Harris v. Jie et al
Plaintiff: Seth D Harris
Defendant: Huang "Jackie" Jie, Zhao "Jenny" Zeng Hong, Pacific Coast Foods, Inc and J & J Comfort Zone, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00877
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 252 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Attorney Glyn E Lewis terminated.) (cc: Defendants via USPS)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER denying defendant Zhao "Jenny" Zeng Hong's 245 Motion for Declaratory Relief, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to defendant Zhao by 5/12/2017 why the Court should not increase her monthly payment to purge contempt; ORDER granting in part Plaintiff Thomas E Perez's 226 MOTION for Remedies or Relief from Defendants' continuing contempt, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's 87 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR EVIDENTIARY INFERENCE AT TRIAL - defendants shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, submit to the Clerk's Office a check made payable to the Clerk of Court along with a copy of this Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TM)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Defendants' 79 Motion to Withdraw Admissions by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LMK)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting pltf's 65 Motion for preliminary inj and sanctions by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc fin'l
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 46 Motion to reinstate the preliminary inj proceedings; denying dfts' Second 54 Motion to dismiss; denying dfts' 20 Motion to Unseal Document by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting dfts' 19 Motion to Dismiss; pltf may file 2nd amended complaint within 30 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 2 Motion for TRO ; Show Cause Hearing set for 6/19/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert S. Lasnik by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Jie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth D Harris
Represented By: Jeannie Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huang "Jackie" Jie
Represented By: Vic S Lam
Represented By: William R Zoberst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhao "Jenny" Zeng Hong
Represented By: Vic S Lam
Represented By: William R Zoberst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Foods, Inc
Represented By: Vic S Lam
Represented By: William R Zoberst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Comfort Zone, Inc.
Represented By: Vic S Lam
Represented By: William R Zoberst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?