Carter v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Leonard Carter
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2014cv00158
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Supplemental Motion for Attorney's Fees. It is hereby ORDERED that attorney'sfees in the amount of $11,790.95, and expenses in the amount of $397.00, for a total of $12,187.95, shall be awarded to plaintiff. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER setting Noting Date re Plaintiff Leonard Carter's 39 RESPONSE/Supplemental MOTION for Attorney's Fees: Noting Date 5/5/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant to file supplemental briefing, on or before 4/10/2017, addressing defendant's position on whether the fees claimed in plaintiff's motion, docket no. 30 , are reasonable. Plaintiff's response, if any, is due on or before 4/24/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Reversing the Commisioner and Remanding for Further Proceedings by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Report and Recommendation 27 is Adopted. (LMK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Carter
Represented By: Christopher H Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Jeffrey E Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?