Amazon.com LLC v. Lay Featured Case

Plaintiff: Amazon.com LLC
Defendant: Kenneth R Lay
Case Number: 2:2010cv00664
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 82 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 Stipulated judgment re: complaint in intervention filed by Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1-6 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
January 28, 2011 81 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 Stipulated Dismissal of remaining claims of intervenors' complaint in intervention against deft in intervention David W. Hoyle filed by Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 3 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
January 28, 2011 80 JUDGMENT BY COURT - THE COURT HAS ORDERED THATOn October 25, 2010, the Court granted Amazon.com LLCs motion for summaryjudgment on all claims except Amazon.com LLCs state constitutional claims. Amazon.com LLC has since amended its complaint to remove those claims. The Plaintiffs-Intervenors have separately filed a stipulated judgment, dismissing their claims, which the Court has accepted. (Dkt. Nos. 75, 76). Judgment is entered in favor of Amazon.com LLC, as set forth in the Courts order on Amazon.com LLCs summary judgment motion. This matter is now closed. (MD)
January 26, 2011 79 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN A SEPARATE DOCUMENT ; filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC. (Caplow, Steven)
January 26, 2011 78 NOTICE of Amendment of Complaint with Defendant's Consent Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) re 1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC. (Caplow, Steven)
January 26, 2011 77 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 (Fine, Aden)
January 26, 2011 76 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Dismissal by parties. (Fine, Aden) Modified text on 1/27/2011 (MD).
January 26, 2011 75 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Judgment by parties. (Fine, Aden)
November 29, 2010 74 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER 73 Stipulation to continue deadlines filed by David W Hoyle. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/14/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/21/2011, Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2011, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
November 19, 2010 73 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Rule 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McKay, Michael)
November 8, 2010 72 ANSWER to 61 Intervenor Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by David W Hoyle. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McKay, Michael)
November 2, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION re 70 Notice filed by Defendant Kenneth R Lay. Defendant David W Hoyle added. Defendant Kenneth R Lay terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
November 1, 2010 70 NOTICE of Substitution of Party ; filed by Defendant Kenneth R Lay. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McKay, Michael)
October 25, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 64 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
October 13, 2010 68 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Steven Caplow, David Zapolsky, Laura Handman, Aden Fine, Sarah Dunne, Venkat Balasubramani; Def Counsel: Kay Hobart, Tiare Smiley, Thomas Brennan; CR: Danae Hovland; Motion Hearing held on 10/13/2010 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention filed by Kenneth R Lay, 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth R Lay, 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amazon.com LLC. Oral argument presented. Written opinion will issue. (RM)
September 24, 2010 67 REPLY, filed by Defendant Kenneth R Lay, TO RESPONSE to 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Fifth Declaration of H. Alan Woodard, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
September 23, 2010 66 NOTICE of Hearing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention, 43 MOTION to Dismiss, 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The parties have 20 minutes for argument on the two motions to dismiss, including rebuttal and 20 minutes for argument on the motion for summary judgment, including rebuttal. (RM)
September 20, 2010 65 RESPONSE, by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, to 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Fine, Aden)
September 2, 2010 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention by Defendant Kenneth R Lay. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 4th Declaration of H. Alan Woodard, # 3 Declaration of Joseph A. Tetro, # 4 Declaration of Kenneth R. Lay, # 5 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 9/24/2010, (Brennan, Thomas)
September 2, 2010 63 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Mariko Hirose for Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6. (Hirose, Mariko)
August 17, 2010 62 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Kay Linn Miller Hobart for Defendant Kenneth R Lay from 9/2/10 to 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Miller Hobart, Kay)
August 16, 2010 61 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Jane Doe 2, Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hirose, Mariko)
August 13, 2010 60 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC re 43 MOTION to Dismiss (Caplow, Steven)
August 13, 2010 59 NOTICE OF INTENT AND REQUEST TO FILE SURREPLY ; filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC. (Caplow, Steven)
August 12, 2010 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 23 Motions to Intervene using pseudonyms by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
August 9, 2010 57 PRAECIPE to attach document (declaration) "wet" signature to the Second Declaration of Jennifer Galbreath re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC. (Caplow, Steven)
August 6, 2010 56 REPLY, filed by Defendant Kenneth R Lay, TO RESPONSE to 43 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Alan Woodard, # 2 Exhibit 1-7 to Woodard Declaration, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
August 6, 2010 55 Second DECLARATION of Jennifer Galbreath filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Caplow, Steven)
August 6, 2010 54 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC, TO RESPONSE to 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Caplow, Steven)
August 2, 2010 53 RESPONSE, by Defendant Kenneth R Lay, to 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Alan Woodard, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
August 2, 2010 52 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC, to 43 MOTION to Dismiss. Oral Argument Requested. (Caplow, Steven)
August 2, 2010 51 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 re 43 MOTION to Dismiss (Hirose, Mariko)
July 23, 2010 50 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, TO RESPONSE to 21 MOTION to Intervene (Hirose, Mariko)
July 23, 2010 49 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, TO RESPONSE to 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Hirose, Mariko)
July 23, 2010 48 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Cecil Bothwell, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Cecil Bothwell, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Rudinger)(Hirose, Mariko)
July 15, 2010 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC re 45 Declaration, 46 Declaration, 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Caplow, Steven)
July 15, 2010 46 DECLARATION of Zapolsky filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Caplow, Steven)
July 15, 2010 45 DECLARATION of Galbreath filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Caplow, Steven)
July 15, 2010 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/6/2010, (Caplow, Steven)
July 12, 2010 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Kenneth R Lay. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of H. Alan Woodard, # 3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 8/6/2010, (Brennan, Thomas)
July 12, 2010 42 RESPONSE, by Defendant Kenneth R Lay, to 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
July 12, 2010 41 RESPONSE, by Defendant Kenneth R Lay, to 21 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
July 9, 2010 40 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 Stipulation extending time for Rule 26(f) conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report filed by Kenneth R Lay, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
July 7, 2010 39 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Rule 26(f) Conference, Initial Discolosures and Joint Status Report by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Thomas)
June 30, 2010 38 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE time and Re-Noting Intervenors' Motions re: 21 MOTION to Intervene, 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS : RE-Noting Date 7/23/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
June 30, 2010 37 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS, 21 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smiley, Tiare)
June 24, 2010 36 Featured Case ORDER re 33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine Lewis Parker for Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 and Cecil Bothwell, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 24, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER re 32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mariko Hirose for Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 and Cecil Bothwell, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 24, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER re 31 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aden J. Fine for Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 and Cecil Bothwell, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 23, 2010 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine Lewis Parker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002109935. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
June 23, 2010 32 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mariko Hirose FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002109919. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
June 23, 2010 31 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aden J. Fine FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002109883. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
June 23, 2010 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS, 29 Declaration, 27 Declaration, 24 Declaration, 26 Declaration, 25 Declaration, 28 Declaration. (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 29 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 6 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 28 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 5 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 27 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 4 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 26 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 3 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 25 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 2 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 24 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 1 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 23 MOTION for Leave TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION USING PSEUDONYMS by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/9/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intervenor Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Cecil Bothwell re 21 MOTION to Intervene. (Dunne, Sarah)
June 23, 2010 21 MOTION to Intervene Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/9/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
June 18, 2010 20 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Answer re 19 Stipulation filed by Kenneth R Lay; Answer or other responsive pleading is due 7/12/10 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TF)
June 16, 2010 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Answer by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brennan, Thomas)
June 10, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2010, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/8/2010, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/15/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
June 10, 2010 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case (AE)
May 10, 2010 16 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel and Waiver of Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Amazon.com LLC on April 20, 2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caplow, Steven)
May 10, 2010 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 6/1/2010. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
May 3, 2010 Attorney Thomas Matthew Brennan for Kenneth R Lay, Krista Kay Bush for Kenneth R Lay added per 10 Notice of Appearance. (KN)
April 30, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER re 12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kay Linn Miller Hobart for Kenneth R Lay, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 30, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tiara B. Smiley for Kenneth R Lay, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 30, 2010 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kay Linn Miller Hobart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Kenneth R Lay (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002057562. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration Form)(McKay, Michael)
April 30, 2010 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tiare B. Smiley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Kenneth R Lay (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002057532. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration Form)(McKay, Michael)
April 30, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael D McKay on behalf of Defendant Kenneth R Lay. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McKay, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com LLC v. Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com LLC
Represented By: Steven P Caplow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?