Robertson v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Duncan K Robertson
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Executive Trustee Services, LLC, Residential Funding Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Corporation, Homecomings Financial, LLC, LSI Title Agency, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One National Association, Bank of New York Trust Company N.A. and First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02017
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s 253 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company's N.A.'s 248 Motion for Protective Order and granting in part and denying in part LSI Title Agency, Inc.'s 250 Motion for Protective Order. (PM)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying 202 MOTION for Reconsideration 201 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Duncan K Robertson; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting 183 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Bank of New York Trust Company NA, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Denying 159 161 Motion to Certify Questions, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying pltf's 164 MOTION for Recusal filed by Duncan K Robertson by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 114 Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 115 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 97 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File amended complaint by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 50 Defendant First American Title Insurance Co's Motion for Summary Judgment. First American Title Insurance Company terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan K Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Corporation
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial, LLC
Represented By: William G Fig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Title Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Louis A Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Matthew S Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One National Association
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Matthew S Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Trust Company N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Treadwell Karol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?