Kyko Global, Inc et al v. Prithvi Information Solutions, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Kyko Global Inc and Kyko Global GMBH
Defendant: Prithvi Information Solutions Ltd, Prithvi Catalytic Inc, Prithvi Solutions Inc, Prithvi Information Solutions International LLC, Inalytix Inc, International Business Solutions Inc, Avani Investments Inc, Ananya Capital Inc, Madhavi Vuppalapati, Anandhan Jagaraman, Guru Pandyar, Jane Doe Pandyar, Srinivas Sista, John Doe Sista, DCGS Inc, EPP Inc, Financial Oxygen Inc, Huawei Latin American Solutions Inc and L3C Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv01034
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting Kyko Global Inc. and Kyko Global GmbH's 428 Ex-Parte Motion to modify judgment. ORDERED that this Court's Judgment issued on January 12, 2016, in the amount of $26,466,218.00 is vacated. [Doc. Nos. 342 , 343 ]. Judgment is issued in favor of Kyko against Satish Vuppalapati in the amount of $3,000,000.00. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 424 Renewed Motion for Judicial Assistance to the High Court of the Hong Kong Special Administrative Region, Court of First Instance. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) Modified on 1/31/2018: 3 certified copies or order sent via first class mail to attorney Keith Pitt (PM).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 419 Motion for Judicial Assistance to the High Court of the Hong Kong Special Administrative Region, Court of First Instance. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Court directs that judgment be entered for Plaintiffs and against Defendants consistent with the findings and conclusions made herein. (PM) cc: mailed to active parties not receiving electronic notice.
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER denying without prejudice 305 Motion to Amend Answer 306 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendants are granted leave to file renewed motion(s) to amend within seven (7) days of the date of this order; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying dfts' 282 Motion for Summary Judgment except as to Satish Vuppalpati who is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; JSR due within 14 days by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)cc pro se parties
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER denying 163 Plaintiffs' Motion to determine adminissibility of materials on computer ; denying 168 Defendants' Motion to Disqualify by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft Anandhan Jayaramans 131 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 122 Defendants' Motion to amend judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying dfts' 22 Sealed Motion for TRO by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyko Global, Inc et al v. Prithvi Information Solutions, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyko Global Inc
Represented By: Christina L Haring-Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyko Global GMBH
Represented By: Christina L Haring-Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithvi Information Solutions Ltd
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithvi Catalytic Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithvi Solutions Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithvi Information Solutions International LLC
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inalytix Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Solutions Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avani Investments Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ananya Capital Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madhavi Vuppalapati
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anandhan Jagaraman
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guru Pandyar
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Pandyar
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srinivas Sista
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Sista
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCGS Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPP Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Oxygen Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Latin American Solutions Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3C Inc
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?