In re L&L Energy Inc Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Jeff Mills and Gregg Irvin
Defendant: L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Jung Mei Wang, Ian G. Robinson, Shirley Kiang, Robert Lee, Dennis Bracy and Robert Okun
Petitioner: Mark Stites, L&L Energy Investor Group, Aleksandar Krstevski and The Evaldez Family
In Re: L&L Energy Inc Securities Litigation
Case Number: 2:2011cv01423
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER transferring action to Southern District of New York for purposes of settlement by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 29, 2014 Case sent to District of New York, Southern by electronic case transfer (RS)
May 28, 2014 Filing 103 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT by parties. (Greene, Douglas)
May 23, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell M Aoki on behalf of Defendant Dickson V. Lee. (Aoki, Russell)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER substituting Attorney Russell M Aoki for Dickson V. Lee ; withdrawing Attorneys Ryan P McBride; Erin M. Wilson; Larry Steven Gangnes and Douglas W Greene by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 22, 2014 Filing 100 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DICKSON V. LEE by parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gangnes, Larry)
May 16, 2014 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #99 Status Report : Document filed by L&L Energy only (RS)
May 15, 2014 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT Re Mediation/Settlement by Defendants L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee (Gangnes, Larry) Modified on 5/16/2014 to indicate proper filer (RS).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER for temporary stay pending settlement efforts by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
March 4, 2014 Filing 97 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Temporary Stay Pending Settlement Efforts by parties. (Gangnes, Larry)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying pltf's #88 Motion to delay consideration of summary judgment motion as moot by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying dfts' #81 Motion to Dismiss the third amended class action complaint by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 2, 2013 Filing 94 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #87 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip Kim ("Kim Decl."), #2 Exhibit 1 to Kim Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Kim Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Kim Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Kim Decl.)(Kim, Phillip)
July 22, 2013 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #93 Reply to Response to Motion, : This document is a Response, not a Reply (RS)
July 19, 2013 Filing 93 REPLY RESPONSE filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson, to #88 MOTION delay consideration of motion for summary judgment (Gangnes, Larry) Modified on 7/22/2013 to reflect that this is a response, not a reply (RS).
July 19, 2013 Filing 92 RESPONSIVE BRIEF (Certain Defendants' Combined Reply ISO 3rd Request for Judicial Notice and in Answer to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections) re #85 Response (non motion), #86 Objections, #82 Request, by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. oa. (Gangnes, Larry)
July 19, 2013 Filing 91 REPLY, filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson, TO RESPONSE to #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Gangnes, Larry)
June 25, 2013 Filing 90 ERRATA re #85 Response (non motion) Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Kim, Phillip)
June 19, 2013 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Laurence M. Rosen filed by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #88 MOTION delay consideration of motion for summary judgment re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #85 Response (non motion), #82 Request, (Kim, Phillip)
June 19, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION delay consideration of motion for summary judgment re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #85 Response (non motion), #82 Request, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2013, (Kim, Phillip)
June 19, 2013 Filing 87 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin, to #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Kim, Phillip)
June 19, 2013 Filing 86 OBJECTIONS re #82 Request, Evidentiary objections to Defendants' Requests for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Kim, Phillip)
June 19, 2013 Filing 85 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin re #82 Request, Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip)
April 12, 2013 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Jianjian Wang filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1 and 2)(McBride, Ryan)
April 12, 2013 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Liyu Jin filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (McBride, Ryan)
April 12, 2013 Filing 82 REQUEST by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson for Judicial Notice re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5)(McBride, Ryan)
April 12, 2013 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/19/2013, (McBride, Ryan)
February 4, 2013 Filing 80 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Ian G. Robinson, Jung Mei Wang with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gregg Irvin.(Kim, Phillip)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING (1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 25, 2013 Filing 78 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re (1) Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint and (2) Schedule by parties re #73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (Gangnes, Larry)
January 18, 2013 Filing 77 ERRATA re #74 Declaration by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (TAC with Errata Redline), #2 Exhibit B (Clean TAC with Errata), #3 Exhibit C (SAC with changes from TAC and Errata Redline))(Kim, Phillip)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTING #73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ; Noting Date 2/15/2013, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
January 11, 2013 Filing 75 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule on Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint by parties re #73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (Gangnes, Larry)
January 2, 2013 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin re #73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Redline Version of TAC, #2 Exhibit 2, Clean TAC with Exhibits)(Kim, Phillip)
January 2, 2013 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/18/2013, (Kim, Phillip)
December 20, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2012 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206-370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2013, (KM)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting dfts' #37 Motion to Dismiss and the second amended class action complaint is dismissed; pltf may file a motion to amend within 30 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 27, 2012 Filing 70 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik- Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Laurence Rosen and Liz Zultoski; Def Counsel: Douglas Greene and Larry Gangnes; CR: Kari McGrath; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2012 re #37 Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Robert Okun, Shirley Kiang, Robert Lee, L&L Energy Inc, Ian G. Robinson, Dickson V. Lee, Dennis Bracy. After hearing the arguments of counsel, the Court takes this matter under advisement. An Order shall issue. (KERR)
November 1, 2012 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on #37 Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 21, 2012 Filing 68 REPLY by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson to #59 Request,, Second For Judicial Notice. (Gangnes, Larry)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
September 18, 2012 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM re #59 Request,, In Opposition to Second Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Kim, Phillip)
September 17, 2012 Filing 65 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (McBride, Ryan)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 5 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
September 5, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Douglas W Greene. Filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (Greene, Douglas) Modified Address on 10/2/2012 (DS).
August 31, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas W Greene on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (Greene, Douglas)
August 31, 2012 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Hua Nan filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Gangnes, Larry)
August 31, 2012 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Jiang Shuai filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gangnes, Larry)
August 31, 2012 Filing 59 REQUEST SECOND by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson for Second Request for Judicial Notice re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Gangnes, Larry)
August 31, 2012 Filing 58 REPLY by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson, Plaintiff Jeff Mills to #40 Request, For Judicial Notice. (Gangnes, Larry)
August 31, 2012 Filing 57 REPLY, filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson, TO RESPONSE to #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Gangnes, Larry)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Defendants' #52 Motion for Extension of Time, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The court directs the clerk of Court to re-note motion to dismiss (Dkt. #37 ) to August 31, 2012. (CL)
August 6, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY, filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson, TO RESPONSE to #52 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss (Gangnes, Larry)
August 3, 2012 Filing 54 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin, to #52 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Kim, Phillip)
August 2, 2012 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Larry S. Gangnes filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #52 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss (Gangnes, Larry)
August 2, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Dennis Bracy, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/10/2012, (Gangnes, Larry)
July 24, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #47 Response (non motion) ; filed by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Case)(Kim, Phillip)
June 29, 2012 Filing 50 ERRATA re #45 Response to Motion RE: Formatting by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Errata Table of Contents and Authorities)(Kim, Phillip)
June 28, 2012 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Jonathan Horne re #40 Request, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Kim, Phillip)
June 28, 2012 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Yuxia Zhang re #40 Request, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin. (Kim, Phillip)
June 28, 2012 Filing 47 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin re #40 Request,. (Kim, Phillip)
June 28, 2012 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Kim, Phillip)
June 28, 2012 Filing 45 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregg Irvin, to #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Kim, Phillip)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
June 12, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER extending briefing schedule by parties re #34 Stipulation and Order. (Kim, Phillip)
April 23, 2012 Filing 42 EXHIBIT 21-26, pp 489-577 re #41 Exhibit, #40 Request, by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27-36, pp 578-665, #2 Exhibit 37-38, pp 666-726)(Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 41 EXHIBIT 09-10, pp 236-313 re #40 Request, by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-17, pp 314-399, #2 Exhibit 18-20, pp 400-488)(Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 40 REQUEST by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson for Judicial Notice re #39 Declaration, #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #38 Declaration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, pp 11-125, #2 Exhibit 02-08, pp 126-235)(Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Alan P. Lai filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, pp 5-45)(Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Edmund C. Moy filed by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, pp 5-53, #2 Exhibit F-J, pp 54-95)(Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Robert Okun, Ian G. Robinson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2012, (Gangnes, Larry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Larry Steven Gangnes on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, Robert Lee, Robert Okun. (Gangnes, Larry)
April 11, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing on Motion to Dismiss by parties re #34 Stipulation and Order. (Gangnes, Larry)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re fiing of second amended complaint and revised briefing schedule on motion to dismiss by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
March 2, 2012 Filing 33 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gregg Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kim, Phillip)
February 29, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS by parties re #31 Amended Complaint, #29 Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Kim, Phillip)
February 8, 2012 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gregg Irvin.(Kim, Phillip)
January 6, 2012 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Gangnes, Larry)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding amended complaint and briefing schedule on motion to dismiss by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
December 23, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATION /[PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS by parties re #27 Joint Status Report Order. (Kim, Phillip)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2012, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPOINTING GREGG IRVIN AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, ROSEN LAW FIRM PA AS LEAD COUNSEL AND SMITH AND LOWNEY PLLC AS LIAISON COUNSEL; denying #9 Motion to Appoint; denying #10 Motion to Appoint; denying #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #16 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; clerk directed to alter caption by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 9, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Larry Steven Gangnes on behalf of Defendants L&L Energy Inc, Dickson V. Lee, Ian G. Robinson. (Gangnes, Larry)
November 14, 2011 Noting Date Set/Reset re #10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel : Noting Date 11/11/2011, (RS)
November 11, 2011 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Movant Gregg Irvin, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Kim, Phillip)
November 7, 2011 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Movant Mark Stites, to #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff. (Cantor, Clifford)
November 7, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Movant Aleksandar Krstevski, to #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion Of The Evaldez Family For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Appointment Of Lead Counsel, #9 MOTION to Appoint Mark Stites as lead plaintiff and to appoint lead counsel. (Spurr, William)
November 7, 2011 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Movant Gregg Irvin, to #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion Of The Evaldez Family For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Appointment Of Lead Counsel, #9 MOTION to Appoint Mark Stites as lead plaintiff and to appoint lead counsel. (Kim, Phillip)
November 7, 2011 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Movant The Evaldez Family, to #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #9 MOTION to Appoint Mark Stites as lead plaintiff and to appoint lead counsel. Oral Argument Requested. (Leland, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING #18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due within 5 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
October 25, 2011 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Movant Gregg Irvin re #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kim, Phillip)
October 25, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Movant Gregg Irvin. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/11/2011, (Kim, Phillip)
October 25, 2011 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Juli E. Farris filed by Movant The Evaldez Family re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion Of The Evaldez Family For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Appointment Of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice published on August 26, 2011, announcing the filing of a securities class action against L&L Energy, Inc., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Evaldez Familys signed Certifications and loss charts analyzing its transactions in L&L securities during the Class Period, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll firm resume, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Keller Rohrback L.L.P. firm resume)(Farris, Juli)
October 25, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion Of The Evaldez Family For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Appointment Of Lead Counsel by Movant The Evaldez Family. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting the Motion Of The Evaldez Family For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Appointment Of Lead Counsel) Noting Date 11/11/2011, (Farris, Juli)
October 25, 2011 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Albert Y. Chang filed by Movant Aleksandar Krstevski re #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Spurr, William)
October 25, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Movant Aleksandar Krstevski. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/18/2011, (Spurr, William)
October 25, 2011 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Roger M. Townsend filed by Movant L&L Energy Investor Group re #10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Townsend, Roger)
October 25, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint (1) As Lead Plaintiff & (2) Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel by Movant L&L Energy Investor Group. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order L&L Energy Investor Group) Noting Date 10/25/2011, (Townsend, Roger)
October 25, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Mark Stites as lead plaintiff and to appoint lead counsel by Movant Mark Stites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cantor declaration, #3 Cantor decl Ex A, #4 Cantor decl Ex B, #5 Cantor decl Ex C, #6 Cantor decl Ex D, #7 Cantor decl Ex E) Noting Date 11/11/2011, (Cantor, Clifford)
October 24, 2011 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant L&L Energy Inc on 9/9/2011 (Kim, Phillip)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence M. Rosen for Jeff Mills, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Phillip C. Kim for Jeff Mills, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 22, 2011 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence M. Rosen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jeff Mills (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2564731. (Lowney, Eric)
September 22, 2011 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Philip C. Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jeff Mills (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2564709. (Lowney, Eric)
August 29, 2011 Filing 3 Laurence Rosen and Pillip Kim advised via ad hoc notice of requirement to appear pro hac vice and of ECF registration requirements. (MKB)
August 29, 2011 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MKB)
August 29, 2011 Summons Issued as to all Defendants via USPS. (MKB)
August 26, 2011 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT additional summons by Plaintiff Jeff Mills. (Smith, Richard)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2538155), filed by Jeff Mills. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Smith, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re L&L Energy Inc Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Mills
Represented By: Eric D Lowney
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Irvin
Represented By: Eric D Lowney
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&L Energy Inc
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickson V. Lee
Represented By: Russell M Aoki
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Mei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian G. Robinson
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Kiang
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Bracy
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: E Wilson
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Okun
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Larry Steven Gangnes
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: L&L Energy Inc Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Stites
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L&L Energy Investor Group
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aleksandar Krstevski
Represented By: William R Spurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Evaldez Family
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?