favor of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Donald Thomas against Pepsi Bottling Group Inc; signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER striking 35 Emergency Motion to Enjoin King County Superior Court; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepsi Bottling Group Inc v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pepsi Bottling Group Inc
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Michael A Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?