Caylor et al v The City of Seattle, et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Caylor and W.C.
Defendant: The City of Seattle and Officer Eugene Schubeck
Case Number: 2:2011cv01217
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. The court is satisfied that the trust agreement adequately protects the interests of W.C., and therefore approves it. The court orders as a condition of its approval of the trust that Plaintiff Nathaniel Caylor shall contribute an additional $10,000 to its corpus. (VE)
June 26, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court DENIES Plaintiffs' 151 motion for reconsideration of the court's May 23 order staying this matter pending the resolution of Defendants' interlocutory appeals. (CL)
May 23, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS Defendants Don Leslie and Eugene Schubeck to stay this action (Dkt. ## 131, 137) pending resolution of their interlocutory appeal. With the exception of two motions to seal (Dkt. ## 115, 117), which the court will address in a separate order, the court directs the clerk to TERMINATE all pending motions in this action, VACATE the trial date and all pending pretrial deadlines, and STAY this action pending further order of the court. (CL)
May 22, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants Eugene Schubeck and Don Leslie have appealed a portion of this courts April 30 order denying their motions for summary judgment. They now have each moved to stay this case in its entirety pending the disposition of that appeal. This order does not resolve those motions (Dkt. ## 131, 137); it requires Defendants to submit supplemental briefing. No later than 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, May 23, Defendants shall submit a supplemental brief, by Judge Richard A Jones. (MD)
April 30, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Officer Eugene Schubeck, The City of Seattle, 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Don Leslie by Judge Richard A Jones. A jury will decide Mr. Caylor's § 19 83 excessive force claim against Ofc. Schubeck and Ofc. Leslie, his son's § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment claim against the same officers, and Plaintiffs' negligent investigation and outrage claims against the City. The court dismisses all other claims with prejudice. (JJ)
April 2, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part motions to exclude plaintiffs' expert witnesses and for relief from the deadline for designating rebuttal experts, docket nos. 54 and 56 . (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caylor et al v The City of Seattle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Caylor
Represented By: Timothy K. Ford
Represented By: David J Whedbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.C.
Represented By: Timothy K. Ford
Represented By: David J Whedbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Seattle
Represented By: Evan D Bariault
Represented By: Theron A Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eugene Schubeck
Represented By: Evan D Bariault
Represented By: Theron A Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?