Uchytil v. Avanade Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maria Uchytil and United States of America
Defendant: Avanade Inc, Avanade Federal Services, LLC and Accenture Federal Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv02091
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 230 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety as to the Relator, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses, except as otherwise provided by agreement of the parties. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 228 Joint Status Report. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a motion for approval of the settlement agreement and for dismissal of this action on or before 1/25/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 226 Third Joint Status Report. The parties are DIRECTED to file a motion for approval of the settlement agreement or a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the Government's review of the parties' settlement by 1/18/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 224 Joint Status Report. The parties are DIRECTED to file a motion for approval of the settlement agreement or a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the Government's review of the parties' settlement by December 21, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 222 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of the Government's review of the settlement no later than November 27, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 218 Stipulation to Strike the Trial Date Due to Settlement; STRIKING trial date of 11/5/2018 and all existing pretrial deadlines; directing parties to file a Joint Status Report no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SWT)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 207 Motion to Seal Exhibits in Support of Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Dkt. No. 210 under seal. Defendants' request that the Court order Plaintiff to replace Exhibit F attached to the declaration of Plaintiff's attorney in support of her motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 214 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 209 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motions to exclude Dr. Tapia's testimony (Dkt. No. 154 ) and Mr. Zeidman's testimony (Dkt. No. 152 ). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 203 Stipulation and Order Setting New Trial Date. The Court ORDERS that the jury trial in this case be CONTINUED to Monday, November 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The Court further ORDERS that trial briefs, pro posed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, and proposed verdict forms shall be submitted no later than Monday, October 22, 2018. Motions in limine must be filed by Friday, September 28, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 195 Stipulation and Order to Substitute Exhibit to Declaration of Mark P. Walters (Dkt. No. 180 ) in Support of Relator's Combined Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Relator may file an unredacted version of Exhibit BE under seal, in accordance with this Court's prior order regarding the sealing of Relator's exhibits (Dkt. No. 193 ). Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting in part Relator's 160 Stipulated Motion to Seal; directing Relator to refile exhibits in accordance with this Order; granting in part Relator's 176 Stipulated Motion to Seal; granting defendants' 184 Stipulated Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to maintain Dkts. 188 , 189 under seal, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendants' 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 154 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christina Tapia, 152 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Mr. Robert Zeidman ; Noting Date 6/29/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting the parties' stipulated motions to seal (Dkt. Nos. 150 , 174 ). The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Dkt. Nos. 156 , 159 , 174 under seal. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 160 Stipulated MOTION to File Exhibits Under Seal and parties' 176 Stipulated MOTION to File Exhibits Under Seal. It is not readily apparent to the Court why these documents are confidential, what portions of the documents contain sensitive information, or why redaction was not a sufficient alternative to sealing. Defendants are ORDERED to provide a response to the stipulated motions identifying and addressing these questions for the relevant documents they designated as confidential. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 148 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Modified Page Limits . The Court APPROVES the parties' stipulation regarding filing dates, but ORDERS the f ollowing regarding length of filings: Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall not exceed 24 pages. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross motion shall not exceed 38 pages. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs cross-motion shall not exceed 18 pages. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 146 Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline to Depose Certain Experts. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for expert discovery is hereby EXTENDED from April 30, 2018 to May 10, 2018 for the purposes of deposing experts Robert Zeidman and Avram Tucker. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting Defendants' 123 Motion for Leave to File an amended answer and to add counterclaims. Defendants' motion for leave to file a supplemental declaration and the accompanying declaration (Dkt. Nos. 136, 137) are STRIKEN. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 121 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff/Relator Uchytil's 125 Cross-Motion to Compel. Fact discovery is set to close on March 2, 2018. The Court hereby EXTENDS the fact discovery deadline to March 30, 2018 for the sole purpose of production of the documents referenced in this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 132 Stipulation to extend the time for expert discovery. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 112 Motion Clarification or (in the Alternative) Modification of the Case Schedule. Fact discovery will be extended to March 2, 2018. The expert discovery cutoff will remain on March 30, 2018. All other case management dates will remain unchanged. If parties would like to stipulate to any alternative dates, they may submit a stipulated agreement to the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 106 stipulated motion to extend deadline to respond to the second amended complaint. Deadline extended to 8/28/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline for filing a second amended complaint to 8/7/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 93 Motion to Dismiss; the court grants Relator leave to amend her complaint within 30 days signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 97 stipulated motion to renote Defendants' 93 motion to dismiss. The motion 93 is renoted for 5/19/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 90 stipulated motion regarding acceptance of service and extension of time to respond to complaint. The deadline for Defendants Avanade Inc., Avanade Federal Services LLC, and Accenture Federal Services LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint shall be 60 days from the date of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uchytil v. Avanade Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Uchytil
Represented By: Ellen M Bierman
Represented By: Mark K Davis
Represented By: Robert L. Olson
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Roy East(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanade Inc
Represented By: Devin S. Anderson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Damon Clay Elder
Represented By: Liam P. Hardy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Craig S. Primis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanade Federal Services, LLC
Represented By: Devin S. Anderson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Damon Clay Elder
Represented By: Liam P. Hardy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Craig S. Primis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture Federal Services LLC
Represented By: Devin S. Anderson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Damon Clay Elder
Represented By: Liam P. Hardy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Craig S. Primis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?