Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Frontier Bank v. Clementz et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Frontier Bank
Defendant: Michael J. Clementz, Randy E DeKlyen, Lucille M DeYoung, John J. Dickson, Robert J Dickson, David A Dorsey, William H Lucas, James W Ries, Robert W Robinson, Lyle E Ryan, Darrell J Storkson and Mark O Zenger
Case Number: 2:2013cv00737
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying 144 Plaintiff's motion for a protective order 147 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 116 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part dfts' 123 Motion to Seal; clerk ordered to unseal dkt 125 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Compel by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 36 Defendants' Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendant's Motion to take judicial notice of 42 Exhibits, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Frontier Bank v. Clementz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Frontier Bank
Represented By: James B. Davidson
Represented By: Stephen J Kennedy
Represented By: Jeff M Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Clementz
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy E DeKlyen
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille M DeYoung
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Dorsey
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Robinson
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle E Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell J Storkson
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark O Zenger
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?