Telebuyer, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Telebuyer, LLC |
Defendant: |
Amazon.com Inc, Amazon Web Services, LLC and VADATA, Inc |
Counter_claimant: |
Amazon Web Services, LLC, Amazon.com Inc and VADATA, Inc |
Counter_defendant: |
Telebuyer, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01677 |
Filed: |
September 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard A Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 23, 2015 |
Filing
220
ORDER granting 202 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
197
ORDER granting 194 Motion to Redact 190 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
165
ORDER granting 145 Motion to Limit Number of Patent Claims Asserted and to Appoint a Technical Advisor. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
|
February 11, 2014 |
Filing
104
ORDER denying 90 Motion for relief from deadline and imposing sanctions, by Judge Richard A Jones. In addition, Defendants shall provide courtesy copies regarding their motion for a protective order (Dkt. # 92 ). (VE)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Telebuyer, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Telebuyer, LLC |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Berliner |
Represented By: |
Diana S Breaux |
Represented By: |
Jeremy E Roller |
Represented By: |
Mark Alan Samuels |
Represented By: |
Alan D. Tse |
Represented By: |
Xin-Yi Zhou |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Richard G. Frenkel |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Richard G. Frenkel |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: VADATA, Inc |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Richard G. Frenkel |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Amazon Web Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Amazon.com Inc |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: VADATA, Inc |
Represented By: |
Robert Armistead Angle |
Represented By: |
James Robert Bender |
Represented By: |
Brian D Buckley |
Represented By: |
Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV |
Represented By: |
Ewa M. Davison |
Represented By: |
Gabriel Gross |
Represented By: |
Douglas E Lumish |
Represented By: |
Matthew J Moore |
Represented By: |
S. Giriraj Pathmanaban |
Represented By: |
Syed Mohsin Reza |
Represented By: |
Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims |
Represented By: |
Patricia Young |
Represented By: |
Mary Catherine Zinsner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Telebuyer, LLC |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Berliner |
Represented By: |
Jeremy E Roller |
Represented By: |
Mark Alan Samuels |
Represented By: |
Alan D. Tse |
Represented By: |
Xin-Yi Zhou |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?