CASCADE YARNS, INC. v. KNITTING FEVER, INC. et al

Plaintiff: CASCADE YARNS, INC.
Defendant: KNITTING FEVER, INC., DESIGNER YARNS, LTD., a Corporation, FILATURA PETTINATA V.V.G. DI STEFANO VACCARI & C. (S.A.S.), and entity organized or existing under the laws of Italy, SION ELALOUF, DIANE ELALOUF, JAY OPPERMAN, DEBBIE BLISS and DAVID WATT
Case Number: 2:2010cv00861
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2015 1178 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL ORDER granting Cascade Dfts' motion for jgm as a matter of law; jgm shall be entered against Knitting Fever and KFI on their remaining counterclaims; remaining claims by Cascade Yarns for inj relief are moot; jgm entered against Cascade on Lanham Act and common law unfair competition claims by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
April 15, 2015 1140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS granting in part and denying in part 1049 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 1055 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 1090 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 1115 Motion for Relief from Deadlines; granting 1124 Motion to Seal; denying 1131 Motion for Sanctions by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
October 16, 2014 1082 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Cascade's 1073 Motion for TRO and Anti-Suit Injunction by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
September 30, 2014 1070 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINES by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Cascade's 1059 Motion for Relief from Deadline to Bring Motions Related to Discovery is DENIED and Cascade's 1060 Motion for Relief from Deadline to Submit Declarations in Opposition for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (LMK)
December 20, 2013 998 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 994 Motion for Relief from deadlines; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/24/2014, Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2014, Motions due by 2/21/2014, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
November 13, 2013 987 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS; denying dft's 976 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Sever Country of Origin Counterclaims filed by Knitting Fever Inc, KFI, Inc., granting pltf's 963 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by C ascade Yarns Inc, denying as moot pltf's 967 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Conduct Discovery to Support Defense to "Country of Origin" Counterclaim and Continue Trial Date filed by Cascade Yarns Inc. Case C13-674RSM is consolidated with this case; all future pleadings and orders to be filed under C10-861RSM by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
September 3, 2013 961 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Cascade's 950 Motion for relief from deadlines, the motion for consolidation shall be filed within 2 weeks; denying Cascade's 958 Motion for relief from deadline to renew motion for summary judgment on country of origin claims by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 11, 2013 930 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 900 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 1, 2013 929 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 923 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph P. Grasser and Amy E Rose withdrawn for Cascade Yarns, Dunbabin parties by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 7, 2013 919 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft Emmepieffie SRL's 905 Motion to Dismiss Party by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
November 16, 2012 903 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON RULE 72(a) OBJECTION; Foster Peper's Rule 72(a) Objection 866 to the order denying reconsideration is overruled and the sanctions imposed by Magistrate Judge Donohue are sustained by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
November 14, 2012 902 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on pltf's 883 Motion for relief from deadlines by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
October 31, 2012 892 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING TRIAL DATE AND PENDING MOTIONS; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
October 29, 2012 886 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 715 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 717 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 724 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
October 18, 2012 865 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 738 Motion to exclude reports and testimony of Kenneth D Langley by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
October 15, 2012 854 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO SEAL; denying 714 Motion to Seal; denying 725 Motion to Seal; denying 747 Motion to Seal; denying 756 Motion to Seal; denying 766 Motion to Seal; granting 776 Motion to Seal ; clerk directed to unseal documents 730, 731, 748, 752, 761 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 24, 2012 711 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER - 13 re dfts' 7/23/12 letter to the court by Hon. James P. Donohue. (RS)
June 22, 2012 692 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER - 8 granting in part, denying in part and reserving ruling in part dft's motion 647 to compel by Hon. James P. Donohue. (RS)
June 21, 2012 684 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER - 6 denying dfts' 641 Motion re first set of requests for production by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS)
June 19, 2012 679 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER - 3 granting pltf's 661 Motion re dft Knitting Fever's notice of depo to third party dft Robert Dunbabin Sr by Hon. James P. Donohue. (RS)
April 10, 2012 612 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on pltf's 406 Motion re continuing guarantees by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 6, 2012 610 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON ATTORNEY'S FEES re 548 Statement filed by Cascade Yarns Inc by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
April 5, 2012 609 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO SEAL AND MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS; denying pltf's 522 Motion to Seal; granting pltf's 523 Motion to de-designate documents; denying pltf's 570 Motion to Seal ; clerk shall unseal docs 525 and 573 within 3 days unless pltf has filed a notice before that date that the docs be withdrawn by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 4, 2012 608 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 521 Motion to compel Sion Elalouf to verify interrogatory response by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 24, 2012 596 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER striking 437 Motion to Compel; denying 440 Motion for Protective Order; striking 465 Motion to Compel; striking 468 Motion to Compel; striking 471 Motion to Compel; striking 474 Motion to Compel; striking 478 Motion to Compel; striking 481 Motion to Compel ; pltf's motion to compel 526 is referred to Hon James Donohue by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 21, 2012 590 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL; denying pltf's 446 Motion to Seal; Clerk directed to unseal document 449 ; denying pltf's 467 Motion to Seal; Clerk directed to unseal document 470 ; striking pltf's 473 Motion to Seal; granting pltf's 477 Motion to Seal; striking pltf's 483 Motion to Seal by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
January 10, 2012 496 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on pltf's 412 Motion to Compel responses to requests for production and interrogatories by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
August 8, 2011 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 256 Third Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 19, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying pltf's 201 Motion to strike; granting pltf's 224 Motion for Leave to File TAC; denying third party dft Shannon Dunbabin's 232 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 18, 2011 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 162 Motion for alternative service by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 16, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 132 Second Motion for Expedited Discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
January 20, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft Knitting Fever's 157 Motion to Continue ; striking pltf's 151 Motion for Summary Judgment from the court's calendar by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
January 3, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dfts' 34 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part dfts' 37 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim ; 1/11/11 oral argument is stricken by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASCADE YARNS, INC. v. KNITTING FEVER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASCADE YARNS, INC.
Represented By: Robert J Guite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNITTING FEVER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIGNER YARNS, LTD., a Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FILATURA PETTINATA V.V.G. DI STEFANO VACCARI & C. (S.A.S.), and entity organized or existing under the laws of Italy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SION ELALOUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE ELALOUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY OPPERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE BLISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?