Amy v Kennedy
Plaintiff: Amy
Defendant: Joshua Osmun Kennedy
Case Number: 2:2013cv00017
Filed: January 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying Amy's 77 Motion to Compel; granting Vicky's 79 Motion to Compel; finding as moot Ms Elliott's 83 Motion to strike or renote ; granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 96 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED ORDER re: 60 Order by Judge Richard A Jones. (CL)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Richard A Jones. The court ORDERS defendant Joshua Osmun Kennedy to appear before this court at 700 Stewart Street, 13th Floor, Seattle WA 98101, on Tuesday, October 29, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. to SHOW CAUSE why a Writ of Att achment should not be issued, attaching the following real and personal properties located at 5520 17th Ave NE, Seattle, WA 98105-3417 (Tax Parcel ID No. 861580-0400-09) and a houseboat and lot located at 3236 Portage Bay Pl. E., Seattle, WA 98102 (Tax Parcel Nos. #B3-4200-069589-04 & 408880-1450-03). Defendant is ORDERED not to take any action or inaction with respect to the listed properties that would affect his interests in these properties. (CL)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER to Consolidate by Judge Richard A Jones. The court accordingly directs the clerk to CONSOLIDATE these cases, designating this case as the lead case and the related case (13-cv-762) as the member case. All filings shall be made in the lead case, and all filings shall bear the same caption as this order. (CL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amy v Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Osmun Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy
Represented By: Jo-Hanna Read
Represented By: James R Marsh
Represented By: Jennifer Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?