Houston General Insurance Company v. Farmington Casualty Co, et al
Plaintiff: Houston General Insurance Company
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Co and St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins Co
Case Number: 2:2011cv02093
Filed: December 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 279 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Granting 253 Defendant's Motion to Exclude and for Summary Judgment; by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying 216 St. Paul's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying Parties cross 74 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Farmington Casualty Co terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 54 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: Untimely filings by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston General Insurance Company v. Farmington Casualty Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston General Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin N. Gonson
Represented By: Gary R. Greenman
Represented By: T. Daniel Heffernan
Represented By: Devon M Thurtle Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Co
Represented By: James Thomas Derrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins Co
Represented By: James Thomas Derrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?