Nellams v. Eagle Marine Services, Inc.. et al
Plaintiff: Abin Bola Nellams
Defendant: Eagle Marine Services, Inc., International Longshore and Warehouse Union Local 52, Pacific Maritime Association and Gary Walkama
Case Number: 2:2013cv01504
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 142 Request for a Status Conference: In lieu of a second status conference, the parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer and submit to the Court three mutually acceptable trial dates. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (MW)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting defendant Pacific Maritime Association's 130 131 Motions for entry of final judgment signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 127 notice of intent to pursue claims against the remaining defendant, Gary Walkama. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2017. Defendant's attorney, William H. Fligeltaub, is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to Mr. Walkama. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting dft PMA's 64 Sealed Motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part dft Eagle Marine's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying dft Walkama's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nellams v. Eagle Marine Services, Inc.. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abin Bola Nellams
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Represented By: Ada Ko Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union Local 52
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Clemens H Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Walkama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?