United States of America v. City of Seattle
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2012cv01282
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER Directing Payment of the September 2020 Invoice: The court hereby APPROVES the Seattle Monitoring Team's September 2020 invoice and DIRECTS the Clerk to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of this court in the principal amount of $18,242.00 to pay the September 2020 invoice, payable to LNW Group LLC, and mail the check to the payee. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)(cc: Finance)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's July 2020 invoice and directing the Clerk to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of this court in the principal amount of $30,000 to pay the July 2020 invoice, payable to Merrick Bobb, and mail the check to the payee. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Finance)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting Parties' 646 Joint Stipulated Motion to Convert the Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction and to Incorporate Future Briefing into Consent Decree Review Process. (1) The Temporary Restraining Order regarding the effective date of the Crowd Control Weapons Ordinance is converted to a Preliminary Injunction that will expire only by Court order (either after demonstration that the review process set forth in Paragraphs 177-181 of the Consent Decree has taken place or has been rendered moot) or by joint motion of the Parties recommending that the preliminary injunction be terminated and approval by the Court. (2) All deadlines set forth in the September 10, 2020 Order (Dkt. 643 ) are hereby stricken. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's June 2020 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the June 2020 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER granting Parties' 642 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the memoranda required by the Court's July 22nd Order (Dkt. 626 ) is October 3. DOJ's motion for a preliminary injunction is due October 8, th e City's response is due October 20, and DOJ's reply is due October 23. The Temporary Restraining Order regarding the effective date of the Crowd Control Weapons Ordinance is extended by three weeks so that it expires on October 30, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER APPOINTING MONITOR: The court hereby APPOINTS Dr. Antonio M. Oftelie as Monitor in this matter. The court also APPOINTS Ms. Monisha Harrell, Board Chair of Equal Rights Washington, as a Deputy Monitor. Their appointments are effective as of September 8, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)(Sent to Mr. Oftelie and Ms. Harrell via ad hoc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting Defendant's 638 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the memoranda required by the Courts July 22nd Order (Dkt. # 626 ) is continued to September 12. DOJ's motion for a preliminary injunction is due September 17, the City's response is due September 29, and DOJ's reply is due October 2. The Temporary Restraining Order regarding the effective date of the Crowd Control Weapons Ordinance is extended by three weeks so that it expires on October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER re Parties' 633 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order and Set Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Report. The court GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion to extend the TRO until September 18, 2020. The court OR DERS that the Government's motion for a preliminary injunction, if any, is due by August 27, 2020, and shall be noted for consideration on September 11, 2020; the City of Seattle's opposition, if any, is due on September 8, 2020; and the Government's reply, if any, shall be due on September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER ON JOINT STATUS REPORT re 630 Temporary Restraining Order: Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
July 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 630 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge James L. Robart GRANTING Plaintiff United States' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 627 ). (AD)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER REGARDING THE CITY'S NOTICE OF THE COUNCIL'S ORDINANCE REGARDING CROWD CONTROL WEAPONS. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's March, April, and May 2020 invoices and directing the Clerk to pay the March, April, and May 2020 invoices from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER re parties' 619 Stipulated Motion The Court hereby ORDERS the Community Police Commission (CPC) to file its response to the Parties' Stipulated, Joint Motion to Terminate Paragraphs 69-168 of the Consent Decree by June 9, 2020, and further ORDERS the parties to file any reply by June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's February 2020 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the February 2020 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's January 2020 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the January 2020 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's December 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the December 2019 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MW)(cc: Finance)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's November 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the November 2019 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 606 AMENDED ORDER re 601 Order. The court hereby APPROVES the Seattle Monitoring Team's October 2019 invoice and DIRECTS the Clerk to pay the October 2019 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Teams October 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the August 2019 invoice from funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting the parties' 596 Stipulated Motion for One-Week Extension. The deadline for the City to file its accountability assessment is extended by one week from December 6, 2019, to December 13, 2019. The deadline for any responsive pleadings by DOJ and CPC is extended to January 6, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's September 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting Defendant City of Seattle's 587 Motion to Approve SPD's Proposed Policy Revisions signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER approving part one and part two of the Seattle Monitoring Team's August 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay part one and part two of the August 2019 invoice funds on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's July 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds present on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting Defendant's 569 Unopposed Motion for Court Approval of Revisions to SPD's Policies. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's June 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's May 2019 invoice (Parts I & II) and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting City of Seattle's 566 Motion for One-Month Extension to File Methodology. The parties shall jointly file the methodology required by the Court's 562 Order by no later than 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's April 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting City of Seattle's 555 Unopposed Motion for Court's Approval of Revisions to SPD's Policies. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER finding that City of Seattle has fallen partially out of full and effective compliance with the Consent Decree. The Court further ORDERS the parties to file their methodology no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's invoice for the January 2019 Seattle Police Survey. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's March 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court regarding this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's February 2019 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from the funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's January 2019 invoice and directing Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's December 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regards to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER Modifying Sustainment Plan Deadlines re parties' 521 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER LIFTING STAY and extending deadlines: Government's Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2019, City's reply due on 2/20/2019, Community Police Commission may file a response, if any, when the Government files its brief on 2/13/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's November 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart holding case in abeyance and modifying deadlines until US Department of Justice appropriations are restored. (AD)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's October 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting City of Seattle's 502 Unopposed Motion for Court Approval of Revisions to the Seattle Police Department's Early Intervention System Policy. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting City of Seattle's 500 Unopposed Motion for Court Approval of Revisions to Seattle Use of Force Policy. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting the parties' 505 Stipulated Motion and adopting the briefing schedule proposed by the parties re: 504 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (See order for details) (PM)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE whether the Court should find that the City has failed to maintain full and effective compliance with the Consent Decree. Parties shall file their responses no later than 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting Defendant's 500 Unopposed Motion for Order Approving Use of Force Policy Revisions signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER denying as moot parties' 488 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Parties to File Memoranda in Response to Court's October 23, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The status conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED from November 1, 2018, to Monday, November 5, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's September 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Scheduling a Status Conference. The court hereby SCHEDULES a status conference for November 1, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's August 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Finance)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's July 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of this court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER denying nonparty Marguerite Richard's 480 Motion to Intervene. Further, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by Ms. Richard on the docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) cc: Ms. Richard via first class mail
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER denying Interested Party Isabelle Kerner's 475 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Kerner via USPS)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's June 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's May 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER denying nonparty Isabelle Kerner's 460 Motion to Intervene. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by Ms. Kerner on the docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Ms. Kerner via first class mail
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER setting Status Conference for Monday, 7/9/2018, at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. The purpose of the status conference is for the parties and the Monitor to provide the court with an update on their progress under the Phase II Sustainment Period Plan. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Finance)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting Defendant City of Seattle's 451 Motion for Order for Court Approval of Revisions to Seattle Police Department Bias-Free Policing & Crisis Intervention Policies. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's March 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance (PM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's February 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' AND THE MONITOR'S AGREED PHASE II SUSTAINMENT PERIOD PLAN signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's January 2018 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on the deposit in the court registry. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's December 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on the deposit in the court registry, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting Defendant City of Seattle's 419 Motion to Declare City of Seattle in Full and Effective Compliance with the Consent Decree ; denying The Estate of Charleena Lyles' 427 Emergency Motion to Intervene; The Phase II susta inment period of the Consent Decree shall commence on the date this order is filed ; The court further ORDERS the Monitor and the parties to submit no later than March 2, 2018, a joint plan for discharging their obligations under the Consent Decree during the Phase II sustainment period, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT) (Karen K Koehler (Counsel for Intervenor Estate of Charleena Lyles) terminated.)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's November 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: financial
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's October 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's September 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER directing the parties to submit additional briefing by 12/8/2017 on Defendant's 419 MOTION to Declare City of Seattle in Full and Effective Compliance with the Consent Decree. Clerk is directed to renote the City's motion for 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's August 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: finance
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's July 2017 invoice and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's June 2017 invoice (Part II); directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds in the court registry, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting 415 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadlines and for a Briefing Schedule on the Monitor's Compliance Status Report. City of Seattle's comments due 9/29/2017; United States' and the CPC's comments due 10/13/2017; Monitor's comments in reply due 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER directing all interested parties to file any comments concerning the Fifth-Year Monitoring Plan and Compliance Report no later than September 18, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's June 2017 invoice (Part I) and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: financial deputy
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER The court hereby APPROVES the Seattle Monitoring Team's May 2017 invoices (Parts I and II) and DIRECTS the Clerk to pay the invoices from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case by Judge James L. Robart. cc fin'l (RS)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER re Defendant City of Seattle's 396 memorandum re Accountability Ordinance. The DOJ, the Community Police Commission (CPC), and the Monitor are directed to file comments, if any, on the Accountability Ordinance by Monday, July 10, 2017. The City's reply to such comments due by July 13, 2017. In addition, the court SCHEDULES a status conference on Tuesday, July 18, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER approving Seattle Monitoring Team's April 2017 invoices (Parts I and II); directing Clerk to pay the invoices from the funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's March 2017 invoices (Parts I and II) and directing the Clerk to pay the invoices from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: financial deputy
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER APPROVING THE SEATTLE POLICE DEPARTMENT'S DRAFT BODY-WORN VIDEO POLICY re 370 Memorandum. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart re 386 Memorandum filed by Peter Ehrlichman. The court approves the new deadline of 6/23/2017, for filing the Monitor's Stops Assessment. (PM)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's February 2017 invoices (Parts I and II) and directing the Clerk to pay the invoices from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) cc fin'l
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting the parties' 372 Stipulated Motion for a Briefing Schedule. Responses due on 3/24/2017 re Seattle Police Department's Body Worn Video policy and on the issues raised in the Monitor's submission. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart APPROVING the Seattle Monitoring Team's January 2017 invoice (Part II) and DIRECTING the clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. (PM) cc: financial deputy
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER approving the Seattle Monitoring Team's January 2017 invoice (Part I) and directing the Clerk to pay the invoice from funds presently on deposit in the registry of the court with regard to this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: financial deputy
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER approving the Seattle Police Department's Crowd Management Policy by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER APPROVING 2017 SPD TRAINING PLAN re 350 Memorandum, by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting 336 Stipulated Motion to Extend Various Deadlines in the Fourth Year Monitoring Plan, by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart re 314 Report Memorandum Submitting Revisions to Certain Monitoring Plan Deadlines; the Court approves revising the deadline as described in the report. (AD)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Submitting Consensus Seattle Police Department Policies re 116 Memorandum filed by Peter Ehrlichman by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 90 CPC's Motion to Intervene but Grants the CPC amicus curiae status as described; granting in part and denying in part CPC's and the City's 91 92 Motion for Extension of Time, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND JOINT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Shapiro Cohen
Represented By: J. Michael Diaz
Represented By: Jenny A Durkan
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Michelle Leung
Represented By: Timothy D Mygatt
Represented By: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Jonathan Smith
Represented By: Michael Johnson Songer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Jean M Boler
Represented By: Peter Samuel Holmes
Represented By: Brian G Maxey
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?