Scarsella Bros., Inc v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scarsella Bros Inc
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv01759
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Staying Case re Parties' Joint 57 Motion to Stay. All litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule are hereby further STAYED until October 28, 2022. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court no later than October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re Parties' 55 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Further Stay Proceedings to Allow for Continued Settlement Discussions and ADR. All litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule are hereby further STAYED until 6/10/2022. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court no later than 6/3/2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER STAYING CASE re Parties' 53 Stipulated Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule are hereby further STAYED until November 12, 2021. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STAYING CASE re Parties' 51 Stipulated Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule are hereby further STAYED until 8/6/2021, and that all deadlines are further tolled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court no later than 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER STAYING CASE re Parties' 49 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule are hereby further STAYED until April 23, 2021, and that all deadlines are further tolled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court no later than April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING CASE re Parties' 47 Stipulation: This action, including all litigation deadlines in the current Case Schedule, are hereby further STAYED until 11/20/2020, and that all deadlines are further tolled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court no later than 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER staying case re Parties' 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER further staying case. Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STAYING CASE re parties' 40 Stipulation; Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER STAYING CASE re parties' 38 Stipulated Motion; Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING CASE re parties' 36 Stipulated Motion; Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarsella Bros., Inc v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarsella Bros Inc
Represented By: Dale L Kingman
Represented By: Matthew F Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?