Institute of Cetacean Research et al v. Sea Shepherd Conservation Society et al
Plaintiff: Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa and Toshiyuki Miura
Defendant: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society and Paul Watson
Interested Party: Ocean Defenders Alliance
Counter Defendant: Hiroyuki Komura
Case Number: 2:2011cv02043
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Breach of Release and Settlement Agreement; re parties' #359 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Defendants' Breach of Release and Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Defendants' Breach of Release and Settlement Agreement, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1) Noting Date 3/23/2017, (Neupert, John)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #352 Motion to clarify and clarifies the injunction as explained in this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Supplemental DECLARATION of Claire Loebs Davis filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10)(Davis, Claire)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction (Davis, Claire)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion to Clarify Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd. re #352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Exhibit 6)(Neupert, John)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., to #352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 DECLARATION of Claire Loebs Davis filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Davis, Claire)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Clarify Permanent Injunction by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/9/2016, (Davis, Claire)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 LETTER from CT Corporation System to Homma & Partners. (PM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2016 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016, (ND)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa for proceedings held on 08/22/2016, Requesting Attorney: John F Neupert. (Neupert, John)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. (RE)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 JUDGMENT BY COURT; Pursuant to the parties' stipulated motion (Dkt. # #343 , #344 , #345 ), the parties are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED as described in the court's order (Dkt. #346 ) and the remaining claims and counterclaims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (PM)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting #343 Stipulated Motion for Permanent Injunction. (AD)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 345 LETTER from John Neupert re #344 Proposed Order (Unsigned) (Letter to Judge Robart re correction to proposed Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment, Dkt. 344) (Neupert, John)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #343 Stipulated MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment (Proposed Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment) (Neupert, John)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Stipulated MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1) Noting Date 8/22/2016, (Neupert, John)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert; Def Counsel: Claire Davis; CR: Nickie Drury; Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2016. The parties advise the case has been resolved. Counsel shall file a stipulated permanent injunction. (CC)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Conference is scheduled Monday, August 22, 2016 at 2:45 p.m. before Judge James L. Robart. The clerk will initiate the call. (CC)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying Defendants' #328 motion for reconsideration. (AD)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ANSWER to #337 Amended Counterclaim, (Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Fourth Amended Counterclaims) by Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa.(Neupert, John)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 LETTER from John Neupert re #338 Letter from Claire Davis (Neupert, John)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 LETTER from Claire Loebs Davis re #328 Brief - Responsive, (Davis, Claire)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Fourth AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM S against plaintiff Institute of Cetacean Research, Hiroyuki Komura, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Davis, Claire)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. To the extent Defendants' counterclaims for freedom from piracy and freedom of safe navigation on the high seas proceed against Mr. Komiya, the court DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the court QUASHES service on Mr. Komiya and GRANTS Defendants' request to amend their counter-complaint; the court EXTENDS Defendants' deadline for service of Mr. Komiya to 8/31/2016. (AD)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ANSWER to #297 Amended Counterclaim, (Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Third Amended Counterclaims) by Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa.(Neupert, John)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 AFFIDAVIT of Celeste Ingalls re #332 Response to Order to Show Cause, #333 Declaration (non motion), filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Davis, Claire)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 DECLARATION of Taylor Washburn re #332 Response to Order to Show Cause by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Davis, Claire)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Davis, Claire)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court DENIES Plaintiffs' #304 motion to dismiss and ORDERS Defendants to show cause within 10 days why the court should not dismiss some or all counterclaims against Mr. Komura. (AD)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney James L Phillips for Counter Defendants Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Phillips, James)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth Tedesco Milesnick on behalf of Counter Defendants Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re Ninth Circuit's Rulings on Public Interest re 322 In Court Hearing,,, by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Davis, Claire)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Letter from John Neupert re 322 In Court Hearing,,, Plaintiffs' written comments on the Ninth Circuit's ruling in Cetacean I (725 F.3d 940) (Neupert, John)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Letter from Defense Counsel re 322 In Court Hearing,,, Results of Meet and Confer (Davis, Claire)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Letter from John Neupert re 322 In Court Hearing,,, plaintiffs' offer to remove SHONAN MARU NO. 2 from paragraph 20 of First Amended and Supplemental Complaint, and submission of the parties' Proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Neupert, John)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2016 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2016, (ND)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, Elizabeth Milesnick; Def Counsel: Claire Davis, Taylor Washburn; CR: Nickie Drury; In Court Status Hearing held on 4/22/2016. For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to compel, Dkt. # 305, as outlined in the Parties' Joint Chart, Dkt. # 320. The court directs counsel to submit a proposed protective order by May 2, 2016. In the event the parties do not agree, each side may submit a proposed protective order. The parties may file written comments not to exceed 5 pages on the Ninth Circuits ruling, 725 F.3d 940, by May 4, 2016. The parties also have until May 4, 2016, to narrow the discovery requests that the court identified on the record. (CC)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Summons electronically issued as to counter defendant(s) Hiroyuki Komura. (CDA)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Davis, Claire)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davis, Claire)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. A 90-minute in-court status hearing is scheduled at 10:30 AM on Friday, April 22, 2016. At that hearing, the court will take up Defendants' motion to compel (MTC (Dkt. #305 )) and various case management issues, some of which the parties have raised in letters to the court (see Dkt. # 316-17). Parties to jointly prepare and submit chart to the court no later than 5:00 PM on Wednesday, April 20, 2016. (AD)
April 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Letter from John Neupert re #316 Letter from Claire Loebs Davis seeking telephone conference with the Court (Neupert, John)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Letter from Claire Loebs Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Claire)
March 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER re #313 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Taylor Washburn for Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, and Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ECF Registration Added to APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Taylor Washburn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson Receipt No. 0981-4381987 (Davis, Claire) Modified Docket Text on 4/6/2016 (DS).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Taylor Washburn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4381987 (Davis, Claire)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #304 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1-3 in Defendants' Third Amended Counterclaims (Neupert, John)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, to #304 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1-3 in Defendants' Third Amended Counterclaims. Oral Argument Requested. (Davis, Claire)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Second DECLARATION of Claire Loebs Davis filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Davis, Claire)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Davis, Claire)
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants-Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2)(Neupert, John)
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories. Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 DECLARATION of Claire Loebs Davis filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Davis, Claire)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/19/2016, (Davis, Claire)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1-3 in Defendants' Third Amended Counterclaims by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/26/2016, (Neupert, John)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part requests to file additional motions by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #298 Request for Leave to File a Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Neupert, John)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 RESPONSE by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #300 Request (Davis, Claire)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS WITH THE COURT by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa (Neupert, John)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2015 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2016, (ND)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 REQUEST by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson for Leave to File Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories (Davis, Claire)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Third AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Institute of Cetacean Research, Hiroyuki Komura, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd.(a Japanese corporation), Tomoyuki Ogawa, filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society(an Oregon nonprofit corporation), Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Davis, Claire)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE OF FILING ADY GIL ARBITRATION AWARD ; filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Davis, Claire)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa for proceedings held on 12/15/2015, Requesting Attorney: John F Neupert. (Neupert, John)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER denying pltfs' #228 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part pltfs' #255 Motion to Dismiss; denying pltfs' #257 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part dfts' #260 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying dfts' #271 Motion to Compel; granting dfts' #272 Motion to confirm termination of the confidentiality agreement by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Filing Copy of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Petition for Writ of Certiorari dated 4/28/2015 ; filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of SSCS Petition for Writ of Certiorari dated 4/28/2015)(Neupert, John)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, Christie Helmer; Def Counsel: Claire Loebs Davis, Kristin Beneski; CR: Nickie Drury; Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2015. The court hears argument from counsel on pending motions. The court takes the matter under advisement. (CC)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions; Hearing set for 12/15/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Court directs clerk to renote all six pending motions for 12/15/15 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
November 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #260 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Claire)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MINUTE ORDER there shall be no further motions filed by either party without a prior telephone conference with the court and the court's permission to file the requested motion by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. (RE)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PROTECTIVE ORDER re dfts' #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #272 MOTION Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement (Davis, Claire)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 DECLARATION of Darin Sands filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Davis, Claire)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Supplemental DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Davis, Claire)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Davis, Claire)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 3/31/2015 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015, (AR)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #272 MOTION Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2)(Neupert, John)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #272 MOTION Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement . Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Neupert, John)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5)(Neupert, John)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs. Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information (Davis, Claire)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Exhibit 6)(Neupert, John)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information. Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #272 MOTION Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement , #271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Davis, Claire)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION Confirm Termination of Confidentiality Agreement by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/18/2015, (Davis, Claire)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION to Compel Production of Docs and Answers to Rogs by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/18/2015, (Davis, Claire)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 DECLARATION of Farrah Smith filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information (Davis, Claire)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Claire)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION for Protective Order re Donor Information by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 9/4/2015, (Davis, Claire)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #260 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Davis, Claire)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #260 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #255 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaims (Neupert, John)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #257 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Fifth Counterclaim for Intentional and/or Negligent Destruction of Property (Neupert, John)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, to #255 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaims. Oral Argument Requested. (Davis, Claire)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, to #257 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Fifth Counterclaim for Intentional and/or Negligent Destruction of Property. Oral Argument Requested. (Davis, Claire)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson re #260 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-1, #3 Exhibit 2-2)(Davis, Claire)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/21/2015, (Davis, Claire)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 DECLARATION of Makoto Ito in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #257 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Fifth Counterclaim for Intentional and/or Negligent Destruction of Property (Neupert, John)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Supplemental DECLARATION of John F. Neupert (Second Supplemental Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #257 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Fifth Counterclaim for Intentional and/or Negligent Destruction of Property (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A)(Neupert, John)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Fifth Counterclaim for Intentional and/or Negligent Destruction of Property by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2015, (Neupert, John)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert Regarding Judicial Notice of CITES Reservation filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #255 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2)(Neupert, John)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaims by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2015, (Neupert, John)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ERRATA re #250 Amended Counterclaim, by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Davis, Claire)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying #244 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE with DVD attached re #251 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials ; filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (DVD placed on shelf in clerk's office)(MD)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Filing DVD containing Exhibits 2 and 4 in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Davis, Claire)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Second AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Institute of Cetacean Research(a Japanese research foundation), Hiroyuki Komura, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd.(a Japanese corporation), Tomoyuki Ogawa, filed by Paul Watson, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society(an Oregon nonprofit corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Claire)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert; Def Counsel: Claire Davis; CR: Debbie Zurn; Telephone Conference held on 6/30/2015. The court grants the motion to amend counterclaims, Dkt. #245. The court strikes the motion to dismiss counterclaims, Dkt. #238, as moot. The plaintiffs may file a motion to dismiss or an answer to the amended complaint within 21 days of the amended counterclaims. The court will allow the defense to file a 30 page response. Once a new motion to dismiss is filed, the court will renote the motion for partial summary judgment, Dkt. #228, to the same date. (CC)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Compliance re #239 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Davis, Claire)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #245 MOTION to Amend Counterclaims. (Neupert, John)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Granting Motion to Amend Counterclaims (Davis, Claire)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION to Amend Counterclaims by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) Noting Date 7/10/2015, (Davis, Claire)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION for Reconsideration re #239 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Order on Motion for Sanctions) by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/12/2015, (Neupert, John)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert; Def Counsel: Claire Davis; CR: Debbie Zurn; Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2015. The court orders defense counsel to file their motion to amend the counter-claims by Friday, June 19, 2015. Counsel for plaintiff shall file their response by Friday, June 26, 2015. No reply shall be filed unless requested by the court. The court schedules a telephone conference Tuesday, June 30, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. #238, is renoted for July 10, 2015. (CC)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set/Reset re #238 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims : Noting Date 7/10/2015, (CC)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The parties' joint request for stay of proceedings concerning damages for contempt is GRANTED. On or before 9/30/15, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the performance of the terms of their settlement. (SG)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Letter from John Neupert re #240 Letter from Claire Davis filed 6/8/2015 (Dkt. 240) (Neupert, John)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Letter from Claire Loebs Davis re request for status conference (Davis, Claire)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #214 Plaintiffs Motion for coercive sanctions, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/19/2015, (Neupert, John)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The parties jointly request a further revision of the schedule for briefing on Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees. The agreed schedule is adopted. Accordingly, any opposition to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees is due June 9, 2015, and Plaintiffs reply is due June 23, 2015. (RE)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Filing DVD containing Video Exhibits A and B to Amended Counterclaim in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Counter Claimants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Davis, Claire)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ANSWER to #234 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Institute of Cetacean Research, Hiroyuki Komura, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Davis, Claire)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Institute of Cetacean Research, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit A (Form of SSCS Stmt), #6 Exhibit - Exhibit B (Form of Watson Stmt))(Neupert, John)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Supplemental DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd. re #228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1)(Neupert, John)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., TO RESPONSE to #228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Counterclaim (Neupert, John)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Counterclaim. (Davis, Claire)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The court has received the parties letter stating that they have agreed to a further revision of the schedule for briefing on Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees. The agreed schedule is adopted. Accordingly, any opposition to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees is due May 25, 2015, and Plaintiffs reply is due June 8, 2015. (RE)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd. re #228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Exhibit 6)(Neupert, John)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society's Counterclaim by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/1/2015, (Neupert, John)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *10 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Jury Trial is set for 10/11/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/14/2016, Motions due by 5/16/2016, Discovery completed by 6/13/2016, Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2016, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 8/12/2016, Motions in Limine due by 8/22/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/22/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/26/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/26/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The court has received the parties letter stating that they have agreed to a revised schedule for briefing on Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees. The agreed schedule is adopted. Accordingly, any opposition to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees is due April 23, 2015, and Plaintiffs reply is due May 7, 2015. (RE)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, Christie Helmer; Def Counsel: Claire Davis, Kristin Beneski; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Status Conference held on 3/31/2015. The court lifts the stay, Dkt. #181. The court strikes the portion of the motion to lift stay, Dkt. #214, as moot and leaves the remaining portion of the remedial sanctions as pending, Dkt. #214. An amended complaint shall be filed by May 1, 2015 and an amended answer shall be filed by May 15, 2015. May 15, 2015 is the deadline for joining parties. The court orders Civil Rule 26(a) initial disclosures within 30 days of the filing of the amended answer. The court will permit discovery regarding the Ady Gil. A new pretrial schedule shall be entered. (CC)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt (Neupert, John)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for deft Paul Watson. Attorney Timothy G Leyh; Michelle Buhler and Charles S Jordan terminated; by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Paul Watson. Noting Date 3/25/2015, (Davis, Claire) Modified text on 3/26/2015 (MD).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Claire)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt (Davis, Claire) Modified on 3/24/2015 - Per cnsl - document stricken - see dkt. no. 221 for correct document. (MD).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt. Oral Argument Requested. (Davis, Claire)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The joint status report addressing discovery on damages issues is due April 3, 2015. Any opposition to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees is due April 9, 2015,and Plaintiffs reply is due April 23, 2015. (RE)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The joint status report addressing discovery on damages issues is due April 3, 2015. Any opposition to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees is due April 9, 2015, and Plaintiffs reply is due April 23, 2015. (SG)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10-15 trial days. (Neupert, John)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is scheduled Tuesday, March 31, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa re #214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit - Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit - Exhibit 8)(Neupert, John)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay and for Remedial Sanctions for Contempt re #181 Order Staying Case and re Ninth Circuit Opinion on Motion for Contempt by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/27/2015, (Neupert, John)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. At the February 10, 2015 status conference, the parties and non-party respondents proposed a schedule for exchanging their views on the amount and allocation of attorneys fees, costs and other damages, as awarded by the court in its December 19, 2014 order. The parties and non-party respondents shall participate by telephone in a further status conference at 3:00 p.m. on March 12, 2015. (SG)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE ORDER - In recognition of the Ninth Circuits order in Institute of Cetacean Research v. Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, No. 12-35266, stating that no new mandate will be issued (Dkt. # 211), the court ORDERS the parties to file an amended Joint Status Report within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Defendant) filed a Motion to Stay the Mandate Pending the Filing of a Petition for Certiorari on February 3, 2015. Our contempt order, which addressed acts of contempt occurring before June 7, 2013, does not require the district court to take action. Therefore, no new mandate will be issued. (see order for further instruction) (SG)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. On December 19, 2014, the court re-referred this matter to the Appellate Commissioner to recommend the appropriate amount of attorneys fees and costs and actual damages suffered and resources wasted. Accordingly, on February 10, 2015, at 3:45 p.m. PST, the parties shall participate in a telephone status conference to discuss a framework for adjudicating the amount of fees, costs, and damages awarded by the court, and whether liability 12-35266 should be allocated and, if so, how. (SG)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Defendant Paul Watson filed a petition for rehearing en banc on January 2, 2015. Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society filed a petition for rehearing en banc on January 2, 2015. Defendants Lani Blazier, Marnie Gaede, Peter Rieman, Robert Talbot, Robert Wintner, and Benjamin Zuckerman filed a petition for panel rehearing and for rehearing en banc on January 2, 2015. Judges Kozinski, Tashima and M. Smith have each voted to deny the three petitions. The full court has been advised of the three petitions, and no judge requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petitions for rehearing en banc and petition for panel rehearing are DENIED. (RE)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Hilary V Bricken for Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Moure, Charles)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney John F Neupert. Filed by Counter Defendants Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John) Modified Firm Name and Address for John F. Neupert on 1/16/2015 (DS).
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER - The court ORDERS the parties to file an amended Joint Status Report ten (10) days after the Ninth Circuit issues its mandate regarding the contempt proceedings referenced in Institute of Cetacean Research v. Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, No. 12-35266, 2014 WL 7235539, at *21 (9th Cir. Dec. 19, 2014), by Judge James L. Robart. (TM)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #202 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Claire Loebs Davis,Douglas W Greene,Kristin Beneski for Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. Attorney Charles P Moure; Daniel P Harris and Rebecca Millican terminated; by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: (Premature for the reasons discussed in the Joint Status Report). (Neupert, John)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherd Conservation Societys counsel have filed a Stipulated Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel at the request of Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. The motion seeks the withdrawal of attorneys Charles P. Moure, Daniel P. Harris, and Rebecca Millican, and the substitution of attorneys Claire Loebs Davis, Douglas W. Greene, and Kristin Beneski, on behalf of Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherd Conservation Society as counsel of record in this matter. The motion is granted. (RE)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. Noting Date 12/24/2014, (Davis, Claire)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER denying Paul Watson's #183 Motion to Dismiss; denying Sea Shepherd's #186 Motion to Dismiss by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, TO RESPONSE to #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott West)(Moure, Charles)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 DECLARATION of PAUL WATSON filed by Defendant Paul Watson re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE (Leyh, Timothy)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 DECLARATION of Peter Ola Hammarstedt filed by Defendant Paul Watson re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE (Leyh, Timothy)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY, filed by Defendant Paul Watson, TO RESPONSE to #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE (Leyh, Timothy)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #195 Stipulation to Re-Note filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. RE-Noting Date 7/11/2014 - #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO RE-NOTE by parties re #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moure, Charles)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #193 Stipulation to re-note motion filed by Paul Watson. RE- Noting Date 7/11/2013 re: #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO RE-NOTE DEFENDANT PAUL WATSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE by parties re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE. (Buhler, Michelle)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Oral argument regarding the parties objections to the Appellate Commissioners Report and Recommendation will be held at 11:00 a.m. on Monday, October 27, 2014, in Courtroom 1 of the Richard H. Chambers U.S.Court of Appeals Building, 125 South Grand Avenue, Pasadena, California 91105.Each side will be allotted twenty minutes to present its arguments. (SA)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari in Supp. of Pls.' Opp'n to Watson's & SSCS's Mots. to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Exhibit 1 to Ohmagari Translator Decl., #2 Exhibit -Exhibit 2 to Ohmagari Translator Decl.)(Neupert, John)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, #187 Response to Motion, #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Affidavit of Kenji Kagawa in Supp. of Pls.' Opp'n to Watson's & SSCS's Mots. to Dismiss) (Neupert, John)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 DECLARATION of Yoshihiro Fujise in Supp. of Pls.' Opp'n to Watson's & SSCS's Mots. to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Exhibit A to Fujise Decl.)(Neupert, John)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Supp. of Pls.' Opp'n to Watson's & SSCS's Mots. to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Exhibit 1 to Neupert Decl., #2 Exhibit -Exhibit 2 to Neupert Decl., #3 Exhibit -Exhibit 3 to Neupert Decl., #4 Exhibit -Exhibit 4 to Neupert Decl., #5 Exhibit -Exhibit 5 to Neupert Decl.)(Neupert, John)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE, #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Moure, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibits B-F, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/27/2014, (Moure, Charles)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE. Filed by Defendant Paul Watson. Noting Date 6/27/2014, (Jordan, Charles)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 DECLARATION of CHARLES JORDAN filed by Defendant Paul Watson re #183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE (Jordan, Charles)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AS MOOT AND UNRIPE by Defendant Paul Watson. Noting Date 6/13/2014, (Jordan, Charles)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 4/16/2014 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. or by e-mail at barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2014, (BF)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER STAYING this action pending the Ninth Circuit's final decision on the contempt proceedings, with the exception that Defendants are permitted to bring a motion to dismiss based on mootness and ripeness by Judge James L. Robart. (CL)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: John Neupert; Def Counsel: Charles Moure, Rebecca Millican, Tim Leyh, Michelle Buhler, Chip Jordan; CR: Barry Fanning; Status Conference held on 4/16/2014. The court discusses the case with counsel. (CC)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Attorney Timothy G Leyh for Paul Watson added; per #179 Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys. (MD)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #178 Stipulation for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for Deft Paul Watson filed by Paul Watson. Attorney Charles S Jordan,Michelle Buhler for Paul Watson added. Attorney Charles P Moure; Daniel P Harris and Rebecca Millican terminated; by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by parties. (Leyh, Timothy)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM re 174 Notice-Other by Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Moure, Charles)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM re 174 Notice-Other (Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Continuation of Stay of This Action) by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF DECISION BY THE INTERNATIONAL COURT OF JUSTICE ; filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit C)(Neupert, John)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 The parties may each file briefing of no more than three pages addressing whether the case should remain stayed pending resolution of the Ninth Circuit contempt proceedings. This briefing is due April 11, 2014.(CC)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is scheduled Wednesday, April 16, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14106 before Hon. James L. Robart. (CC)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 20.. (Moure, Charles)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Aura Y Gantz for Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Gantz, Aura)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Plaintiffs-Appellants motion to admit proposed exhibits 319 and 319A is denied. (SA)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The court has received the letter request of the Defendants and Non-Parties to file a joint post-hearing brief of 40 pages, which the court construes as an unopposed motion to file an enlarged brief. So construed, the motion is granted. Plaintiffs reply brief remains due November 27, 2013. (SA)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. No later than noon on October 26, 2013, Non-parties Lani Blazier, Marnie Gaede, Bob Talbot, Robert Wintner and Ben Zuckerman (the Directors) shall provide to all other parties copies of any privileged documents and materials on which they intend to rely in the course of their testimony. The parties shall cooperate to the greatest degree possible to accomplish all reasonable discovery before the hearing concerning the evidence of legal advice relied on in responding to the December 17, 2012 injunction. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. At the October 21, 2013 telephonic pre-hearing conference, the parties agreed to participate at a final pre-hearing telephonic conference on October 25, 2013 at 3.00 p.m. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hilary V Bricken on behalf of Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Bricken, Hilary)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research;The parties shall participate by telephone in a pre-hearing status conference at 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 8, 2013. The conference will address how to focus and streamline the hearing scheduled to begin on October 28, 2013. No later than October 1, 2013, the parties shall provide the court with the pre-hearing statements they have exchanged in accordance with the courts April 16, 2013 scheduling order. See Order for Further Details. (LMK)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Non-party Susan Hartlands Petition for Rehearing or Rehearing En Banc (Dkt. 213) is denied. See Fed. R. App. P. 35, 40.(SA)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Plaintiff-Appellant ICRs motion to compel is granted. Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherds counter-motion for a protective order is denied. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Sea Shepherds motion to compel is denied. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (SA)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (LMK)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Rachel Eve Buker for Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Harris, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Plaintiff-Appellant ICRs unopposed motion to extend the deadline for conducting depositions of Paul Watson, Susan Hartland, and Robert Talbot is granted. The depositions may be conducted on dates mutually convenient to the parties on or before August 9, 2013. Plaintiff-Appellant ICRs unopposed motion for an extension of time to and including July 24, 2013 to file a motion for an order regarding protection of documents ordered to be produced by the July 2, 2013 order is also granted. (SA)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; On June 13, 2013, the court ordered Appellees Sea Shepherd and Paul Watson to addresses whether the Confidentiality Agreement executed while the case was in District Court should govern filings in the contempt proceedings, and invited the alleged non-party contemnors to express their views on the matter. Watson and non-parties Peter Rieman and Susan Hartland have joined in the response of Sea Shepherd. Neither ICR nor the non-party current directors have expressed their view of the matter. Accordingly, the court adopts the position expressed in Sea Shepherds filing. During the pendency of these contempt proceedings, the parties need not file materials designated confidential under seal. No partys right to invoke the provisions of the Confidentiality Agreement in the district court or any subsequent appellate procedure is limited or hereby waived. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED ORDERS FILED ON SAME DATE BY USCA. (Attachments: #1 Order of USCA, #2 Order of USCA, #3 Order of USCA)(LMK)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aura Y Gantz on behalf of Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Gantz, Aura)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re #156 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rebecca Millican for Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)Added Attorney Rebecca Millican to Paul Watson and Sea Shepherd Conservation Society Counter Claimant on 10/16/2013 (DS).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rebecca Millican FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3259755. (Moure, Charles)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles P Moure on behalf of Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Moure, Charles)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Plaintiff-Appellant ICRs motion for a protective order is granted in part, and denied in part. The captains may be questioned about specific radar data that has been produced or that ICR intends to use in these proceedings, including any steps taken to insure the accuracy and reliability of that data. The captains may not be questioned about the type of radar equipment used, its range, or other characteristics. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Non-party Peter Riemans Renewed Motion to Dismiss ContemptProceedings is denied. Rieman was a board member during the period in which the board made decisions about how to respond to the injunction. If ICR establishes that those decisions made the board liable for subsequent violations of the injunction, Rieman is also liable for compensatory damages resulting from that violation. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research;):Plaintiff-Appellant ICRs motion to compel is granted in part. Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherd objects to discovery requests involving documents that pre-date the issuance of the injunction. As the court stated in ruling on the motion to quash the subpoena of Wells Fargo records, information concerning Sea Shepherds finances before the injunction is relevant to evaluate its contention that it withdrew from participation in Operation Zero Tolerance (OZT) after the injunction issued. That claim cannot be assessed without a clear picture of the relationship existing between Sea Shepherd and the other entities participating in OZT before the injunction issued. ICRs discovery requests do not seek information from an unreasonable period of time, given these legitimate concerns, and Sea Shepherd must produce documents requested by ICR. Accordingly, the motion to compel is GRANTED with the following exceptions: The motion to compel a response to Request for Production (RFP) 7 is DENIED. ICRs motion demonstrates that it has already obtained information concerning Sea Shepherds support of Watson concerning his legal difficulties in Germany, and further detailed financial information does not appear to be relevant to the present proceedings. The motion to compel a response to RFP 20 is DENIED in part. The request for all emails from any seashepherd.org email account is overly broad and burdensome. Defendant shall produce the requested email communications with Jeff Hansen. In all other respects, Sea Shepherd shall produce the documents that are the subject of the motion to compel by June 20, 2013. ICRs motion to file its motion to compel and its reply in support thereof under seal is held in abeyance. Defendants-Appellees Sea Shepherd and Paul Watson shall file a response within seven days after the date of this order that addresses whether the Confidentiality Agreement that was executed while the case was in District Court should govern these filings, as well as future filings in the contempt proceedings. Non-parties may file a response within the same seven days. (LMK)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER by Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. In accordance with the May 24, 2013 amended opinion of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and the June 7, 2013 mandate, the court has directed the clerk to reassign this case at random to another judge of this District. This action is now assigned to the Honorable James L. Robart. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C11-2043JLR. (CL)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MANDATE of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The judgment of this Court, entered February 25, 2013, amended on May 24, 2013, takes effect this date. REVERSED. (SA)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; See Order for Full Text (LMK)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Amending Disposition Opinion REVERSED. The opinion is amended as follows: (see order for full text) No further petitions for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc may be filed. (LMK)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. At the May 7, 2013 status conference, the parties agreed that the briefing schedule for any discovery motion will follow the timing intervals of Local Rule 7(d)(3) of the Western District of Washington, except that such motions may be filed on any day. The party opposing the discovery motion shall have eleven calendar days to respond to the motion, and the moving party shall have four calendar days to file a reply. (SA)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherds Motion for Reconsideration of the courts April 19, 2013 order granting in part its motion to quash is granted in part. Sea Shepherd shall be allowed five calendar days within which to redact information identifying its donors that is contained in documents produced by Wells Fargo. (SA)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The court has received and reviewed Defendant-Appellee Sea Shepherds Motion for Reconsideration of its April 19, 2013 order granting its motion to quash in part. Within five days after the date of this order, Plaintiffs-Appellants shall file a response showing why the motion for reconsideration should not be granted to the extent that Sea Shepherd is allowed a limited amount of time to redact the identities of its donors. (SA)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research Plaintiffs-Appellants Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Defendant- Appellee Sea Shepherd Conservation Societys Answers to First Requests for Admissions (RFAs) is granted. Sea Shepherds answers do not meet the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36(a)(4) to the extent that they offer no statement of the inquiry undertaken in responding to the RFAs, and no explanation of why that inquiry was fruitless. See Asea, Inc. v. Southern Pacific Transp. Co., 669 F.2d 1242, 1246-47 (9th Cir.1982). Accordingly, within 14 days after the date of this order, Sea Shepherd shallfile an amended response to Plaintiff-Appellants first set of RFAs. Sea Shepherd is not required to obtain information from third parties, but it is required to explain why it cannot do so in this case. All requests for fees and costs are deferred until the conclusion of these contempt proceedings. (SA)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER of USCA (11-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Non-party Peter Riemans Motion to Stay Discovery is denied. Riemans Motion to Dismiss Contempt Proceedings is denied without prejudice to renewal after the completion of Peter Riemans deposition. (LMK)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research;After reviewing the proposed discovery and pre-hearing plans submitted with respect to Plaintiffs-Appellants pending contempt motion, the following schedule will apply: Written Discovery / Depositions 1. All written discovery, including interrogatories, requests for admission and requests for production of documents, shall be completed by July 12, 2013. 2. All depositions of lay witnesses shall be completed by July 12, 2013. If lay witnesses not subject to process in the United States are intended to be called at the hearing, those witnesses will be presented for deposition the week before the hearing. Expert Discovery (if any) 1. Plaintiffs-Appellants expert disclosures, reports, and production of the materials upon which they relied in forming their opinions shall be due on August 9, 2013. 2. Defendants-Appellees and Non-Parties expert disclosures, reports, and production of the materials upon which they relied in forming their opinions shall be due on August 16, 2013. 3. Expert depositions shall be completed by August 30, 2013. Pre-hearing Order 1. Plaintiffs-Appellants Pre-Hearing Statements shall be due September 13, 2013. 2. Defendants-Appellees and Non-Parties Pre- Hearing Statements shall be due September 27, 2013. 3. The Pre- Hearing Order shall be filed on October 11, 2013. Hearing 1. Hearing Briefs and motions in limine shall be filed on October 18, 2013. 2. The Hearing shall begin October 28, 2013. (LMK)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Paul Watsons motion for leave to file his late supplemental petition for rehearing en banc is denied. See Fed. R. App. P. 35(c), 40(a)(1). (LMK)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research On or before March 26, 2013, Appellants shall file a copy of Docket No. 54 that redacts Paul Watsons address. Upon receipt of the redacted version, the Clerk shall replace the document filed as Docket No. 54 with the redacted version, which will then be unsealed. (SA)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Non-party Peter Riemans stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Appellants Amended Motion for Contempt is granted. Riemans response is now due on or before March 22, 2013. (LMK)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Appellants Motion to Shorten Time for Response to First Request for Admissions is denied. Appellants Motion to Shorten Time for Response to First Request for Production of Documents and Things is also denied. Appellants March 6, 2013 Motion for Permission to File Documents Under Seal is granted. Appellants Motion to Unseal Documents will be addressed by separate order. At the March 12, 2013 status conference, the parties agreed to meet and confer regarding the scope and conduct of upcoming depositions, including the depositions of the Japanese sea captains that are scheduled for the week of April 29, 2013. The parties shall participate by telephone in a further status conference at 4:00 p.m. on March 19, 2013. (LMK)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The Institute of Cetacean Research, et al., are directed to file a response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc, filed with this court on March 11, 2013. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. (SA)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research;At the February 27, 2013 status conference, the parties agreed that Appellants will file an amended motion for contempt no later than March 6, 2013, which they will serve together with requests for admission. Appellees shall provide their responses to the requests for admission within 14 days after service unless the amended motion for contempt names additional parties, in which case the responses shall be due within 30 days after service. With respect to other discovery requests, including document requests, the party seeking the discovery may move to shorten the time for a response, and the other party shall have five working days within which to oppose the motion to shorten time. The parties shall meet and confer to arrange depositions of Australian entities and nationals, as well as the sea captains employed by Appellant, if such depositions are deemed necessary. Appellant shall file a motion to unseal the documents in this case that are currently maintained under seal. Appellees shall respond to that motion within five working days of service. The parties shall participate by telephone in a further status conference at 4:00 p.m. on March 12, 2013. (LMK)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 OPINION of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research The district courts orders denying Cetaceans preliminary injunction and dismissing its piracy claims are REVERSED. The preliminary injunction we issued on December 17, 2012, Inst. of Cetacean Research v. Sea Shepherd Conservation Socy, 702 F.3d 573 (9th Cir. 2012), will remain in effect until further order of this court. (SA)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. On February 21, 2013, the court referred to the Appellate Commissioner matters arising from Appellants motion for contempt of the injunction issued on December 17, 2012. Appellants motion to file under seal documents in support of its contempt motion is granted. Appellees motion to file under seal documents in support of its response to the contempt motion is also granted. The Clerk shall maintain the documents in question under seal in accordance with Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13. (SEE ORDER FOR INSTRUCTION) (SA)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research The court has received the motion for contempt filed by the Institute of Cetacean Research, et al., (collectively, Cetacean) and both parties motions to file documents under seal. The court hereby refers these matters to Appellate Commissioner Peter L. Shaw to determine the issues of fact and law raised by the parties, including which party or parties shall bear the costs associated with this reference (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION) (SA)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research; Sea Shepherd Conservation Society and Paul Watson shall file any response to the motions by the Institute of Cetacean Research, et al., to file documents under seal and to appoint a special master to conduct contempt proceedings by Tuesday, February 19, 2013. (LMK)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court STAYS discovery in this action pending the Ninth Circuit's decision on Plaintiffs' appeal. The court directs the clerk to TERMINATE all of them. Dkt. # #125 , #126 , #128 . The court VACATES the trial date and all pretrial deadlines. The court will set new deadlines, with the parties input, after the Ninth Circuit issues its opinion. (CL)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Makoto Ito filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #128 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled for February 11 and 12, 2013 (Neupert, John)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #128 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled for February 11 and 12, 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2)(Neupert, John)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled for February 11 and 12, 2013 by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/8/2013, (Neupert, John)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #126 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production No. 46 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2)(Neupert, John)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production No. 46 by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2013, (Neupert, John)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Compel by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Moure, #2 Exhibits to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2013, (Moure, Charles)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Tomoyuki Ogawa on 02/12/2013. Filed by Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society.(Moure, Charles)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Toshiyuki Miura on 02/11/2013. Filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society.(Moure, Charles)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order ***Motions terminated: Upon defense counsel's request, #119 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled and #120 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled are terminated as moot. (VE)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #120 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit - Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit - Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit - Exhibit 8)(Neupert, John)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #120 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled. (Neupert, John)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Declaration of Charles Moure, #3 Exhibit) Noting Date 1/25/2013, (Moure, Charles)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Scheduled by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/25/2013, (Moure, Charles)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER of USCA (12-35266) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research;Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society and Paul Watson, and any party acting in concert with them (collectively defendants), are enjoined from physically attacking any vessel engaged by Plaintiffs the Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Tomoyuki Ogawa or Toshiyuki Miura in the Southern Ocean or any person on any such vessel (collectively plaintiffs), or from navigating in a manner that is likely to endanger the safe navigation of any such vessel. In no event shall defendants approach plaintiffs any closer than 500 yards when defendants are navigating on the open sea. This injunction pending appeal is issued pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 8 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(g), and shall remain in place until we issue an opinion on the merits of this appeal (LMK)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order CLERK'S RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #103 Notice of Appeal; Document 1; Exhibit 5 and 6;2 CD's. (LMK)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #113 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Third Party Subpoena ; by Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson.. (Moure, Charles)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #113 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Third Party Subpoena. Filed by Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. Noting Date 7/20/2012, (Harris, Daniel)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECLARATION of Susan Hartland filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #113 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Third Party Subpoena (Moure, Charles)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DECLARATION of Charles Moure filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #113 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Third Party Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moure, Charles)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Third Party Subpoena by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2012, (Moure, Charles)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. JURY TRIAL is set for 9/16/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2012, Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2013, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/20/2013, Discovery completed by 5/20/2013, Dispositive motions due by 6/18/2013, Settlement conference to be held by 7/18/2013, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/19/2013, Motions in Limine due by 8/19/2013, Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2013, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 9/9/2013, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, Christie Helmer; Def Counsel: Daniel Harris, Rachel Buker; CR: Barry Fanning; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2012. After hearing argument of counsel, the Court DENIES #105 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiffs. Trial date is set for 9/16/2013. Order Setting Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines to be entered. (VE)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY, filed by Counter Defendants Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #105 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Helmer, M.)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DECLARATION of Dan Harris filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #105 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Harris, Daniel)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #105 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Daniel)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #96 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,. (Moure, Charles)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 4/26/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa for proceedings held on 2/16/2012 re #101 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript,,,. Requesting Attorney: John F Neupert. (Neupert, John)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/27/2012, (Neupert, John)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-5 weeks. Filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa.(Neupert, John)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL (12-35266) to Ninth Circuit re #95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #96 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 0981-2775290. (Neupert, John) Modified on 4/10/2012; Added CCA case number (LMK).
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ANSWER to #94 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Counterdefendants The Institute of Cetacean Research and Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd.'s Answer to Counterplaintiff's Counterclaim) by Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd..(Neupert, John)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2012 Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. or by e-mail at barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2012, (BF)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs re #96 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, [Plaintiffs' Statement in Response to Order, Docket No. 96] by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Summons electronically issued as to defendants Hiroyuki Komura, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd. (CL)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #94 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Moure, Charles)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/2/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/6/2012, Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2012, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones granting in part, denying in part, declining to decide in part #29 Motion to Dismiss; terminating #91 Motion for Rule 16 Conference. Plaintiffs must submit statement in accordance with this order no later than March 30, 2012. Plaintiffs may renew request for Rule 16 conference in joint status report. Clerk will issue order requiring joint status report shortly. (JJ)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Richard A Jones. (JJ)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Hiroyuki Komura by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society.(Harris, Daniel)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #91 MOTION Motion for Rule 16 Conference (Neupert, John)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #91 MOTION Motion for Rule 16 Conference. (Moure, Charles)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/9/2012, (Neupert, John) Modified on 2/24/2012 (CL).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, James Phillips, Christie Helmer; Def Counsel: Daniel Harris, Charles Moure, Rachel Buker; CR: Barry Fanning; MOTION HEARING held on 2/16/2012 re #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) filed by Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, Institute of Cetacean Research. The Court hears argument of counsel and makes a tentative ruling DENYING the #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court's written decision to be entered at a later date. (VE)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Amicus Curiae Brief of Ocean Defenders Alliance BRIEF re #53 Response to Motion, by Interested Party Ocean Defenders Alliance. (Warner, Marc)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 EXHIBIT (1-CD/RM) re #85 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials, #73 Declaration, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (CL)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 EXHIBIT (1-CD/RM) re #84 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials, #72 Declaration, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (CL)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Filing CD-ROM with Ex. 2 to Dkt #73, Decl. of Hajime Ishikawa re 1/21/2012 Video Clips in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Filing CD-ROM with Ex. 2 to Dkt #72, Decl. of Hajime Ishikawa re 1/18/2012 Video Clip in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Declaration of Takao Omura filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Declaration of Mori Fumihiko and Supplemental Declaration of Toshiyuki Miura filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Declarations of Takuichi Abe and Yamato Sekine in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECLARATION of Yamato Sekine in Support of Planitiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DECLARATION of Takao Omura in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert (Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1 (pp. 1-34), #2 Exhibit - Ex. 1 (pp. 35-67))(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Toshiyuki Miura (Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Captain Malcolm Lambie Miller, FNI (Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Koji Matsuoka in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of Makoto Ito in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Second Declaration) filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION of Hajime Ishikawa Regarding January 21, 2012, Video Clips filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION of Hajime Ishikawa Regarding January 18, 2012, Video Clip filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECLARATION of Mori Fumihiko in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of Takuichi Abe in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply Pursuant to CR 7(g) Regarding Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #66 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECLARATION of Rachel E. Buker filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Daniel)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, TO RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Harris, Daniel)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER by Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. The court ORDERS defendants to show cause during the hearing on February 16, 2012 why they should not be sanctioned for violating the court's order. The court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion for extension of time and allows them to file their reply on February 6, 2012. Dkt. #62 . CL)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #62 MOTION for Relief (Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or for Relief From Deadline) MOTION for Relief (Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or for Relief From Deadline). (Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 EXHIBIT re #55 Notice of Filing (2 DVD's) re: #54 Declaration of Daniel P. Harris, by Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (CL). (1 DVD for the Court's file, 1 DVD for chambers)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Relief (Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or for Relief From Deadline) by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/31/2012, (Neupert, John)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Calvin Toy filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Paul Watson filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Peter Hammarstedt filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Susan Hartland filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Gregory Phelan, Ph.D. filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Captain James Cushman filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing DVD Containing Exhibit 14 to the January 30, 2012 Declaration of Dan Harris (Dkt. 54) in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECLARATION of Dan Harris filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Daniel)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Connection With Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex.1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit - Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit - Ex. 6)(Neupert, John)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Neupert, John)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 EXHIBITS re: #40 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials: (1) CD/ROM with exhibits 5-1,5-2 and 5-3 re #35 Declaration, (1) DVD re #38 Declaration, by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (CL) Modified on 1/24/2012 (CL).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Filing CD/ROM, with Exhibit 2 to the #45 Supplemental Decl of John Neupert, in Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs. The Exhibit is located in the admin records area in the Clerk's Office. (TF)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court DENIES Plaintiffs' #34 motion for relief from a deadline, but RENOTES Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. #29 ) for February 3, 2012. (CL)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) ; filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing CD/ROM with Video Ex. 2 to Neupert Suppl. Decl (Dkt #45) in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4)(Neupert, John)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #41 Response to Motion (Moure, Charles)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of Dan Harris filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Moure, Charles)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, to #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Moure, Charles)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing CD/ROM re Dkt #35 and DVD re Dkt #38 in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Declarations of Hajime Ishikawa and Shigetoshi Nishiwaki filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4)(Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1)(Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION of Captain Malcolm Lambie Miller, FNI, in Connection With Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex, 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit - Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit - Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit - Ex. 7)(Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Shigetoshi Nishiwaki in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Hajime Ishikawa in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 5)(Neupert, John)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Relief From a Deadline and Request for Renote of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/20/2012, (Neupert, John)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Harris, Daniel)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DECLARATION of Peter Hammarstedt filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Harris, Daniel)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Mathew Alderson filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Harris, Daniel)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Dan Harris filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Harris, Daniel)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/27/2012, (Harris, Daniel)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/29/2011, (Harris, Daniel)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order ***Motion terminated: #28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. Defendants may file a motion to dismiss of up to 30 pages, Plaintiffs may respond in a brief subject to the same page limit, and Defendants may file a reply of up to 15 pages. All parties are encouraged to file no more pages than necessary. (JJ)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Captain Malcolm Lambie Miller, FNI filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert Regarding Revised Form of Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Revised Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Neupert, John)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Set Oral Argument on #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: MOTION HEARING set for 2/16/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Relief. Court RENOTES #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for February 3, 2012, by Judge Richard A Jones. (JJ)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Neupert, Christie Helmer; Def Counsel: Daniel Harris, Charles Moure; CR: Barry Fanning; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2011. After hearing argument of counsel, the court GRANTS Defendants' #21 Motion to Re-Note Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, which shall be renoted for 2/3/2012. Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/16/2012 at 9:00 a.m. (VE)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 12/19/2012 at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paul Watson on 12/12/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Daniel Harris filed by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #21 MOTION for Relief From Deadline and Request For Re-Note of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2, #2 Exhibit 3 - 4)(Moure, Charles)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Relief From Deadline and Request For Re-Note of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/23/2011, (Moure, Charles)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order CDR received as per Notice of Filing docket no. #20 . (CL)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing CD/ROM with Video Exs. to Declaration of Makoto Ito (Dkt No. 14) in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of John F. Neupert filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Translation of Tomoyuki Ogawa Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Kayo Ohmagari Regarding Translation of Toshiyuki Miura Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2)(Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Tomoyuki Ogawa filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Toshiyuki Miura filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1)(Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Makoto Ito filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit - Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit - Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit - Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit - Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit - Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit - Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit - Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit - Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit - Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit - Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit - Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit - Ex. 16, #17 Exhibit - Ex. 17, #18 Exhibit - Ex. 18, #19 Exhibit - Ex. 19, #20 Exhibit - Ex. 20, #21 Exhibit - Ex. 21, #22 Exhibit - Ex. 22, #23 Exhibit - Ex. 23, #24 Exhibit - Ex. 24, #25 Exhibit - Ex. 25, #26 Exhibit - Ex. 26, #27 Exhibit - Ex. 27, #28 Exhibit - Ex. 28, #29 Exhibit - Ex. 29, #30 Exhibit - Ex. 30, #31 Exhibit - Ex. 31, #32 Exhibit - Ex. 32, #33 Exhibit - Ex. 33, #34 Exhibit - Ex. 34, #35 Exhibit - Ex. 35, #36 Exhibit - Ex. 36, #37 Exhibit - Ex. 37, #38 Exhibit - Ex. 38, #39 Exhibit - Ex. 39, #40 Exhibit - Ex. 40, #41 Exhibit - Ex. 41, #42 Exhibit - Ex. 42, #43 Exhibit - Ex. 43, #44 Exhibit - Ex. 44, #45 Exhibit - Ex. 45, #46 Exhibit - Ex. 46, #47 Exhibit - Ex. 47, #48 Exhibit - Ex. 48, #49 Exhibit - Ex. 49, #50 Exhibit - Ex. 50, #51 Exhibit - Ex. 51, #52 Exhibit - Ex. 52, #53 Exhibit - Ex. 53, #54 Exhibit - Ex. 54, #55 Exhibit - Ex. 55, #56 Exhibit - Ex. 56, #57 Exhibit - Ex. 57, #58 Exhibit - Ex. 58, #59 Exhibit - Ex. 59, #60 Exhibit - Ex. 60, #61 Exhibit - Ex. 61, #62 Exhibit - Ex. 62, #63 Exhibit - Ex. 63, #64 Exhibit - Ex. 64, #65 Exhibit - Ex. 65, #66 Exhibit - Ex. 66, #67 Exhibit - Ex. 67, #68 Exhibit - Ex. 68, #69 Exhibit - Ex. 69, #70 Exhibit - Ex. 70, #71 Exhibit - Ex. 71, #72 Exhibit - Ex. 72, #73 Exhibit - Ex. 73, #74 Exhibit - Ex. 74, #75 Exhibit - Ex. 75, #76 Exhibit - Ex. 76, #77 Exhibit - Ex. 77, #78 Exhibit - Ex. 78, #79 Exhibit - Ex. 79, #80 Exhibit - Ex. 80, #81 Exhibit - Ex. 81, #82 Exhibit - Ex. 82, #83 Exhibit - Ex. 83, #84 Exhibit - Ex. 84, #85 Exhibit - Ex. 85, #86 Exhibit - Ex. 86, #87 Exhibit - Ex. 87, #88 Exhibit - Ex. 88, #89 Exhibit - Ex. 89, #90 Exhibit - Ex. 90, #91 Exhibit - Ex. 91, #92 Exhibit - Ex. 92, #93 Exhibit - Ex. 93, #94 Exhibit - Ex. 94, #95 Exhibit - Ex. 95, #96 Exhibit - Ex. 96, #97 Exhibit - Ex. 97, #98 Exhibit - Ex. 98, #99 Exhibit - Ex. 99, #100 Exhibit - Ex. 100, #101 Exhibit - Ex. 101, #102 Exhibit - Ex. 102, #103 Exhibit - Ex. 103, #104 Exhibit - Ex. 104, #105 Exhibit - Ex. 105, #106 Exhibit - Ex. 106, #107 Exhibit - Ex. 107, #108 Exhibit - Ex. 108, #109 Exhibit - Ex. 109, #110 Exhibit - Ex. 110, #111 Exhibit - Ex. 111, #112 Exhibit - Ex. 112, #113 Exhibit - Ex. 113, #114 Exhibit - Ex. 114, #115 Exhibit - Ex. 115, #116 Exhibit - Ex. 116, #117 Exhibit - Ex. 117, #118 Exhibit - Ex. 118, #119 Exhibit - Ex. 119, #120 Exhibit - Ex. 120, #121 Exhibit - Ex. 121, #122 Exhibit - Ex. 122, #123 Exhibit - Ex. 123, #124 Exhibit - Ex. 124, #125 Exhibit - Ex. 125, #126 Exhibit - Ex. 126, #127 Exhibit - Ex. 127, #128 Exhibit - Ex. 128, #129 Exhibit - Ex. 129, #130 Exhibit - Ex. 130, #131 Exhibit - Ex. 131, #132 Exhibit - Ex. 132)(Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Noting Date 1/6/2012, (Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on John Doe for Paul Watson on 12/9/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jane Doe, Sea Shepherd Conservation Society on 12/9/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Data Research, Inc., Registered Agent for Sea Shepherd Conservation Society on 12/9/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Data Research, Inc., Registered Agent for Sea Shepherd Conservation Society on 12/9/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Tom Larson, Clerk, Data Research, Inc., Registered Agent for Sea Shepherd Conservation Society on 12/9/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing CD/ROM with Complaint Exs. 5-7 in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Neupert, John)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M. Christie Helmer for Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, and for Tomoyuki Ogawa, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY M. Christie Helmer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2648875. (Phillips, James)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles P Moure on behalf of Defendants Sea Shepherd Conservation Society, Paul Watson. (Moure, Charles)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued electronically as to defendant Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Oregon). (Attachments: #1 Summons - SSCS WA, #2 Summons - SSCS Fremantle, Western Australia, #3 Summons - Watson WA Wold Rd, #4 Summons - Watson WA Halvorsen Rd, #5 Summons - Watson Fremantle, Western Australia)(PM)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Judge Richard A Jones added. (PM)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Filer: ATTORNEY ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE NOT IN COMPLIANCE (James L. Phillips) re #1 Complaint. In order for the Clerks Office to add an attorney to the docket, the attorneys signature must appear on a pleading in accordance with FRCP Rule 11 and Local General Rule 2(h). Signatures must comply with Section III (L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures which states that An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorneys signature must have the signors names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines. Do not refile this document; however, for further filings, the Clerks Office will no longer add an attorney to the docket if a signature does not comply with the above Rules and Procedures. (PM)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Neupert, John)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Action for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Relief) against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2646431), filed by Institute of Cetacean Research, Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd., Toshiyuki Miura, Tomoyuki Ogawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex. 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Ex. 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit - Ex. 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit - Ex. 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit - Ex. 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit - Ex. 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit - Ex. 7 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit - Ex. 8 to Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet - Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - SSCS OR, #11 Summons - SSCS WA, #12 Summons - SSCS Fremantle, Western Australia, #13 Summons - Watson WA Wold Rd, #14 Summons - Watson WA Halvorsen Rd, #15 Summons - Watson Fremantle, Western Australia)(Neupert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Institute of Cetacean Research et al v. Sea Shepherd Conservation Society et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute of Cetacean Research
Represented By: Elizabeth Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: James L Phillips
Represented By: M. Christie Helmer
Represented By: John F Neupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyodo Senpaku Kaisha, Ltd.
Represented By: John F Neupert
Represented By: Elizabeth Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: James L Phillips
Represented By: M. Christie Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomoyuki Ogawa
Represented By: Elizabeth Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: James L Phillips
Represented By: M. Christie Helmer
Represented By: John F Neupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toshiyuki Miura
Represented By: James L Phillips
Represented By: M. Christie Helmer
Represented By: John F Neupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Rebecca Millican
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Aura Y Gantz
Represented By: Charles P Moure
Represented By: Daniel P Harris
Represented By: Hilary V Bricken
Represented By: Rachel Eve Buker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Watson
Represented By: Charles S Jordan
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Represented By: Rebecca Millican
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Timothy G Leyh
Represented By: Aura Y Gantz
Represented By: Charles P Moure
Represented By: Daniel P Harris
Represented By: Hilary V Bricken
Represented By: Rachel Eve Buker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ocean Defenders Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hiroyuki Komura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?