Campidoglio LLC et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Campidoglio LLC, Carmen LLC and San Marco LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA and Does 1 - 25
Case Number: 2:2012cv00949
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting parties' 361 Stipulated Motion Regarding Paper Copies of Documents to be Shredded, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The parties having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, see Notice of Settlement (docket no. 359 ), and counsel having telephonically confirmed that no issue remains for the Court's determi nation, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. The pending motions for class certification, docket no. 328 , for summary judgment, docket no. 341 , and to compel discovery, docket no. 343 , are STRICKEN as moot. In the event settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 90 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 356 Motion for Relief From Expert Disclosure Deadline. The deadline for disclosure of expert testimony is EXTENDED from August 10, 2018, to September 14, 2018. The parties stipulated motion is otherwise DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, docket no. 328 , is RENOTED to August 31, 2018, and will be considered after the Court rules on the pending motion for summary judgment, docket no. 341 . The pending motion for summary judgment, docket no. 341 , and the pending motion to compel discovery, docket no. 343 , may not be renoted again without an order of the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 352 Stipulated Motion; Exhibit A (dkt. 352-1) shall be considered as part of the record relating to plaintiffs' motion for class certification; RENOTING plaintiffs' 328 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification: Noting Date 8/3/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' 327 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Dkts 328 and 329 shall remain under seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 330 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 325 Stipulated Motion; deadline for filing any motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 5/3/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 321 Stipulated Motion for Disbursement of Funds; the Clerk is hereby authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the Registry of this Court in the principal amount of $9,608.89; Deadline for 39.1 mediation is EXTENDED to 2/20/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MINUTE ORDER. By Minute Order entered November 9, 2017, docket no. 305 , the Court directed plaintiffs to show cause why their claims against defendants Does 1-25 should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Having reviewed plaintiffs' res ponse, docket no. 306 , the Court hereby DISMISSES plaintiffs' claims against defendants Does 1-25. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to seal, docket no. 308 , is GRANTED, and Exhibits A, B, and C to the Declaration of Raymond J. Farrow, docke t nos. 311 , 313 , and 314 , shall remain under seal. Defendant's unopposed motion to seal, docket no. 310 , is also GRANTED, and Exhibits D, E, and F to the Declaration of Robert J. Bocko, docket nos. 316 , 317 , and 318 , which are dupl icative of the materials described in Paragraph 2, above, shall remain under seal. Plaintiffs' opening brief regarding the scope of claims and defenses remaining in this action, docket no. 307 , was improperly noted as a motion. The noting date is STRICKEN and the motion is TERMINATED. Response briefs remain due on December 15, 2017. No reply shall be filed unless requested by the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to plaintiffs, on or before 11/27/2017, why defendants Does 1-25 should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute ; re parties' 304 Joint Status Report, the Court SETS the following dates and deadl ines: **Jury Trial (3-5 days)** is set for 4/8/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/10/2018, Motions due by 10/4/2018, Discovery completed by 11/16/2018, Dispositive motions du e by 11/29/2018, Motions in Limine due by 3/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/21/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/21/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/31/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 11/3/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 37 Motion to Certify Class; granting Wells Fargo's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking as moot Wells Fargo's 220 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiffs' 256 Motion for Sanctions, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(TM)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ORDER denying deferred portion of pltfs' 129 Motion for Relief; striking pltfs' 210 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting pltf's 239 Motion for Relief; renoting dfts' 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment along with motions at 37 and 220 for 7/18/14, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The court GRANTS Dft Wells Fargo's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. (CL)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to the First, Second, and Third Causes of Action with prejudice and DENIED as to the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action to the extent not inconsistent with this Order. (CL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campidoglio LLC et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campidoglio LLC
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen LLC
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Marco LLC
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Bocko
Represented By: Mark T Flewelling
Represented By: Daniel James Moore
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Robert Joseph Bocko
Represented By: Mark T Flewelling
Represented By: Daniel James Moore
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?